EP2158500 - METHOD AND SYSTEM FOR OPTOELECTRONIC DETECTION AND LOCATION OF OBJECTS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 06.03.2015 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.07.2016 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 17.08.2016 [2016/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states COGNEX CORPORATION One Vision Drive Natick, MA 01760-2059 / US | [2010/09] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SILVER, William, M. 25 Arrowhead Road Weston, MA 02493 / US | [2010/09] | Representative(s) | Ford, Esther Mary, et al Marks & Clerk LLP 62-68 Hills Road Cambridge CB2 1LA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2010/49] | Ford, Esther Mary, et al Marks & Clerk LLP 62-68 Hills Road Cambridge CB2 1LA / GB | ||
Former [2010/09] | Rupprecht, Kay Meissner, Bolte & Partner GbR Widenmayerstraße 48 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 08779633.0 | 11.06.2008 | [2010/09] | WO2008US07280 | Priority number, date | US20070763752 | 15.06.2007 Original published format: US 763752 | [2010/09] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2008156608 | Date: | 24.12.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/52] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2158500 | Date: | 03.03.2010 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 24.12.2008 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2010/09] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2158500 | Date: | 30.04.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/18] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 19.02.2009 | Classification | IPC: | G01S7/48, G01S17/89, G01S5/16, G06T7/20 | [2013/29] | CPC: |
G06T7/70 (EP,US);
G06T7/20 (EP,US);
G01S5/16 (EP,US);
G06T2207/30108 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2010/09] | G01S7/48, G01S17/89, G01S17/50, G01S17/88 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2010/09] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND SYSTEM FÜR OPTOELEKTRONISCHE ERKENNUNG UND ORTUNG VON OBJEKTEN | [2010/09] | English: | METHOD AND SYSTEM FOR OPTOELECTRONIC DETECTION AND LOCATION OF OBJECTS | [2010/09] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET SYSTÈME POUR LA DÉTECTION ET LA LOCALISATION OPTOÉLECTRONIQUES D'OBJETS | [2010/09] | Entry into regional phase | 16.12.2009 | National basic fee paid | 16.12.2009 | Designation fee(s) paid | 16.12.2009 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 16.12.2009 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 16.12.2009 | Examination requested [2010/09] | 17.08.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 16.06.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.10.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 30.04.