Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2010072686 | Global Dossier | 25.03.2010 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2008RU00381 | 11.06.2008 | RU2007123536 | 14.06.2007 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2010528807 | Global Dossier | 26.08.2010 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2008RU00381 | 11.06.2008 | RU2007123536 | 14.06.2007 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2166999 | Global Dossier | 31.03.2010 | A2 | Priority number | Date | WO2008RU00381 | 11.06.2008 | RU2007123536 | 14.06.2007 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2008153445 | Global Dossier | 23.04.2009 | A3 | WO2008153445 | 18.12.2008 | A2 | Priority number | Date | RU2007123536 | 14.06.2007 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | RU2359643 | 27.06.2009 | C2 | RU2007123536 | 20.12.2008 | A | Priority number | Date | RU2007123536 | 14.06.2007 |