EP2197936 - PROCESS FOR PRODUCTION OF POLYESTER COPOLYMERS AND A COMPOSITION INCORPORATING THE COPOLYMERS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 27.04.2012 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.04.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 30.05.2012 [2012/22] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hydrochem (S) Pte Ltd Hyflux Building 202 Kallang Bahru Singapore 339339 / SG | [2010/25] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WANG, Shaofeng HYFLUX LTD Hyflux Building 202 Kallang Bahru Singapore 339339 / SG | 02 /
JING, Bo HYFLUX LTD Hyflux Building 202Kallang Bahru Singapore 339339 / SG | 03 /
HUANG, Yuqiang HYFLUX LTD Hyflux Building 202 Kallang Bahru Singapore 339339 / SG | 04 /
HOU, Lianlong HYFLUX LTD Hyflux Building 202 Kallang Bahru Singapore 339339 / SG | 05 /
YAP, Siok Ling, Sherlyn HYFLUX LTD Hyflux Building 202 Kallang Bahru Singapore 339339 / SG | [2010/25] | Representative(s) | Elend, Almut Susanne, et al Venner Shipley LLP 406 Science Park Milton Road Cambridge CB4 0WW / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2010/37] | Elend, Almut Susanne, et al Venner Shipley LLP Byron House Cambridge Business Park Cowley Road Cambridge CB4 0WZ / GB | ||
Former [2010/25] | Elend, Almut Susanne, et al Venner Shipley LLP 20 Little Britain London EC1A 7DH / GB | Application number, filing date | 08779502.7 | 29.07.2008 | [2010/25] | WO2008SG00275 | Priority number, date | US20070979197P | 11.10.2007 Original published format: US 979197 P | [2010/25] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2009048426 | Date: | 16.04.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/16] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2197936 | Date: | 23.06.2010 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 16.04.2009 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2010/25] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | AU | 16.04.2009 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.04.2011 | Classification | IPC: | C08G63/00, C08G63/12, C08G63/78, C08G18/42, C08G63/16, C08L67/00 | [2010/25] | CPC: |
C08G18/73 (EP,US);
C08G18/4202 (EP,US);
C08G18/4236 (EP,US);
C08G18/4283 (EP,US);
C08G18/4286 (EP,US);
C08G63/60 (EP,US);
C08G2140/00 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2010/25] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON POLYESTERCOPOLYMEREN UND ZUSAMMENSETZUNG MIT DEN COPOLYMEREN | [2010/25] | English: | PROCESS FOR PRODUCTION OF POLYESTER COPOLYMERS AND A COMPOSITION INCORPORATING THE COPOLYMERS | [2010/25] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE FABRICATION DE COPOLYMÈRES DE POLYESTER ET COMPOSITION CONTENANT LES COPOLYMÈRES | [2010/25] | Entry into regional phase | 26.04.2010 | National basic fee paid | 26.04.2010 | Search fee paid | 26.04.2010 | Designation fee(s) paid | 26.04.2010 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 11.08.2009 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: AU | 26.04.2010 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 26.04.2010 | Examination requested [2010/25] | 29.11.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2012/22] | 12.01.2012 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2012/22] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.07.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.07.2011 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | JPH08259680 [ ] (MITSUBISHI CHEM CORP); | JPH093150 [ ] (SHOWA HIGHPOLYMER); | [X] - TAKYAMA, EIICHIRO ET AL, "Manufacture of biodegradable block polyesters with high mechanical strength", CA, CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS SERVICE, COLUMBUS, OHIO, US, Database accession no. 126:172071, URL: STN, XP002632278 [X] 1-15 * abstract * | [A] - MYAZAKI, KEIKO ET AL, "Manufacture of aliphatic copolyesters having high molecular weight and melt viscosity", CA, CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS SERVICE, COLUMBUS, OHIO, US, Database accession no. 126:31874, URL: STN, XP002632279 [A] 1-15 * abstract * | [A] - CHO, JUN HYUNG ET AL, "Synthesis and thermal properties of aliphatic copolyesters of L-lactic acid", CA, CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS SERVICE, COLUMBUS, OHIO, US, Database accession no. 128:35109, URL: STN, XP002632280 [A] 1-15 * abstract * | International search | [X]JPH08300570 ; | [X]JPH023177 ; | [X]US6399716 (CHUNG HYUN SOO [KR], et al); | [A]US6414108 (WARZELHAN VOLKER [DE], et al); | [A]US2006155099 (WU RU-YU [TW], et al) | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, & JP8300570 A 19961119 (DAINIPPON INK & CHEM INC) | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, & JP9003177 A 19970107 (DAINIPPON INK & CHEM INC) |