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.07.2013 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.01.2014 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time | 21.03.2014 | Fee for grant paid | 21.03.2014 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP12181715.9 / EP2528041 | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 17.08.2010 | Opposition(s) | 02.02.2015 | No opposition filed within time limit [2015/15] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to fulfill actions required for granting the patent | 21.03.2014 | Request for further processing filed | 21.03.2014 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 02.04.2014 | Decision despatched | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 16.06.2011 | Request for further processing filed | 16.06.2011 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 01.07.2011 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.11.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.06.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.06.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.06.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.06.2010 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   24.11.2010 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 11.06.2008 | AT | 30.04.2014 | BE | 30.04.2014 | CY | 30.04.2014 | CZ | 30.04.2014 | DK | 30.04.2014 | EE | 30.04.2014 | ES | 30.04.2014 | FI | 30.04.2014 | HR | 30.04.2014 | IT | 30.04.2014 | LT | 30.04.2014 | LV | 30.04.2014 | MC | 30.04.2014 | MT | 30.04.2014 | NL | 30.04.2014 | PL | 30.04.2014 | RO | 30.04.2014 | SE | 30.04.2014 | SI | 30.04.2014 | SK | 30.04.2014 | TR | 30.04.2014 | IE | 11.06.2014 | LU | 11.06.2014 | CH | 30.06.2014 | FR | 30.06.2014 | LI | 30.06.2014 | BG | 30.07.2014 | GB | 30.07.2014 | NO | 30.07.2014 | GR | 31.07.2014 | IS | 30.08.2014 | PT | 01.09.2014 | [2016/33] |
Former [2016/32] | HU | 11.06.2008 | |
AT | 30.04.2014 | ||
BE | 30.04.2014 | ||
CY | 30.04.2014 | ||
CZ | 30.04.2014 | ||
DK | 30.04.2014 | ||
EE | 30.04.2014 | ||
ES | 30.04.2014 | ||
FI | 30.04.2014 | ||
HR | 30.04.2014 | ||
IT | 30.04.2014 | ||
LT | 30.04.2014 | ||
LV | 30.04.2014 | ||
MC | 30.04.2014 | ||
MT | 30.04.2014 | ||
NL | 30.04.2014 | ||
PL | 30.04.2014 | ||
RO | 30.04.2014 | ||
SE | 30.04.2014 | ||
SI | 30.04.2014 | ||
SK | 30.04.2014 | ||
IE | 11.06.2014 | ||
LU | 11.06.2014 | ||
CH | 30.06.2014 | ||
FR | 30.06.2014 | ||
LI | 30.06.2014 | ||
BG | 30.07.2014 | ||
GB | 30.07.2014 | ||
NO | 30.07.2014 | ||
GR | 31.07.2014 | ||
IS | 30.08.2014 | ||
PT | 01.09.2014 | ||
Former [2016/16] | AT | 30.04.2014 | |
BE | 30.04.2014 | ||
CY | 30.04.2014 | ||
CZ | 30.04.2014 | ||
DK | 30.04.2014 | ||
EE | 30.04.2014 | ||
ES | 30.04.2014 | ||
FI | 30.04.2014 | ||
HR | 30.04.2014 | ||
IT | 30.04.2014 | ||
LT | 30.04.2014 | ||
LV | 30.04.2014 | ||
MC | 30.04.2014 | ||
MT | 30.04.2014 | ||
NL | 30.04.2014 | ||
PL | 30.04.2014 | ||
RO | 30.04.2014 | ||
SE | 30.04.2014 | ||
SI | 30.04.2014 | ||
SK | 30.04.2014 | ||
IE | 11.06.2014 | ||
LU | 11.06.2014 | ||
CH | 30.06.2014 | ||
FR | 30.06.2014 | ||
LI | 30.06.2014 | ||
BG | 30.07.2014 | ||
GB | 30.07.2014 | ||
NO | 30.07.2014 | ||
GR | 31.07.2014 | ||
IS | 30.08.2014 | ||
PT | 01.09.2014 | ||
Former [2015/36] | AT | 30.04.2014 | |
BE | 30.04.2014 | ||
CY | 30.04.2014 | ||
CZ | 30.04.2014 | ||
DK | 30.04.2014 | ||
EE | 30.04.2014 | ||
ES | 30.04.2014 | ||
FI | 30.04.2014 | ||
HR | 30.04.2014 | ||
IT | 30.04.2014 | ||
LT | 30.04.2014 | ||
LV | 30.04.2014 | ||
MC | 30.04.2014 | ||
NL | 30.04.2014 | ||
PL | 30.04.2014 | ||
RO | 30.04.2014 | ||
SE | 30.04.2014 | ||
