EP2162827 - INTERFACES FOR DIGITAL MEDIA PROCESSING [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 12.02.2021 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 06.03.2020 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 11.11.2019 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 24.03.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.06.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY, HU, MT | published on 27.07.2022 [2022/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Microsoft Technology Licensing, LLC One Microsoft Way Redmond, WA 98052 / US | [2020/15] |
Former [2015/12] | For all designated states Microsoft Technology Licensing, LLC One Microsoft Way Redmond, WA 98052 / US | ||
Former [2010/11] | For all designated states Microsoft Corporation One Microsoft Way Redmond, WA 98052-6399 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
RANGARAJAN, Rajasekaran c/o Microsoft Corporation International Patents One Microsoft Way Redmond, WA 98052-6399 / US | 02 /
REGEN, Martin c/o Microsoft Corporation International Patents One Microsoft Way Redmond, WA 98052-6399 / US | 03 /
RUSSELL, Richard, W. c/o Microsoft Corporation International Patents One Microsoft Way Redmond, WA 98052-6399 / US | [2020/15] |
Former [2010/11] | 01 /
RANGARAJAN, Rajasekaran c/o Microsoft Corporation International Patents One Microsoft Way Redmond, WA 98052-6399 / US | ||
02 /
REGEN, Martin c/o Microsoft Corporation International Patents One Microsoft Way Redmond, WA 98052-6399 / US | |||
03 /
RUSSELL, Richard, W. c/o Microsoft Corporation International Patents One Microsoft Way Redmond, WA 98052-6399 / US | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstraße 4 80802 München / DE | [2020/15] |
Former [2010/11] | Goddar, Heinz J., et al Forrester & Boehmert Pettenkoferstrasse 20-22 80336 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 08780956.2 | 24.06.2008 | [2010/11] | WO2008US68025 | Priority number, date | US20070824720 | 30.06.2007 Original published format: US 824720 | [2010/11] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2009006107 | Date: | 08.01.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/02] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2162827 | Date: | 17.03.2010 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 08.01.2009 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2010/11] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2162827 | Date: | 08.04.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/15] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 05.03.2009 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.04.2011 | Classification | IPC: | G11B27/10, G06F9/54, H04N5/85, H04N21/432, H04N21/443, H04N21/426, // G11B20/10, G06F15/163 | [2019/41] | CPC: |
G06F9/544 (EP,KR,US);
G06F3/0611 (KR,US);
H04L65/762 (US);
G06F3/0656 (KR,US);
G06F9/541 (US);
G11B20/10527 (EP,KR,US);
H04N21/42646 (EP,KR,US);
H04N21/4325 (EP,KR,US);
H04N21/4431 (EP,KR,US);
H04N5/85 (EP,KR,US);
G11B2020/10537 (EP,KR,US);
G11B2020/10666 (EP,KR,US);
|
Former IPC [2011/18] | G06F15/16, G06F9/46, G06F12/08, G06F13/28, G11B27/10, // G11B20/10, G06F15/163 | ||
Former IPC [2010/11] | G06F15/16 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2020/15] |
