EP2127033 - MAGNETIC CONNECTOR FOR HEADSET [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 28.06.2013 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.07.2015 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU, LU | published on 19.08.2015 [2015/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states APPLE INC. 1 Infinite Loop Cupertino, CA 95014 / US | [2012/34] |
Former [2009/49] | For all designated states Apple Inc. 1 Infinite Loop Cupertino, CA 95014 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HANKEY, M. Evans 479 Andover Street San Francisco, California 94110 / US | 02 /
SANFORD, Emery A. 2277 Van Ness Avenue, Apt. B San Francisco, California 94109 / US | 03 /
PREST, Christoper D. 1 Infinite Loop Cupertino, CA 95014 / US | 04 /
LIM, Way Chet 46 W. Julian Street, Unit 224 San Jose, California 95110 / US | [2009/49] | Representative(s) | Rooney, John-Paul, et al Withers & Rogers LLP 2 London Bridge London SE1 9RA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2012/34] | Rooney, John-Paul, et al Withers & Rogers LLP 4 More London Riverside London SE1 2AU / GB | ||
Former [2011/24] | Rooney, John-Paul, et al Withers & Rogers LLP Goldings House 2 Hays Lane London SE1 2HW / GB | ||
Former [2009/49] | Barton, Russell Glen, et al Withers & Rogers LLP Goldings House 2 Hays Lane London SE1 2HW / GB | Application number, filing date | 08779541.5 | 04.01.2008 | [2009/49] | WO2008US00210 | Priority number, date | US20070879177P | 06.01.2007 Original published format: US 879177 P | US20070879195P | 06.01.2007 Original published format: US 879195 P | US20070824444 | 28.06.2007 Original published format: US 824444 | [2009/49] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2008127488 | Date: | 23.10.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/43] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2127033 | Date: | 02.12.2009 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 23.10.2008 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2009/49] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2127033 | Date: | 22.08.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/34] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 23.10.2008 | Classification | IPC: | H01R13/703, H01R29/00, H01R43/26, H04M1/05, H01R13/24, F16B35/00, F21V33/00, H04B1/38, H04M1/03, H04M1/22, H01R11/30, H01R13/62, H04R1/10, H04M1/60 | [2012/22] | CPC: |
H01R13/2428 (EP,US);
H01R13/703 (KR);
H04R5/033 (US);
H01R13/7039 (EP,US);
H01R27/02 (KR);
H01R29/00 (EP,KR,US);
H01R43/26 (EP,US);
H04M1/05 (EP,US);
H04M1/60 (KR);
H04R1/1041 (EP,US);
H01R13/6205 (EP,US);
H01R13/64 (EP,US);
H04M1/0262 (EP,US);
H04M1/0274 (EP,US);
H04M1/0277 (EP,US);
H04M1/6058 (EP,US);
H04M1/6066 (EP,US);
H04M2250/02 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2009/49] | H01R11/30, H01R13/62, H04M1/60 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/49] | Title | German: | MAGNETISCHER HÖRGERÄTANSCHLUSS | [2009/49] | English: | MAGNETIC CONNECTOR FOR HEADSET | [2009/49] | French: | CONNECTEUR MAGNÉTIQUE POUR CASQUE D'ÉCOUTE | [2009/49] | Entry into regional phase | 24.07.2009 | National basic fee paid | 24.07.2009 | Designation fee(s) paid | 24.07.2009 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 24.07.2009 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 24.07.2009 | Examination requested [2009/49] | 13.11.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.03.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.05.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 05.11.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.11.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 01.02.