SI | 30.04.2014 | ||
SK | 30.04.2014 | ||
IE | 11.06.2014 | ||
LU | 11.06.2014 | ||
CH | 30.06.2014 | ||
FR | 30.06.2014 | ||
LI | 30.06.2014 | ||
BG | 30.07.2014 | ||
GB | 30.07.2014 | ||
NO | 30.07.2014 | ||
GR | 31.07.2014 | ||
IS | 30.08.2014 | ||
PT | 01.09.2014 | ||
Former [2015/24] | AT | 30.04.2014 | |
BE | 30.04.2014 | ||
CY | 30.04.2014 | ||
CZ | 30.04.2014 | ||
DK | 30.04.2014 | ||
EE | 30.04.2014 | ||
ES | 30.04.2014 | ||
FI | 30.04.2014 | ||
HR | 30.04.2014 | ||
IT | 30.04.2014 | ||
LT | 30.04.2014 | ||
LV | 30.04.2014 | ||
MC | 30.04.2014 | ||
NL | 30.04.2014 | ||
PL | 30.04.2014 | ||
RO | 30.04.2014 | ||
SE | 30.04.2014 | ||
SK | 30.04.2014 | ||
IE | 11.06.2014 | ||
LU | 11.06.2014 | ||
CH | 30.06.2014 | ||
FR | 30.06.2014 | ||
LI | 30.06.2014 | ||
BG | 30.07.2014 | ||
GB | 30.07.2014 | ||
NO | 30.07.2014 | ||
GR | 31.07.2014 | ||
IS | 30.08.2014 | ||
PT | 01.09.2014 | ||
Former [2015/21] | AT | 30.04.2014 | |
BE | 30.04.2014 | ||
CY | 30.04.2014 | ||
CZ | 30.04.2014 | ||
DK | 30.04.2014 | ||
EE | 30.04.2014 | ||
ES | 30.04.2014 | ||
FI | 30.04.2014 | ||
HR | 30.04.2014 | ||
IT | 30.04.2014 | ||
LT | 30.04.2014 | ||
LV | 30.04.2014 | ||
MC | 30.04.2014 | ||
NL | 30.04.2014 | ||
PL | 30.04.2014 | ||
RO | 30.04.2014 | ||
SE | 30.04.2014 | ||
SK | 30.04.2014 | ||
IE | 11.06.2014 | ||
LU | 11.06.2014 | ||
CH | 30.06.2014 | ||
LI | 30.06.2014 | ||
BG | 30.07.2014 | ||
NO | 30.07.2014 | ||
GR | 31.07.2014 | ||
IS | 30.08.2014 | ||
PT | 01.09.2014 | ||
Former [2015/20] | AT | 30.04.2014 | |
BE | 30.04.2014 | ||
CY | 30.04.2014 | ||
CZ | 30.04.2014 | ||
DK | 30.04.2014 | ||
EE | 30.04.2014 | ||
ES | 30.04.2014 | ||
FI | 30.04.2014 | ||
HR | 30.04.2014 | ||
IT | 30.04.2014 | ||
LT | 30.04.2014 | ||
LV | 30.04.2014 | ||
MC | 30.04.2014 | ||
NL | 30.04.2014 | ||
PL | 30.04.2014 | ||
RO | 30.04.2014 | ||
SE | 30.04.2014 | ||
SK | 30.04.2014 | ||
LU | 11.06.2014 | ||
CH | 30.06.2014 | ||
LI | 30.06.2014 | ||
BG | 30.07.2014 | ||
NO | 30.07.2014 | ||
GR | 31.07.2014 | ||
IS | 30.08.2014 | ||
PT | 01.09.2014 | ||
Former [2015/18] | AT | 30.04.2014 | |
BE | 30.04.2014 | ||
CY | 30.04.2014 | ||
CZ | 30.04.2014 | ||
DK | 30.04.2014 | ||
EE | 30.04.2014 | ||
ES | 30.04.2014 | ||
FI | 30.04.2014 | ||
HR | 30.04.2014 | ||
IT | 30.04.2014 | ||
LT | 30.04.2014 | ||
LV | 30.04.2014 | ||
MC | 30.04.2014 | ||
NL | 30.04.2014 | ||
PL | 30.04.2014 | ||
RO | 30.04.2014 | ||
SE | 30.04.2014 | ||
SK | 30.04.2014 | ||
LU | 11.06.2014 | ||
BG | 30.07.2014 | ||
NO | 30.07.2014 | ||
GR | 31.07.2014 | ||
IS | 30.08.2014 | ||
PT | 01.09.2014 | ||
Former [2015/11] | AT | 30.04.2014 | |
BE | 30.04.2014 | ||
CY | 30.04.2014 | ||
CZ | 30.04.2014 | ||
DK | 30.04.2014 | ||
EE | 30.04.2014 | ||
ES | 30.04.2014 | ||
FI | 30.04.2014 | ||
HR | 30.04.2014 | ||
LT | 30.04.2014 | ||
LV | 30.04.2014 | ||
MC | 30.04.2014 | ||
NL | 30.04.2014 | ||
PL | 30.04.2014 | ||
RO | 30.04.2014 | ||
SE | 30.04.2014 | ||
SK | 30.04.2014 | ||
LU | 11.06.2014 | ||
BG | 30.07.2014 | ||
NO | 30.07.2014 | ||
GR | 31.07.2014 | ||
IS | 30.08.2014 | ||
PT | 01.09.2014 | ||
Former [2015/10] | AT | 30.04.2014 | |
BE | 30.04.2014 | ||
CY | 30.04.2014 | ||
CZ | 30.04.2014 | ||
DK | 30.04.2014 | ||
