EP2150494 - SILICA-BASED SOLS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 10.11.2017 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 02.12.2016 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 28.11.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.03.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 08.04.2020 [2020/15] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Akzo Nobel N.V. P.O. Box 9300 (Velperweg 76/6824 BM) 6800 SB Arnhem / NL | [2017/01] |
Former [2010/06] | For all designated states Akzo Nobel N.V. P.O. Box 9300 (Velperweg 76/6824 BM) 6800 SB Arnhem / NL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
PERSSON, Michael Rörviksgatan 51 S-421 65 Västra Frölunda / SE | 02 /
HANSSON, Freddie Åkergatan 7 S-442 33 Kungälv / SE | 03 /
PAL, Annika, Viola Mossvägen 15 S-433 51 Partille / SE | 04 /
LINDAHL, Lars Tom 1557 S-430 33 Fjärås / SE | 05 /
CARLÉN, Joakim Lundgatan 7 S-416 61 Göteborg / SE | [2010/06] | Representative(s) | Akzo Nobel IP Department Christian Neefestraat 2 1077 WW Amsterdam / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2013/15] | Akzo Nobel IP Department Velperweg 76 6824 BM Arnhem / NL | ||
Former [2010/06] | Schalkwijk, Pieter Cornelis Akzo Nobel N.V. Intellectual Property Department P.O. Box 9300 6800 SB Arnhem / NL | Application number, filing date | 08779339.4 | 04.06.2008 | [2010/06] | WO2008SE50657 | Priority number, date | EP20070109790 | 07.06.2007 Original published format: EP 07109790 | US20070933636P | 07.06.2007 Original published format: US 933636 P | [2010/06] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2008150230 | Date: | 11.12.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/50] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2150494 | Date: | 10.02.2010 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 11.12.2008 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2010/06] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2150494 | Date: | 04.01.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/01] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 11.12.2008 | Classification | IPC: | C01B33/143, C01B33/149, D21H17/68, D21H21/10 | [2016/33] | CPC: |
C01B33/1435 (EP,US);
C01B33/143 (KR);
D21H17/74 (US);
C01B33/149 (EP,KR,US);
D21H17/68 (EP,KR,US);
D21H21/10 (EP,US);
D21H17/375 (EP,US);
D21H17/42 (EP,US);
D21H17/44 (EP,US);
D21H23/04 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2010/06] | C01B33/143, C01B33/149, D21H17/68 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2017/01] |
Former [2010/06] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | SOLE AUF DER BASIS VON KIESELSÄURE | [2010/06] | English: | SILICA-BASED SOLS | [2010/06] | French: | SOLS À BASE DE SILICE | [2010/06] | Entry into regional phase | 03.11.2009 | National basic fee paid | 03.11.2009 | Designation fee(s) paid | 03.11.2009 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 03.04.2009 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 03.11.2009 | Examination requested [2010/06] | 20.08.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 06.04.2011 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 07.06.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 31.07.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 09.02.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.06.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 28.06.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.08.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 25.11.2016 | Fee for grant paid | 25.11.2016 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 25.11.2016 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | EP10164653.7 / EP2272797 | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 20.08.2010 | Opposition(s) | 05.10.2017 | No opposition filed within time limit [2017/50] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 07.06.2011 | Request for further processing filed | 07.06.2011 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 24.06.2011 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.06.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.06.