EP2166999 - CONDOM HOLDER AND A METHOD OF PUTTING THE CONDOM ON [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 09.12.2011 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.12.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 11.01.2012 [2012/02] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Closed Joint-Stock Company "Easy Tail" 7 kv. B. Sampsonievskypr. Saint Petersburg 194044 / RU | [N/P] |
Former [2010/16] | For all designated states Easy Tail 7 kv. B. Sampsonievskypr. Saint Petersburg 194044 / RU | ||
Former [2010/13] | For all designated states OOO "Andante" 13A Ul. Komsomola St. Petersburg, 195009 / RU | Inventor(s) | 01 /
FELITSYN, Alexander Leonidovich B.Sampsonievskypr., 7 kv.1 St. Petersburg, 194044 / RU | [2010/13] | Representative(s) | Bates, Alan Douglas Henry, et al Reddie & Grose LLP The White Chapel Building 10 Whitechapel High Street London E1 8QS / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2010/13] | Bates, Alan Douglas Henry, et al Reddie & Grose 16 Theobalds Road London WC1X 8PL / GB | Application number, filing date | 08779205.7 | 11.06.2008 | [2010/13] | WO2008RU00381 | Priority number, date | RU20070123536 | 14.06.2007 Original published format: RU 2007123536 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2008153445 | Date: | 18.12.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/51] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2166999 | Date: | 31.03.2010 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 18.12.2008 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2010/13] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 23.04.2009 | Classification | IPC: | A61F6/00 | [2010/13] | CPC: |
A61F6/00 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2010/13] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | KONDOMHALTER UND VERFAHREN ZUM ANLEGEN DES KONDOMS | [2010/13] | English: | CONDOM HOLDER AND A METHOD OF PUTTING THE CONDOM ON | [2010/13] | French: | SUPPORT DE PRÉSERVATIF, ET PROCÉDÉ DE MISE EN PLACE DU PRÉSERVATIF | [2010/13] | Entry into regional phase | 30.12.2009 | National basic fee paid | 14.01.2010 | Designation fee(s) paid | 30.12.2009 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 11.11.2008 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 30.12.2009 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 30.12.2009 | Examination requested [2010/13] | 03.03.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.07.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2012/02] | 22.08.2011 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2012/02] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 03.03.2011 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.06.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.06.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]US5713880 (ANDERSON VERNE M [US]) [X] 1,9,11,12,14,15,61,64,65,68 * column 8, line 4 - line 24; figure 6 *; | [X]US2004230180 (GOULTER VICTOR HAROLD [AU]) [X] 1,9,11,12,14,15,61,64,65,68 * paragraph [0003] * * paragraph [0064] - paragraph [0068]; figures 6-9 *; | [DA]WO2007021184 (MUNGOSWORKS V O F [NL], et al) [DA] 1 * the whole document *; | [A]FR2693652 (BESDEL PIERRE [FR]) [A] 1 * the whole document *; | [PX]WO2007073243 (FELITSYN ALEXANDER LEONIDOVICH [RU]) [PX] 1-15,61-75 * the whole document * |