EE | 30.04.2014 | ||
ES | 30.04.2014 | ||
FI | 30.04.2014 | ||
HR | 30.04.2014 | ||
LT | 30.04.2014 | ||
LV | 30.04.2014 | ||
MC | 30.04.2014 | ||
NL | 30.04.2014 | ||
PL | 30.04.2014 | ||
SE | 30.04.2014 | ||
SK | 30.04.2014 | ||
LU | 11.06.2014 | ||
BG | 30.07.2014 | ||
NO | 30.07.2014 | ||
GR | 31.07.2014 | ||
IS | 30.08.2014 | ||
PT | 01.09.2014 | ||
Former [2015/09] | AT | 30.04.2014 | |
BE | 30.04.2014 | ||
CY | 30.04.2014 | ||
DK | 30.04.2014 | ||
ES | 30.04.2014 | ||
FI | 30.04.2014 | ||
HR | 30.04.2014 | ||
LT | 30.04.2014 | ||
LV | 30.04.2014 | ||
MC | 30.04.2014 | ||
NL | 30.04.2014 | ||
PL | 30.04.2014 | ||
SE | 30.04.2014 | ||
LU | 11.06.2014 | ||
BG | 30.07.2014 | ||
NO | 30.07.2014 | ||
GR | 31.07.2014 | ||
IS | 30.08.2014 | ||
PT | 01.09.2014 | ||
Former [2015/08] | AT | 30.04.2014 | |
BE | 30.04.2014 | ||
CY | 30.04.2014 | ||
DK | 30.04.2014 | ||
ES | 30.04.2014 | ||
FI | 30.04.2014 | ||
HR | 30.04.2014 | ||
LT | 30.04.2014 | ||
LV | 30.04.2014 | ||
NL | 30.04.2014 | ||
PL | 30.04.2014 | ||
SE | 30.04.2014 | ||
BG | 30.07.2014 | ||
NO | 30.07.2014 | ||
GR | 31.07.2014 | ||
IS | 30.08.2014 | ||
PT | 01.09.2014 | ||
Former [2015/02] | AT | 30.04.2014 | |
CY | 30.04.2014 | ||
ES | 30.04.2014 | ||
FI | 30.04.2014 | ||
HR | 30.04.2014 | ||
LT | 30.04.2014 | ||
LV | 30.04.2014 | ||
NL | 30.04.2014 | ||
PL | 30.04.2014 | ||
SE | 30.04.2014 | ||
BG | 30.07.2014 | ||
NO | 30.07.2014 | ||
GR | 31.07.2014 | ||
IS | 30.08.2014 | ||
PT | 01.09.2014 | ||
Former [2014/51] | AT | 30.04.2014 | |
CY | 30.04.2014 | ||
ES | 30.04.2014 | ||
FI | 30.04.2014 | ||
HR | 30.04.2014 | ||
LT | 30.04.2014 | ||
LV | 30.04.2014 | ||
NL | 30.04.2014 | ||
PL | 30.04.2014 | ||
SE | 30.04.2014 | ||
BG | 30.07.2014 | ||
NO | 30.07.2014 | ||
GR | 31.07.2014 | ||
IS | 30.08.2014 | ||
Former [2014/50] | CY | 30.04.2014 | |
ES | 30.04.2014 | ||
FI | 30.04.2014 | ||
HR | 30.04.2014 | ||
LT | 30.04.2014 | ||
LV | 30.04.2014 | ||
NL | 30.04.2014 | ||
PL | 30.04.2014 | ||
SE | 30.04.2014 | ||
BG | 30.07.2014 | ||
NO | 30.07.2014 | ||
GR | 31.07.2014 | ||
IS | 30.08.2014 | ||
Former [2014/49] | CY | 30.04.2014 | |
FI | 30.04.2014 | ||
LT | 30.04.2014 | ||
BG | 30.07.2014 | ||
NO | 30.07.2014 | ||
IS | 30.08.2014 | ||
Former [2014/48] | CY | 30.04.2014 | |
LT | 30.04.2014 | ||
BG | 30.07.2014 | ||
Former [2014/47] | CY | 30.04.2014 | Cited in | International search | [XY]US4384195 (NOSLER JOHN C) [X] 1,2,13-15,31,35,36,47-49,65 [Y] 3-12,16-30,32-34,37-46,50-68; | [YD]US2005275831 (SILVER WILLIAM M [US]) [YD] 3-12,16-30,32-34,37-46,50-68 * figures 4,8,48 * * paragraph [0127] * * paragraph [0138] * * paragraph [0145] * * paragraph [0341] * * paragraph [0345] * * paragraph [0351] * * paragraph [0353] * * paragraph [0413] * * paragraph [0428] - paragraph [0429] *; | [X]JPS60147602 (YAMATAKE HONEYWELL CO LTD) [X] 1,2,13-15,31,35,36,47-49,65 * abstract *; | [X]US4647979 (URATA SHINJI [JP]) [X] 1,2,13,35,36,47 * figures 1A,1B * * column 3, line 8 - line 53 *; | [X]US6668075 (NAKAMURA AYAKO [JP], et al) [X] 1,2,13,35,36,47 * abstract * * column 3, line 33 - line 57 * * column 4, line 24 - line 29 * * column 5, line 6 - line 30 * | by applicant | US4384195 | US2005275831 | JPS60147602 |