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.03.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 30.03.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.12.2011 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.04.2012 | Fee for grant paid | 20.04.2012 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP11188493.8 / EP2418740 | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 13.11.2009 | Opposition(s) | 23.05.2013 | No opposition filed within time limit [2013/31] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.01.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.01.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 11.01.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 04.01.2008 | AT | 22.08.2012 | BE | 22.08.2012 | CY | 22.08.2012 | CZ | 22.08.2012 | DK | 22.08.2012 | EE | 22.08.2012 | FI | 22.08.2012 | HR | 22.08.2012 | IT | 22.08.2012 | LT | 22.08.2012 | LV | 22.08.2012 | MT | 22.08.2012 | PL | 22.08.2012 | RO | 22.08.2012 | SE | 22.08.2012 | SI | 22.08.2012 | SK | 22.08.2012 | TR | 22.08.2012 | BG | 22.11.2012 | NO | 22.11.2012 | GR | 23.11.2012 | ES | 03.12.2012 | IS | 22.12.2012 | PT | 24.12.2012 | LU | 04.01.2013 | CH | 31.01.2013 | LI | 31.01.2013 | MC | 31.01.2013 | [2015/34] |
Former [2015/32] | AT | 22.08.2012 | |
BE | 22.08.2012 | ||
CY | 22.08.2012 | ||
CZ | 22.08.2012 | ||
DK | 22.08.2012 | ||
EE | 22.08.2012 | ||
FI | 22.08.2012 | ||
HR | 22.08.2012 | ||
IT | 22.08.2012 | ||
LT | 22.08.2012 | ||
LV | 22.08.2012 | ||
MT | 22.08.2012 | ||
PL | 22.08.2012 | ||
RO | 22.08.2012 | ||
SE | 22.08.2012 | ||
SI | 22.08.2012 | ||
SK | 22.08.2012 | ||
TR | 22.08.2012 | ||
BG | 22.11.2012 | ||
NO | 22.11.2012 | ||
GR | 23.11.2012 | ||
ES | 03.12.2012 | ||
IS | 22.12.2012 | ||
PT | 24.12.2012 | ||
CH | 31.01.2013 | ||
LI | 31.01.2013 | ||
MC | 31.01.2013 | ||
Former [2014/32] | AT | 22.08.2012 | |
BE | 22.08.2012 | ||
CY | 22.08.2012 | ||
CZ | 22.08.2012 | ||
DK | 22.08.2012 | ||
EE | 22.08.2012 | ||
FI | 22.08.2012 | ||
HR | 22.08.2012 | ||
IT | 22.08.2012 | ||
LT | 22.08.2012 | ||
LV | 22.08.2012 | ||
MT | 22.08.2012 | ||
PL | 22.08.2012 | ||
RO | 22.08.2012 | ||
SE | 22.08.2012 | ||
SI | 22.08.2012 | ||
SK | 22.08.2012 | ||
BG | 22.11.2012 | ||
NO | 22.11.2012 | ||
GR | 23.11.2012 | ||
ES | 03.12.2012 | ||
IS | 22.12.2012 | ||
PT | 24.12.2012 | ||
CH | 31.01.2013 | ||
LI | 31.01.2013 | ||
MC | 31.01.2013 | ||
Former [2013/48] | AT | 22.08.2012 | |
BE | 22.08.2012 | ||
CY | 22.08.2012 | ||
CZ | 22.08.2012 | ||
DK | 22.08.2012 | ||
EE | 22.08.2012 | ||
FI | 22.08.2012 | ||
HR | 22.08.2012 | ||
IT | 22.08.2012 | ||
LT | 22.08.2012 | ||
LV | 22.08.2012 | ||
PL | 22.08.2012 | ||
RO | 22.08.2012 | ||
SE | 22.08.2012 | ||
SI | 22.08.2012 | ||
SK | 22.08.2012 | ||
BG | 22.11.2012 | ||
NO | 22.11.2012 | ||
GR | 23.11.2012 | ||
ES | 03.12.2012 | ||
IS | 22.12.2012 | ||
PT | 24.12.2012 | ||
CH | 31.01.2013 | ||
LI | 31.01.2013 | ||
MC | 31.01.2013 | ||
Former [2013/37] | AT | 22.08.2012 | |
BE | 22.08.2012 | ||
CY | 22.08.2012 | ||
CZ | 22.08.2012 | ||
DK | 22.08.2012 | ||
EE | 22.08.2012 | ||
FI | 22.08.2012 | ||
HR | 22.08.2012 | ||
IT | 22.08.2012 | ||
LT | 22.08.2012 | ||
LV | 22.08.2012 | ||
PL | 22.08.2012 | ||
RO | 22.08.2012 | ||
SE | 22.08.2012 | ||
SI | 22.08.2012 | ||
SK | 22.08.2012 | ||
BG | 22.11.2012 | ||
NO | 22.11.2012 | ||
GR | 23.11.2012 | ||
ES | 03.12.2012 | ||
IS | 22.12.2012 | ||
PT | 24.12.2012 | ||
MC | 31.01.2013 | ||
Former [2013/34] | AT | 22.08.2012 | |
BE | 22.08.2012 | ||
CY | 22.08.2012 | ||
CZ | 22.08.2012 | ||
DK | 22.08.2012 | ||
EE | 22.08.2012 | ||
FI | 22.08.2012 | ||
HR | 22.08.2012 | ||
