26.12.2014 |
Application deemed to be withdrawn |
published on 28.01.2015 [2015/05] |
19.09.2014 |
New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit |
|
30.08.2014 |
New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: despatch of communication + time limit |
|
15.04.2014 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
12.07.2013 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
03.05.2013 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
19.03.2013 |
Change: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
07.11.2012 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
17.07.2012 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
28.07.2011 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
11.02.2011 |
Change - representative |
published on 16.03.2011 [2011/11] |
04.02.2011 |
Change: Reply to examination report |
|
04.02.2011 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
13.12.2010 |
Change: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
17.09.2010 |
Change - extension states |
published on 20.10.2010 [2010/42] |
13.08.2010 |
First examination report |
|
12.08.2010 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
31.07.2010 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
26.02.2010 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 31.03.2010 [2010/13] |
26.02.2010 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 31.03.2010 [2010/13] |
20.02.2010 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
12.02.2010 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
13.01.2010 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
05.01.2010 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
25.12.2009 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
17.02.2009 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
02.02.2009 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
29.01.2009 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
11.11.2008 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
27.08.2008 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|