Former [2010/11] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SCHNITTSTELLEN ZUR VERARBEITUNG DIGITALER MEDIEN | [2010/11] | English: | INTERFACES FOR DIGITAL MEDIA PROCESSING | [2010/11] | French: | INTERFACES POUR TRAITEMENT DE SUPPORTS NUMÉRIQUES | [2010/11] | Entry into regional phase | 05.11.2009 | National basic fee paid | 05.11.2009 | Search fee paid | 05.11.2009 | Designation fee(s) paid | 05.11.2009 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 05.11.2009 | Examination requested [2010/11] | 13.10.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 28.03.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 09.10.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.11.2019 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.03.2020 | Fee for grant paid | 02.03.2020 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 02.03.2020 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 28.03.2017 | Opposition(s) | 12.01.2021 | No opposition filed within time limit [2021/11] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.05.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.06.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 07.06.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 09.06.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 05.06.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 31.03.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 16.06.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 12.06.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 13.06.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 12 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 24.06.2008 | AT | 08.04.2020 | CY | 08.04.2020 | CZ | 08.04.2020 | DK | 08.04.2020 | EE | 08.04.2020 | ES | 08.04.2020 | FI | 08.04.2020 | HR | 08.04.2020 | IT | 08.04.2020 | LT | 08.04.2020 | LV | 08.04.2020 | MC | 08.04.2020 | MT | 08.04.2020 | NL | 08.04.2020 | PL | 08.04.2020 | RO | 08.04.2020 | SE | 08.04.2020 | SI | 08.04.2020 | SK | 08.04.2020 | TR | 08.04.2020 | IE | 24.06.2020 | LU | 24.06.2020 | BE | 30.06.2020 | CH | 30.06.2020 | LI | 30.06.2020 | BG | 08.07.2020 | NO | 08.07.2020 | GR | 09.07.2020 | IS | 08.08.2020 | PT | 17.08.2020 | [2022/27] |
Former [2022/26] | AT | 08.04.2020 | |
CZ | 08.04.2020 | ||
DK | 08.04.2020 | ||
EE | 08.04.2020 | ||
ES | 08.04.2020 | ||
FI | 08.04.2020 | ||
HR | 08.04.2020 | ||
IT | 08.04.2020 | ||
LT | 08.04.2020 | ||
LV | 08.04.2020 | ||
MC | 08.04.2020 | ||
NL | 08.04.2020 | ||
PL | 08.04.2020 | ||
RO | 08.04.2020 | ||
SE | 08.04.2020 | ||
SI | 08.04.2020 | ||
SK | 08.04.2020 | ||
TR | 08.04.2020 | ||
IE | 24.06.2020 | ||
LU | 24.06.2020 | ||
BE | 30.06.2020 | ||
CH | 30.06.2020 | ||
LI | 30.06.2020 | ||
BG | 08.07.2020 | ||
NO | 08.07.2020 | ||
GR | 09.07.2020 | ||
IS | 08.08.2020 | ||
PT | 17.08.2020 | ||
Former [2021/24] | AT | 08.04.2020 | |
CZ | 08.04.2020 | ||
DK | 08.04.2020 | ||
EE | 08.04.2020 | ||
ES | 08.04.2020 | ||
FI | 08.04.2020 | ||
HR | 08.04.2020 | ||
IT | 08.04.2020 | ||
LT | 08.04.2020 | ||
LV | 08.04.2020 | ||
MC | 08.04.2020 | ||
NL | 08.04.2020 | ||
PL | 08.04.2020 | ||
RO | 08.04.2020 | ||
SE | 08.04.2020 | ||
SI | 08.04.2020 | ||
SK | 08.04.2020 | ||
IE | 24.06.2020 | ||
LU | 24.06.2020 | ||
BE | 30.06.2020 | ||
CH | 30.06.2020 | ||
LI | 30.06.2020 | ||
BG | 08.07.2020 | ||
NO | 08.07.2020 | ||
GR | 09.07.2020 | ||
IS | 08.08.2020 | ||
PT | 17.08.2020 | ||
Former [2021/20] | AT | 08.04.2020 | |
CZ | 08.04.2020 | ||
DK | 08.04.2020 | ||
EE | 08.04.2020 | ||
ES | 08.04.2020 | ||
FI | 08.04.2020 | ||
HR | 08.04.2020 | ||
IT | 08.04.2020 | ||
LT | 08.04.2020 | ||
LV | 08.04.2020 | ||
MC | 08.04.2020 | ||
NL | 08.04.2020 | ||
PL | 08.04.2020 | ||
RO | 08.04.2020 | ||
SE | 08.04.2020 | ||
SK | 08.04.2020 | ||
IE | 24.06.2020 | ||
LU | 24.06.2020 | ||
CH | 30.06.2020 | ||
LI | 30.06.2020 | ||
BG | 08.07.2020 | ||
NO | 08.07.2020 | ||
GR | 09.07.2020 | ||
IS | 08.08.2020 | ||
PT | 17.08.2020 | ||
Former [2021/15] | AT | 08.04.2020 | |
