EP2140364 - METHOD AND SYSTEM OF DELETING FILES FROM A REMOTE SERVER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 08.03.2013 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.03.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 10.04.2013 [2013/15] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hewlett-Packard Development Company, L.P. 11445 Compaq Center Drive West Houston, TX 77070 / US | [2010/01] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HANES, David H 3404 East Harmony Road Fort Collins, Colorado 80528-9599 / US | [2010/01] | Representative(s) | Schoppe, Fritz, et al Schoppe, Zimmermann, Stöckeler & Zinkler Patentanwälte Postfach 246 82043 Pullach bei München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2010/12] | Schoppe, Fritz, et al Schoppe, Zimmermann, Stöckeler & Zinkler Postfach 246 82043 Pullach / DE | ||
Former [2010/01] | Jackson, Richard Eric, et al Carpmaels & Ransford 43-45 Bloomsbury Square London WC1A 2RA / GB | ||
Former [2009/51] | Jackson, Richard Eric, et al Carpmaels & Ransford 43 Bloomsbury Square London WC1A 2RA / GB | Application number, filing date | 08779591.0 | 24.04.2008 | [2010/01] | WO2008US05347 | Priority number, date | US20070740462 | 26.04.2007 Original published format: US 740462 | [2010/01] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2008133986 | Date: | 06.11.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/45] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2140364 | Date: | 06.01.2010 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 06.11.2008 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2010/01] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 26.02.2009 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.03.2012 | Classification | IPC: | G06F17/30 | [2012/16] | CPC: |
G06F16/162 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2010/01] | G06F15/16 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2010/01] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND SYSTEM ZUR LÖSCHUNG VON DATEIEN VON EINEM REMOTE-SERVER | [2010/01] | English: | METHOD AND SYSTEM OF DELETING FILES FROM A REMOTE SERVER | [2010/01] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET SYSTÈME D'EFFACEMENT DE FICHIERS D'UN SERVEUR DISTANT | [2010/01] | Entry into regional phase | 21.10.2009 | National basic fee paid | 21.10.2009 | Search fee paid | 21.10.2009 | Designation fee(s) paid | 21.10.2009 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 21.10.2009 | Examination requested [2010/01] | 16.10.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2013/15] | 21.11.2012 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2013/15] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.04.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [ ] - No further relevant documents disclosed | International search | [X]US6611836 (DAVIS RAY CHARLES [US], et al) [X] 1-10 * See page 2, line 50 - page 8, line 57, and claims *; | [A]WO2007034460 (KONINKL PHILIPS ELECTRONICS NV [NL], et al) [A] 1-10 * See abstract and claims * | [A] - GREG SHULTZ, "Investigating Windows Vista's Recycle Bin Properties", (20060706), URL: http://articles.techrepublic.com.com, XP008119452 [A] 1-10 * . See the section of "The network Connection" * |