IT | 22.08.2012 | ||
LT | 22.08.2012 | ||
LV | 22.08.2012 | ||
PL | 22.08.2012 | ||
RO | 22.08.2012 | ||
SE | 22.08.2012 | ||
SI | 22.08.2012 | ||
SK | 22.08.2012 | ||
BG | 22.11.2012 | ||
NO | 22.11.2012 | ||
GR | 23.11.2012 | ||
ES | 03.12.2012 | ||
IS | 22.12.2012 | ||
PT | 24.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/23] | AT | 22.08.2012 | |
BE | 22.08.2012 | ||
CY | 22.08.2012 | ||
CZ | 22.08.2012 | ||
DK | 22.08.2012 | ||
EE | 22.08.2012 | ||
FI | 22.08.2012 | ||
HR | 22.08.2012 | ||
IT | 22.08.2012 | ||
LT | 22.08.2012 | ||
LV | 22.08.2012 | ||
PL | 22.08.2012 | ||
RO | 22.08.2012 | ||
SE | 22.08.2012 | ||
SI | 22.08.2012 | ||
SK | 22.08.2012 | ||
NO | 22.11.2012 | ||
GR | 23.11.2012 | ||
ES | 03.12.2012 | ||
IS | 22.12.2012 | ||
PT | 24.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/22] | AT | 22.08.2012 | |
BE | 22.08.2012 | ||
CY | 22.08.2012 | ||
CZ | 22.08.2012 | ||
DK | 22.08.2012 | ||
EE | 22.08.2012 | ||
FI | 22.08.2012 | ||
HR | 22.08.2012 | ||
LT | 22.08.2012 | ||
LV | 22.08.2012 | ||
SE | 22.08.2012 | ||
SI | 22.08.2012 | ||
NO | 22.11.2012 | ||
GR | 23.11.2012 | ||
ES | 03.12.2012 | ||
IS | 22.12.2012 | ||
PT | 24.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/21] | AT | 22.08.2012 | |
BE | 22.08.2012 | ||
CY | 22.08.2012 | ||
DK | 22.08.2012 | ||
FI | 22.08.2012 | ||
HR | 22.08.2012 | ||
LT | 22.08.2012 | ||
LV | 22.08.2012 | ||
SE | 22.08.2012 | ||
SI | 22.08.2012 | ||
NO | 22.11.2012 | ||
GR | 23.11.2012 | ||
IS | 22.12.2012 | ||
PT | 24.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/13] | AT | 22.08.2012 | |
BE | 22.08.2012 | ||
CY | 22.08.2012 | ||
FI | 22.08.2012 | ||
HR | 22.08.2012 | ||
LT | 22.08.2012 | ||
LV | 22.08.2012 | ||
SE | 22.08.2012 | ||
SI | 22.08.2012 | ||
NO | 22.11.2012 | ||
GR | 23.11.2012 | ||
IS | 22.12.2012 | ||
PT | 24.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/12] | AT | 22.08.2012 | |
BE | 22.08.2012 | ||
CY | 22.08.2012 | ||
FI | 22.08.2012 | ||
HR | 22.08.2012 | ||
LT | 22.08.2012 | ||
LV | 22.08.2012 | ||
SE | 22.08.2012 | ||
SI | 22.08.2012 | ||
NO | 22.11.2012 | ||
GR | 23.11.2012 | ||
IS | 22.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/11] | AT | 22.08.2012 | |
CY | 22.08.2012 | ||
FI | 22.08.2012 | ||
HR | 22.08.2012 | ||
LT | 22.08.2012 | ||
LV | 22.08.2012 | ||
SI | 22.08.2012 | ||
NO | 22.11.2012 | ||
GR | 23.11.2012 | ||
IS | 22.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/10] | AT | 22.08.2012 | |
CY | 22.08.2012 | ||
FI | 22.08.2012 | ||
HR | 22.08.2012 | ||
LT | 22.08.2012 | ||
NO | 22.11.2012 | ||
IS | 22.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/09] | AT | 22.08.2012 | |
FI | 22.08.2012 | ||
LT | 22.08.2012 | ||
NO | 22.11.2012 | ||
Former [2013/08] | AT | 22.08.2012 | |
LT | 22.08.2012 | ||
NO | 22.11.2012 | ||
Former [2013/07] | AT | 22.08.2012 | Cited in | International search | [X]WO03090321 (MAGTRIX CONNECTORS LTD [GB], et al) [X] 1-54 * page 9, lines 9-23 * * page 20, line 28 - page 21, line 9; figures 1-3 * * page 22, line 28 - page 23, line 11; figure 8 *; | [X]WO2006126881 (VARIBEL B V [NL], et al) [X] 1-54 * paragraphs [0057] - [0066]; figures 5,6 *; | [X]US2005239261 (TAI TOMISHIGE [JP], et al) [X] 1-54 * the whole document *; | [X]US2004209489 (CLAPPER EDWARD O [US]) [X] 1-54 * the whole document *; | [X]DE10333403 (ACKERMANN ALBERT GMBH CO [DE]) [X] 1-54 * paragraphs [0026] - [0031]; figure 1 *; | [X]US6464509 (EMBERTY ROBERT GEORGE [US], et al) [X] 1-54 * paragraphs [0025] - [0027]; figure 5 * | by applicant | WO03090321 | WO2006126881 | US2005239261 | US2004209489 | DE10333403 | US6464509 | US20050235873 | US20070620669 |