CZ | 08.04.2020 | ||
DK | 08.04.2020 | ||
EE | 08.04.2020 | ||
ES | 08.04.2020 | ||
FI | 08.04.2020 | ||
HR | 08.04.2020 | ||
IT | 08.04.2020 | ||
LT | 08.04.2020 | ||
LV | 08.04.2020 | ||
MC | 08.04.2020 | ||
NL | 08.04.2020 | ||
PL | 08.04.2020 | ||
RO | 08.04.2020 | ||
SE | 08.04.2020 | ||
SK | 08.04.2020 | ||
LU | 24.06.2020 | ||
BG | 08.07.2020 | ||
NO | 08.07.2020 | ||
GR | 09.07.2020 | ||
IS | 08.08.2020 | ||
PT | 17.08.2020 | ||
Former [2021/10] | AT | 08.04.2020 | |
CZ | 08.04.2020 | ||
DK | 08.04.2020 | ||
EE | 08.04.2020 | ||
ES | 08.04.2020 | ||
FI | 08.04.2020 | ||
HR | 08.04.2020 | ||
IT | 08.04.2020 | ||
LT | 08.04.2020 | ||
LV | 08.04.2020 | ||
MC | 08.04.2020 | ||
NL | 08.04.2020 | ||
PL | 08.04.2020 | ||
RO | 08.04.2020 | ||
SE | 08.04.2020 | ||
SK | 08.04.2020 | ||
BG | 08.07.2020 | ||
NO | 08.07.2020 | ||
GR | 09.07.2020 | ||
IS | 08.08.2020 | ||
PT | 17.08.2020 | ||
Former [2021/09] | AT | 08.04.2020 | |
CZ | 08.04.2020 | ||
DK | 08.04.2020 | ||
EE | 08.04.2020 | ||
ES | 08.04.2020 | ||
FI | 08.04.2020 | ||
HR | 08.04.2020 | ||
IT | 08.04.2020 | ||
LT | 08.04.2020 | ||
LV | 08.04.2020 | ||
MC | 08.04.2020 | ||
NL | 08.04.2020 | ||
RO | 08.04.2020 | ||
SE | 08.04.2020 | ||
BG | 08.07.2020 | ||
NO | 08.07.2020 | ||
GR | 09.07.2020 | ||
IS | 08.08.2020 | ||
PT | 17.08.2020 | ||
Former [2021/08] | DK | 08.04.2020 | |
ES | 08.04.2020 | ||
FI | 08.04.2020 | ||
HR | 08.04.2020 | ||
LT | 08.04.2020 | ||
LV | 08.04.2020 | ||
NL | 08.04.2020 | ||
RO | 08.04.2020 | ||
SE | 08.04.2020 | ||
BG | 08.07.2020 | ||
NO | 08.07.2020 | ||
GR | 09.07.2020 | ||
IS | 08.08.2020 | ||
PT | 17.08.2020 | ||
Former [2021/01] | FI | 08.04.2020 | |
HR | 08.04.2020 | ||
LT | 08.04.2020 | ||
LV | 08.04.2020 | ||
NL | 08.04.2020 | ||
SE | 08.04.2020 | ||
BG | 08.07.2020 | ||
NO | 08.07.2020 | ||
GR | 09.07.2020 | ||
IS | 08.08.2020 | ||
PT | 17.08.2020 | ||
Former [2020/50] | FI | 08.04.2020 | |
HR | 08.04.2020 | ||
LT | 08.04.2020 | ||
LV | 08.04.2020 | ||
NL | 08.04.2020 | ||
SE | 08.04.2020 | ||
NO | 08.07.2020 | ||
GR | 09.07.2020 | ||
IS | 08.08.2020 | ||
PT | 17.08.2020 | ||
Former [2020/48] | FI | 08.04.2020 | |
LT | 08.04.2020 | ||
NL | 08.04.2020 | ||
SE | 08.04.2020 | ||
NO | 08.07.2020 | ||
IS | 08.08.2020 | ||
PT | 17.08.2020 | ||
Former [2020/47] | LT | 08.04.2020 | |
NO | 08.07.2020 | ||
IS | 08.08.2020 | ||
Former [2020/46] | IS | 08.08.2020 | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]US6105119 (KERR JEFFREY L [US], et al) [X] 1-3,5-12 * column 19 - column 32 * * column 45 - column 53 * * figures 16-20, 39,57 * [Y] 4; | [A]WO2006059449 (SONY CORP [JP], et al) [A] 7 * abstract *; | EP1850339 [ ] (SONY CORP [JP], et al) [ ] * paragraph [0032] - paragraph [0035] *; | [IA] - D. Melpignano, P. Sen, "Using OpenMAX Integration LAyer with Gstreamer -White Paper- Version 1.0", (20060424), INTERNET ARTICLE, URL: http://www.khronos.org/files/openmax/whitepapers/OpenMAX_IL_with_GSstreamer.pdf, (20110324), XP002630449 [I] 1,2,8-12 * the whole document * [A] 3,5-7 | [Y] - Phil Howard, "VRB - Virtual Ring Buffer", (20060802), URL: http://vrb.slashusr.org/, (20110328), XP002630450 [Y] 4 * the whole document * | International search | [A]US6892242 (TAMAYAMA KEN [JP]) [A] 1-20 * See line 52 in column 1 to line53 in column 2 and claims 1-18. *; | [A]US2005209719 (BECKERT RICHARD D [US], et al) [A] 1-20* See paragraph [11]-[14]. *; | [A]US6983467 (ENGSTROM G ERIC [US], et al) [A] 1-20 * See line 9 to line 34 in column 6 and claims 1-18. *; | [A]US7013468 (ABERCROMBIE PHIL J [US], et al) [A] 1-20 * See figure 3 and claims 1-36. * | by applicant | US6105119 |