Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2006122001 | ![]() | 12.07.2007 | A3 | WO2006122001 | 16.11.2006 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US68200205 | 18.05.2005 | US67820905 | 06.05.2005 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | US8181100 | ![]() | 15.05.2012 | B1 | Priority number | Date | US2685708 | 07.02.2008 | US35915909 | 23.01.2009 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2020077981 | ![]() | 12.03.2020 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US43051106 | 08.05.2006 | US201615331899 | 23.10.2016 | US43111806 | 08.05.2006 | US201615009745 | 28.01.2016 | US2318308 | 24.01.2008 | US95731607 | 22.08.2007 | US43109306 | 08.05.2006 | US201313844408 | 15.03.2013 | US201916680100 | 11.11.2019 | US14740108 | 26.06.2008 | US93728007 | 26.06.2007 | US43114006 | 08.05.2006 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2019357876 | ![]() | 28.11.2019 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US68200205 | 18.05.2005 | US43051106 | 08.05.2006 | US43111806 | 08.05.2006 | US201916530491 | 02.08.2019 | US201615092588 | 06.04.2016 | US43109306 | 08.05.2006 | US67820905 | 06.05.2005 | US93728007 | 26.06.2007 | US43114006 | 08.05.2006 | US14741308 | 26.06.2008 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2016228019 | ![]() | 11.08.2016 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US2317608 | 24.01.2008 | US201615131030 | 18.04.2016 | US2318308 | 24.01.2008 | US67820905 | 06.05.2005 | US35915909 | 23.01.2009 | US2317908 | 24.01.2008 | US68200205 | 18.05.2005 | US43051106 | 08.05.2006 | US43111806 | 08.05.2006 | US35919509 | 23.01.2009 | US43109306 | 08.05.2006 | US95731607 | 22.08.2007 | US93728007 | 26.06.2007 | US43114006 | 08.05.2006 | US14740108 | 26.06.2008 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2013289417 | ![]() | 31.10.2013 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US68200205 | 18.05.2005 | US43051106 | 08.05.2006 | US43111806 | 08.05.2006 | US2318308 | 24.01.2008 | US95731607 | 22.08.2007 | US43109306 | 08.05.2006 | US201313844408 | 15.03.2013 | US67820905 | 06.05.2005 | US14740108 | 26.06.2008 | US93728007 | 26.06.2007 | US43114006 | 08.05.2006 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | US9339207 | ![]() | 17.05.2016 | B2 | US2009177090 | 09.07.2009 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US2317608 | 24.01.2008 | US2318308 | 24.01.2008 | US67820905 | 06.05.2005 | US2317908 | 24.01.2008 | US68200205 | 18.05.2005 | US43051106 | 08.05.2006 | US43111806 | 08.05.2006 | US35919509 | 23.01.2009 | US43109306 | 08.05.2006 | US95731607 | 22.08.2007 | US93728007 | 26.06.2007 | US43114006 | 08.05.2006 | US14740108 | 26.06.2008 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2009118612 | ![]() | 07.05.2009 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US68200205 | 18.05.2005 | US43051106 | 08.05.2006 | US43111806 | 08.05.2006 | US43109306 | 08.05.2006 | US67820905 | 06.05.2005 | US93728007 | 26.06.2007 | US43114006 | 08.05.2006 | US14741308 | 26.06.2008 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | US8597193 | ![]() | 03.12.2013 | B2 | US2009005675 | 01.01.2009 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US68200205 | 18.05.2005 | US43051106 | 08.05.2006 | US43111806 | 08.05.2006 | US2318308 | 24.01.2008 | US95731607 | 22.08.2007 | US43109306 | 08.05.2006 | US67820905 | 06.05.2005 | US14740108 | 26.06.2008 | US93728007 | 26.06.2007 | US43114006 | 08.05.2006 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | US9204819 | ![]() | 08.12.2015 | B2 | US2007016072 | 18.01.2007 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US68200205 | 18.05.2005 | US67820905 | 06.05.2005 | US43114006 | 08.05.2006 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | US9198600 | ![]() | 01.12.2015 | B2 | US2007016070 | 18.01.2007 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US68200205 | 18.05.2005 | US43111806 | 08.05.2006 | US67820905 | 06.05.2005 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2007016069 | ![]() | 18.01.2007 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US68200205 | 18.05.2005 | US43109306 | 08.05.2006 | US67820905 | 06.05.2005 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | US8409103 | ![]() | 02.04.2013 | B2 | US2007016068 | 18.01.2007 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US68200205 | 18.05.2005 | US43051106 | 08.05.2006 | US67820905 | 06.05.2005 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | US12150716 | ![]() | 26.11.2024 | B2 | US2019321110 | 24.10.2019 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US68200205 | 18.05.2005 | US43111806 | 08.05.2006 | US201514953391 | 29.11.2015 | US67820905 | 06.05.2005 | US201916458656 | 01.07.2019 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | US10470743 | ![]() | 12.11.2019 | B2 | US2017035392 | 09.02.2017 