EP2167136 - MOLECULES FOR TARGETING COMPOUNDS TO VARIOUS SELECTED ORGANS OR TISSUES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 24.02.2017 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.08.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): BG | published on 19.09.2018 [2018/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BioMarin Technologies B.V. J.H. Oortweg 21 2333 CH Leiden / NL | For all designated states Academisch Ziekenhuis Leiden Albinusdreef 2 2333 ZA Leiden / NL | [2016/13] |
Former [2015/50] | For all designated states BioMarin Technologies B.V. J.H. Oortweg 21 2333 CH Leiden / NL | ||
Former [2014/52] | For all designated states Prosensa Technologies B.V. J.H. Oortweg 21 2333 CH Leiden / NL | ||
Former [2010/13] | For all designated states Prosensa Technologies B.V. Wassenaarseweg 72 2333 AL Leiden / NL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HEEMSKERK, Johannes, Antonius Lopsenstraat 14 NL-2312 ZZ Leiden / NL | 02 /
VAN DEUTEKOM, Judith, Christina, Theodora Abeelstraat 13 NL-3329 AA Dordrecht / NL | 03 /
VAN KUIK-ROMEIJN, Petra Verlengde Hoogravenseweg 82 NL-3525 BJ Utrecht / NL | 04 /
PLATENBURG, Gerardus, Johannes Wijngaardenlaan 56 NL-2252 XR Voorschoten / NL | [2010/22] |
Former [2010/13] | 01 /
HEEMSKERK, Johannes, Antonius Lopsenstraat 14 NL-2312 ZZ Leiden / NL | ||
02 /
VAN DEUTEKOM, Judith, Christina, Theodora Abeelstraat 13 NL-3329 AA Dordrecht / NL | |||
03 /
VAN KUIK-ROMEIJN, Petra Verlengde Hoogravenseweg 82 NL-3525 BJ Utrecht / NL | |||
04 /
PLATENBURG, Gerard, Johannes Wijngaardenlaan 56 NL-2252 XR Voorschoten / NL | Representative(s) | Nederlandsch Octrooibureau P.O. Box 29720 2502 LS The Hague / NL | [2013/28] |
Former [2010/13] | Swinkels, Bart Willem, et al Nederlandsch Octrooibureau J. W. Frisolaan 13 2517 JS Den Haag / NL | Application number, filing date | 08779023.4 | 14.07.2008 | [2010/13] | WO2008NL50475 | Priority number, date | EP20070112323 | 12.07.2007 Original published format: EP 07112323 | [2016/16] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2009008727 | Date: | 15.01.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/03] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2167136 | Date: | 31.03.2010 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.01.2009 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2010/13] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2167136 | Date: | 20.04.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/16] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 13.08.2009 | Classification | IPC: | A61K47/48, A61K49/00, A61P21/00, A61P5/00 | [2015/47] | CPC: |
A61K49/0056 (EP,US);
A61K47/62 (EP,US);
A61K49/0032 (EP,US);
A61K49/0047 (EP,US);
A61P19/00 (EP);
A61P21/00 (EP);
A61P21/02 (EP);
A61P21/04 (EP);
A61P3/00 (EP);
A61P3/04 (EP);
A61P3/10 (EP);
A61P5/00 (EP);
A61P9/00 (EP)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2010/13] | A61K47/48, A61P19/00, A61P21/00, A61P5/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2016/16] |
