EP2120713 - BIOMETRICS BASED ON LOCALLY CONSISTENT FEATURES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 23.09.2016 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.09.2016 | Withdrawal of application | published on 26.10.2016 [2016/43] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states HID Global Corporation 611 Center Ridge Drive Austin, TX 78753 / US | [2015/28] |
Former [2009/48] | For all designated states Lumidigm, Inc. 801 University Blvd. SE Suite 302 Albuquerque, NM 87106 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ROWE, Robert, K. 229 Ashley Lane Corrales, NM 87048 / US | [2009/48] | Representative(s) | DTS Zürich Bahnhofstrasse 100 8001 Zürich / CH | [N/P] |
Former [2009/48] | Howell, Matthew Dafydd Withers & Rogers LLP Goldings House 2 Hays Lane London SE1 2HW / GB | Application number, filing date | 08780481.1 | 19.03.2008 | [2009/48] | WO2008US57476 | Priority number, date | US20070896063P | 21.03.2007 Original published format: US 896063 P | [2009/48] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2008134135 | Date: | 06.11.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/45] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2120713 | Date: | 25.11.2009 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 06.11.2008 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2009/48] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 18.06.2009 | Classification | IPC: | A61B5/117, G06K9/00 | [2009/48] | CPC: |
A61B5/0059 (EP,US);
G06V40/1341 (EP,KR,US);
A61B5/0062 (EP,US);
A61B5/1172 (EP,US);
A61B5/6826 (EP,US);
A61B5/6838 (EP,US);
G01N21/25 (KR);
G06V10/54 (KR);
G06V30/144 (EP,US);
G06V40/1324 (EP,US);
G06V40/1359 (KR);
G06V40/1382 (KR);
A61B2562/0233 (EP,US);
A61B2562/046 (EP,US);
A61B5/726 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/48] | Title | German: | AUF LOKAL EINHEITLICHEN EIGENSCHAFTEN BASIERENDE BIOMETRIE | [2009/48] | English: | BIOMETRICS BASED ON LOCALLY CONSISTENT FEATURES | [2009/48] | French: | BIOMÉTRIE À BASE DE CARACTÉRISTIQUES LOCALEMENT COHÉRENTES | [2009/48] | Entry into regional phase | 03.09.2009 | National basic fee paid | 03.09.2009 | Designation fee(s) paid | 17.11.2009 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 03.09.2009 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 17.11.2009 | Examination requested [2009/52] | 07.05.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 24.10.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.10.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 17.03.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.08.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 17.02.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.09.2016 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2016/43] | 15.12.2016 | Date of oral proceedings | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 07.05.2012 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 08.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.03.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 11.03.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 12.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 10.03.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 10.03.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US2002183624 (ROWE ROBERT K [US], et al); | [A]US2004240713 (HATA FUMIO [JP]); | [A]US2006062438 (ROWE ROBERT K [US]); | [X]US2006110015 (ROWE ROBERT K [US]); | [A]US2007030475 (ROWE ROBERT K [US], et al) | by applicant | US2006110015 | US20050219006 | US20060458619 |