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201615009745 | 28.01.2016 | US2318308 | 24.01.2008 | US67820905 | 06.05.2005 | US68200205 | 18.05.2005 | US43051106 | 08.05.2006 | US201615331899 | 23.10.2016 | US43111806 | 08.05.2006 | US43109306 | 08.05.2006 | US95731607 | 22.08.2007 | US201313844408 | 15.03.2013 | US93728007 | 26.06.2007 | US43114006 | 08.05.2006 | US14740108 | 26.06.2008 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | US10368837 | ![]() | 06.08.2019 | B2 | US2016220226 | 04.08.2016 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US68200205 | 18.05.2005 | US43051106 | 08.05.2006 | US43111806 | 08.05.2006 | US201615092588 | 06.04.2016 | US43109306 | 08.05.2006 | US67820905 | 06.05.2005 | US93728007 | 26.06.2007 | US43114006 | 08.05.2006 | US14741308 | 26.06.2008 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | US10335240 | ![]() | 02.07.2019 | B2 | US2016151118 | 02.06.2016 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US68200205 | 18.05.2005 | US43111806 | 08.05.2006 | US201514953391 | 29.11.2015 | US67820905 | 06.05.2005 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | US10321890 | ![]() | 18.06.2019 | B2 | US2016143560 | 26.05.2016 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US68200205 | 18.05.2005 | US43051106 | 08.05.2006 | US43111806 | 08.05.2006 | US201615009745 | 28.01.2016 | US2318308 | 24.01.2008 | US95731607 | 22.08.2007 | US43109306 | 08.05.2006 | US201313844408 | 15.03.2013 | US67820905 | 06.05.2005 | US14740108 | 26.06.2008 | US93728007 | 26.06.2007 | US43114006 | 08.05.2006 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP5833079B | ![]() | 16.12.2015 | B2 | JP2014050727 | 20.03.2014 | A | Priority number | Date | US68200205 | 18.05.2005 | US67820905 | 06.05.2005 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2012066098 | ![]() | 05.04.2012 | A | Priority number | Date | US68200205 | 18.05.2005 | US67820905 | 06.05.2005 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP5660890B | ![]() | 28.01.2015 | B2 | JP2010532227 | 07.10.2010 | A | Priority number | Date | US2318308 | 24.01.2008 | US95731607 | 22.08.2007 | WO2008US68422 | 26.06.2008 | US93728007 | 26.06.2007 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP4972639B | ![]() | 11.07.2012 | B2 | JP2008541799 | 27.11.2008 | A | Priority number | Date | US68200205 | 18.05.2005 | WO2006US17673 | 08.05.2006 | US67820905 | 06.05.2005 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2474268 | ![]() | 10.07.2013 | B1 | EP2474268 | 11.07.2012 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US68200205 | 18.05.2005 | US67820905 | 06.05.2005 | EP06759289 | 08.05.2006 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1887940 | ![]() | 26.06.2013 | B1 | EP1887940 | 16.12.2009 | A4 | EP1887940 | 20.02.2008 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US68200205 | 18.05.2005 | WO2006US17673 | 08.05.2006 | US67820905 | 06.05.2005 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2691211 | ![]() | 21.03.2017 | C | CA2691211 | 31.12.2008 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US2318308 | 24.01.2008 | US95731607 | 22.08.2007 | WO2008US68422 | 26.06.2008 | US93728007 | 26.06.2007 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2170162 | ![]() | 23.08.2017 | B1 | EP2170162 | 07.04.2010 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US2318308 | 24.01.2008 | US95731607 | 22.08.2007 | WO2008US68422 | 26.06.2008 | US93728007 | 26.06.2007 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | BRPI0611222 | 22.02.2011 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US68200205 | 18.05.2005 | WO2006US17673 | 08.05.2006 | US67820905 | 06.05.2005 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN101208045B | 20.06.2012 | B | CN101208045 | 25.06.2008 | A | Priority number | Date | US68200205 | 18.05.2005 | WO2006US17673 | 08.05.2006 | US67820905 | 06.05.2005 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN101854853B | 06.11.2013 | B | CN101854853 | 06.10.2010 | A | Priority number | Date | US2318308 | 24.01.2008 | US95731607 | 22.08.2007 | WO2008US68422 | 26.06.2008 | US93728007 | 26.06.2007 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | ES2425388T | 15.10.2013 | T3 | Priority number | Date | US68200205 | 18.05.2005 | WO2006US17673 | 08.05.2006 | US67820905 | 06.05.2005 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | ES2425779T | 17.10.2013 | T3 | Priority number | Date | US68200205 | 18.05.2005 | US67820905 | 06.05.2005 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2009003138 | ![]() | 31.12.2008 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US2318308 | 24.01.2008 | US95731607 | 22.08.2007 | US93728007 | 26.06.2007 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP5963834B | ![]() | 03.08.2016 | B2 | JP2015091325 | 14.05.2015 | A | Priority number | Date | US2318308 | 24.01.2008 | US95731607 | 22.08.2007 | US93728007 | 26.06.2007 |