Former [2010/13] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | MOLEKÜLE FÜR TARGETING VON VERBINDUNGEN AUF VERSCHIEDENE AUSGEWÄHLTE ORGANE ODER GEWEBE | [2010/13] | English: | MOLECULES FOR TARGETING COMPOUNDS TO VARIOUS SELECTED ORGANS OR TISSUES | [2010/13] | French: | MOLÉCULES POUR CIBLER LES COMPOSANTS VERS PLUSIEURS ORGANES SÉLECTIONNÉS OU TISSUS | [2010/13] | Entry into regional phase | 18.01.2010 | National basic fee paid | 18.01.2010 | Designation fee(s) paid | 18.01.2010 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 18.01.2010 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 18.01.2010 | Examination requested [2010/13] | 11.08.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.11.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.09.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 13.10.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.10.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.02.2016 | Fee for grant paid | 26.02.2016 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 26.02.2016 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | EP12174179.7 / EP2505211 | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 11.08.2010 | Opposition(s) | 23.01.2017 | No opposition filed within time limit [2017/13] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.06.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.06.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.06.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.06.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 30.06.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 27.07.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 14.07.2008 | BG | 20.04.2016 | CZ | 20.04.2016 | EE | 20.04.2016 | HR | 20.04.2016 | IS | 20.04.2016 | LT | 20.04.2016 | LV | 20.04.2016 | PL | 20.04.2016 | RO | 20.04.2016 | SI | 20.04.2016 | SK | 20.04.2016 | NO | 20.07.2016 | MT | 31.07.2016 | [2018/38] |
Former [2018/33] | HU | 14.07.2008 | |
CZ | 20.04.2016 | ||
EE | 20.04.2016 | ||
HR | 20.04.2016 | ||
IS | 20.04.2016 | ||
LT | 20.04.2016 | ||
LV | 20.04.2016 | ||
PL | 20.04.2016 | ||
RO | 20.04.2016 | ||
SI | 20.04.2016 | ||
SK | 20.04.2016 | ||
NO | 20.07.2016 | ||
MT | 31.07.2016 | ||
Former [2018/28] | HU | 14.07.2008 | |
CZ | 20.04.2016 | ||
EE | 20.04.2016 | ||
HR | 20.04.2016 | ||
LT | 20.04.2016 | ||
LV | 20.04.2016 | ||
PL | 20.04.2016 | ||
RO | 20.04.2016 | ||
SI | 20.04.2016 | ||
SK | 20.04.2016 | ||
NO | 20.07.2016 | ||
Former [2017/37] | CZ | 20.04.2016 | |
EE | 20.04.2016 | ||
HR | 20.04.2016 | ||
LT | 20.04.2016 | ||
LV | 20.04.2016 | ||
PL | 20.04.2016 | ||
RO | 20.04.2016 | ||
SI | 20.04.2016 | ||
SK | 20.04.2016 | ||
NO | 20.07.2016 | ||
Former [2017/10] | CZ | 20.04.2016 | |
EE | 20.04.2016 | ||
HR | 20.04.2016 | ||
LT | 20.04.2016 | ||
LV | 20.04.2016 | ||
PL | 20.04.2016 | ||
RO | 20.04.2016 | ||
SK | 20.04.2016 | ||
NO | 20.07.2016 | ||
Former [2017/09] | CZ | 20.04.2016 | |
EE | 20.04.2016 | ||
HR | 20.04.2016 | ||
LT | 20.04.2016 | ||
LV | 20.04.2016 | ||
PL | 20.04.2016 | ||
RO | 20.04.2016 | ||
NO | 20.07.2016 | ||
Former [2016/51] | HR | 20.04.2016 | |
LT | 20.04.2016 | ||
LV | 20.04.2016 | ||
PL | 20.04.2016 | ||
NO | 20.07.2016 | ||
Former [2016/49] | LT | 20.04.2016 | |
PL | 20.04.2016 | ||
NO | 20.07.2016 | ||
Former [2016/46] | LT | 20.04.2016 | |
NO | 20.07.2016 | Cited in | International search | [Y]US6329501 (SMITH BRUCE F [US], et al) [Y] 1-14 * the whole document *; | [Y]US6399575 (SMITH BRUCE F [US], et al) [Y] 1-14 *Peptide LPLTPLP corresponds to SEQ ID NO: 93 of the present application*;; figure -; example -; claim 2 *; | [Y]WO03037172 (GPC BIOTECH INC [US], et al) [Y] 1-14 * Peptide QLFTSAS (RN 518998-15-7) is identical to SEQ ID NO: 3 of the present application; Peptide GNTPSRA is identical to SEQ ID NO: 17 of the present application*;; figure -; example - *; | [Y] - SMITH B F ET AL, "Muscle-specific peptide #5", GENESEQ,, (19000101), XP002442550 [Y] 1-14 *abstract* |