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.06.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.06.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 30.06.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 29.06.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 27.06.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 04.06.2008 | CY | 04.01.2017 | EE | 04.01.2017 | HR | 04.01.2017 | LT | 04.01.2017 | LV | 04.01.2017 | MC | 04.01.2017 | RO | 04.01.2017 | SI | 04.01.2017 | TR | 04.01.2017 | BG | 04.04.2017 | NO | 04.04.2017 | GR | 05.04.2017 | IS | 04.05.2017 | IE | 04.06.2017 | LU | 04.06.2017 | MT | 04.06.2017 | CH | 30.06.2017 | LI | 30.06.2017 | [2020/15] |
Former [2019/46] | HU | 04.06.2008 | |
CY | 04.01.2017 | ||
EE | 04.01.2017 | ||
HR | 04.01.2017 | ||
LT | 04.01.2017 | ||
LV | 04.01.2017 | ||
MC | 04.01.2017 | ||
RO | 04.01.2017 | ||
SI | 04.01.2017 | ||
BG | 04.04.2017 | ||
NO | 04.04.2017 | ||
GR | 05.04.2017 | ||
IS | 04.05.2017 | ||
IE | 04.06.2017 | ||
LU | 04.06.2017 | ||
MT | 04.06.2017 | ||
CH | 30.06.2017 | ||
LI | 30.06.2017 | ||
Former [2019/31] | HU | 04.06.2008 | |
EE | 04.01.2017 | ||
HR | 04.01.2017 | ||
LT | 04.01.2017 | ||
LV | 04.01.2017 | ||
MC | 04.01.2017 | ||
RO | 04.01.2017 | ||
SI | 04.01.2017 | ||
BG | 04.04.2017 | ||
NO | 04.04.2017 | ||
GR | 05.04.2017 | ||
IS | 04.05.2017 | ||
IE | 04.06.2017 | ||
LU | 04.06.2017 | ||
MT | 04.06.2017 | ||
CH | 30.06.2017 | ||
LI | 30.06.2017 | ||
Former [2018/43] | EE | 04.01.2017 | |
HR | 04.01.2017 | ||
LT | 04.01.2017 | ||
LV | 04.01.2017 | ||
MC | 04.01.2017 | ||
RO | 04.01.2017 | ||
SI | 04.01.2017 | ||
BG | 04.04.2017 | ||
NO | 04.04.2017 | ||
GR | 05.04.2017 | ||
IS | 04.05.2017 | ||
IE | 04.06.2017 | ||
LU | 04.06.2017 | ||
MT | 04.06.2017 | ||
CH | 30.06.2017 | ||
LI | 30.06.2017 | ||
Former [2018/23] | EE | 04.01.2017 | |
HR | 04.01.2017 | ||
LT | 04.01.2017 | ||
LV | 04.01.2017 | ||
MC | 04.01.2017 | ||
RO | 04.01.2017 | ||
SI | 04.01.2017 | ||
BG | 04.04.2017 | ||
NO | 04.04.2017 | ||
GR | 05.04.2017 | ||
IS | 04.05.2017 | ||
IE | 04.06.2017 | ||
LU | 04.06.2017 | ||
CH | 30.06.2017 | ||
LI | 30.06.2017 | ||
Former [2018/21] | EE | 04.01.2017 | |
HR | 04.01.2017 | ||
LT | 04.01.2017 | ||
LV | 04.01.2017 | ||
MC | 04.01.2017 | ||
RO | 04.01.2017 | ||
SI | 04.01.2017 | ||
BG | 04.04.2017 | ||
NO | 04.04.2017 | ||
GR | 05.04.2017 | ||
IS | 04.05.2017 | ||
LU | 04.06.2017 | ||
CH | 30.06.2017 | ||
LI | 30.06.2017 | ||
Former [2018/14] | EE | 04.01.2017 | |
HR | 04.01.2017 | ||
LT | 04.01.2017 | ||
LV | 04.01.2017 | ||
MC | 04.01.2017 | ||
RO | 04.01.2017 | ||
SI | 04.01.2017 | ||
BG | 04.04.2017 | ||
NO | 04.04.2017 | ||
GR | 05.04.2017 | ||
IS | 04.05.2017 | ||
Former [2018/11] | EE | 04.01.2017 | |
HR | 04.01.2017 | ||
LT | 04.01.2017 | ||
LV | 04.01.2017 | ||
MC | 04.01.2017 | ||
RO | 04.01.2017 | ||
BG | 04.04.2017 | ||
NO | 04.04.2017 | ||
GR | 05.04.2017 | ||
IS | 04.05.2017 | ||
Former [2017/50] | EE | 04.01.2017 | |
HR | 04.01.2017 | ||
LT | 04.01.2017 | ||
LV | 04.01.2017 | ||
RO | 04.01.2017 | ||
BG | 04.04.2017 | ||
NO | 04.04.2017 | ||
GR | 05.04.2017 | ||
IS | 04.05.2017 | ||
Former [2017/41] | HR | 04.01.2017 | |
LT | 04.01.2017 | ||
LV | 04.01.2017 | ||
BG | 04.04.2017 | ||
NO | 04.04.2017 | ||
GR | 05.04.2017 | ||
IS | 04.05.2017 | Cited in | International search | [XY]EP0335195 (NISSAN CHEMICAL IND LTD [JP]) [X] 1-10 * column 6, line 16 - column 7, line 23 * * column 36, line 24 - column 37, line 28 * [Y] 24-29; | [A]WO9405596 (EKA NOBEL AB [SE], et al); | [X]US5597512 (WATANABE YOSHITANE [JP], et al) [X] 1-10 * column 1, line 59 - column 2, line 3 * * column 5, line 54 - column 6, line 6 * * column 7, line 7 - line 15 * * column 11, line 21 - line 50 *; | [A]WO0075074 (NALCO CHEMICAL CO [US]); | [A]EP1114794 (NISSAN CHEMICAL IND LTD [JP]); | [A]US2005020699 (ISOBE YASUHIDE [JP], et al); | [DXY]WO2005100241 (AKZO NOBEL NV [NL], et al) [DX] 11-23 * claims 1-26 * * page 4, line 12 - line 15 * * example 1 * [Y] 24-29; | [A]EP1619171 (AKZO NOBEL NV [NL], et al) [A] 4,24-29 * claims 1-14 * * page 3, line 3 - line 26 * * examples 1-7 * | Examination | US3024089 |