Extract from the Register of European Patents
EP Event history: EP2176443
Date |
Description |
European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
13.07.2012 |
Change - extension states |
published on 15.08.2012 [2012/33] |
22.06.2012 |
Application deemed to be withdrawn |
published on 25.07.2012 [2012/30] |
02.03.2012 |
New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit |
|
30.08.2011 |
New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: despatch of communication + time limit |
|
19.08.2011 |
Change - representative |
published on 21.09.2011 [2011/38] |
17.12.2010 |
New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: payment of fee |
|
17.12.2010 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
31.08.2010 |
New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: despatch of communication + time limit |
|
08.04.2010 |
Amendment by applicant |
|
19.03.2010 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 21.04.2010 [2010/16] |
19.03.2010 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 21.04.2010 [2010/16] |
04.03.2010 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
16.02.2010 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
10.02.2010 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
19.05.2009 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
06.02.2009 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
29.01.2009 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
27.08.2008 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|