EP2190789 - ENHANCED BIODEGRADATION OF NON-AQUEOUS PHASE LIQUIDS USING SURFACTANT ENHANCED IN-SITU CHEMICAL OXIDATION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 24.12.2010 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.12.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 26.01.2011 [2011/04] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Verutek Technologies, Inc. 65 West Dudley Town Road Bloomfield, CT 06002 / US | [2010/22] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hoag, George E. 69 Summit Road Storrs, CT 06268 / US | 02 /
Collins, John 23 Coates Farm Road Amston, CT 06231 / US | [2010/22] | Representative(s) | dompatent von Kreisler Selting Werner - Partnerschaft von Patent- und Rechtsanwälten mbB Deichmannhaus am Dom Bahnhofsvorplatz 1 50667 Köln / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2010/22] | von Kreisler Selting Werner Deichmannhaus am Dom Bahnhofsvorplatz 1 50667 Köln / DE | Application number, filing date | 08780290.6 | 23.07.2008 | [2010/22] | WO2008US08905 | Priority number, date | US20070935033P | 23.07.2007 Original published format: US 935033 P | [2010/22] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2009014697 | Date: | 29.01.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/05] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2190789 | Date: | 02.06.2010 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 29.01.2009 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2010/22] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 02.07.2009 | Classification | IPC: | C02F1/72, C02F3/30, B09C1/08, B09C1/10 | [2010/22] | CPC: |
B09C1/02 (EP,US);
B09C1/00 (EP,US);
B09C1/08 (EP,US);
B09C1/10 (EP,US);
C02F2101/36 (EP,US);
C02F2103/06 (EP,US);
Y02W10/40 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2010/22] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERBESSERTER BIOLOGISCHER ABBAU VON NICHT IN WÄSSRIGER PHASE VORLIEGENDEN FLÜSSIGKEITEN UNTER VERWENDUNG VON TENSIDVERBESSERTER CHEMISCHER OXIDATION IN SITU | [2010/22] | English: | ENHANCED BIODEGRADATION OF NON-AQUEOUS PHASE LIQUIDS USING SURFACTANT ENHANCED IN-SITU CHEMICAL OXIDATION | [2010/22] | French: | BIODÉGRADATION AMÉLIORÉE DE LIQUIDES EN PHASE NON AQUEUSE À L'AIDE D'UNE OXYDATION CHIMIQUE IN SITU AMÉLIORÉE PAR UN AGENT TENSIO-ACTIF | [2010/22] | Entry into regional phase | 18.02.2010 | National basic fee paid | 18.02.2010 | Designation fee(s) paid | 18.02.2010 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 18.02.2010 | Examination requested [2010/22] | 08.06.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2011/04] | 28.07.2010 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report not received in time [2011/04] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.07.2010 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XY]WO2006055054 (DE TORRES FERNANDO A [US]) [X] 1-5,11,13-16,18-22,25-29,32,35,47-51,53-55,58 * page 8 - page 19; claim - * [Y] 1-59; | [Y]US6719902 (ALVAREZ PEDRO J [US], et al) [Y] 7,8,21-24 * claim - *; | [DPX]WO2007126779 (HOAG GEORGE E [US], et al) [DPX] 58 * page 43 - page 52 * | [Y] - JOHN COLLINS AND GEORGE HOAG, "Coelution Technologies and Surfactant-Enhanced in Situ Oxidation as new breakthrough technologies in the treatment of toxic subsurface contaminants", 11TH ANNUAL GREEN CHEMISTRY AND ENGINEERING CONFERENCE, Washington, (20070628), URL: http://acs.confex.com/acs/green07/techprogram/P42826.HTM, (20090325), XP002521075 [Y] 1-59 * abstract * | [Y] - GOI A ET AL, "Combined chemical and biological treatment of oil contaminated soil", CHEMOSPHERE, PERGAMON PRESS, OXFORD, GB, vol. 63, no. 10, ISSN 0045-6535, (20060601), pages 1754 - 1763, (20060601), XP025041839 [Y] 1-59 * page 1755, column R, paragraph 2 - page 1757, column L * * page 1762, column L, paragraph L - column R * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.chemosphere.2005.09.023 |