EP2174084 - INFRARED SOLVENT STRIPPING PROCESS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 23.01.2015 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.07.2016 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 17.08.2016 [2016/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states E. I. du Pont de Nemours and Company 1007 Market Street Wilmington, DE 19898 / US | [2010/15] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LAXTON, Christel, Berta 2210 Atlantic Street Hopewell, Virginia 23860 / US | 02 /
WISEMAN, B., Lynne 421 South Laurel Street Richmond, Virginia 23220 / US | 03 /
NEWTON, Christopher, William 3713 Ellwood Avenue Richmond, Virginia 23221 / US | 04 /
FRISK, Simon K710 Colgate Lane Newark, Delaware 19711 / US | [2010/20] |
Former [2010/15] | 01 /
LAXTON, Christel, Berta 2210 Atlantic Street Hopewell, Virginia 23860 / US | ||
02 /
WISEMAN, B., Lynne 421 South Laurel Street Richmond, Virginia 23220 / US | |||
03 /
NEWTON, Christopher, William 3713 Ellwood Avenue Richmond, Virginia 23221 / US | |||
04 /
FRISK, Simon 2707 Eagle Run Lane Richmond, Virginia 23236 / US | Representative(s) | Matthews, Derek Peter Dehns St Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8JD / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2014/12] | Matthews, Derek Peter Dehns St Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8JD / GB | ||
Former [2010/15] | Matthews, Derek Peter Dehns St Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8JD / GB | Application number, filing date | 08781650.0 | 11.07.2008 | [2010/15] | WO2008US69717 | Priority number, date | US20070959045P | 11.07.2007 Original published format: US 959045 P | [2010/15] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2009009707 | Date: | 15.01.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/03] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2174084 | Date: | 14.04.2010 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.01.2009 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2010/15] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2174084 | Date: | 19.03.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/12] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 15.01.2009 | Classification | IPC: | F26B3/30, F26B13/10, F26B13/30 | [2014/04] | CPC: |
F26B3/30 (EP);
F26B13/101 (EP);
F26B13/30 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2010/15] | F26B3/00, D04H3/02 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2010/15] | Title | German: | INFRAROT-LÖSUNGSMITTELABSTREIFVERFAHREN | [2010/15] | English: | INFRARED SOLVENT STRIPPING PROCESS | [2010/15] | French: | PROCESSUS DE DÉCAPAGE DE SOLVANT INFRAROUGE | [2010/15] | Entry into regional phase | 30.11.2009 | National basic fee paid | 30.11.2009 | Designation fee(s) paid | 30.11.2009 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 30.11.2009 | Examination requested [2010/15] | 21.06.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 08.02.2011 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 21.03.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.01.2014 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.02.2014 | Fee for grant paid | 10.02.2014 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 21.06.2010 | Opposition(s) | 22.12.2014 | No opposition filed within time limit [2015/09] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 21.03.2011 | Request for further processing filed | 21.03.2011 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 05.04.2011 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.07.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.07.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.07.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 10.07.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 11.07.2008 | AT | 19.03.2014 | BE | 19.03.2014 | CY | 19.03.2014 | CZ | 19.03.2014 | DK | 19.03.2014 | EE | 19.03.2014 | ES | 19.03.2014 | FI | 19.03.2014 | HR | 19.03.2014 | IT | 19.03.2014 | LT | 19.03.2014 | LV | 19.03.2014 | MC | 19.03.2014 | MT | 19.03.2014 | NL | 19.03.2014 | PL | 19.03.2014 | RO | 19.03.2014 | SE | 19.03.2014 | SI | 19.03.2014 | SK | 19.03.2014 | TR | 19.03.2014 | BG | 19.06.2014 | NO | 19.06.2014 | GR | 20.06.2014 | IE | 11.07.2014 | LU | 11.07.2014 | IS | 19.07.2014 | PT | 21.07.2014 | CH | 31.07.2014 | LI | 31.07.2014 | [2016/33] |
Former [2016/32] | HU | 11.07.2008 | |
AT | 19.03.2014 | ||
BE | 19.03.2014 | ||
CY | 19.03.2014 | ||
CZ | 19.03.2014 | ||
DK | 19.03.2014 | ||
EE | 19.03.2014 | ||
ES | 19.03.2014 | ||
FI | 19.03.2014 | ||
HR | 19.03.2014 | ||
IT | 19.03.2014 | ||
LT | 19.03.2014 | ||
LV | 19.03.2014 | ||
MC | 19.03.2014 | ||
MT | 19.03.2014 | ||
NL | 19.03.2014 | ||
PL | 19.03.2014 | ||
RO | 19.03.2014 | ||
SE | 19.03.2014 | ||
SI | 19.03.2014 | ||
SK | 19.03.2014 | ||
BG | 19.06.2014 | ||
NO | 19.06.2014 | ||
GR | 20.06.2014 | ||
IE | 11.07.2014 | ||
LU | 11.07.2014 | ||
IS | 19.07.2014 | ||
PT | 21.07.2014 | ||
CH | 31.07.2014 | ||
LI | 31.07.2014 | ||
Former [2016/28] | AT | 19.03.2014 | |
BE | 19.03.2014 | ||
CY | 19.03.2014 | ||
CZ | 19.03.2014 | ||
DK | 19.03.2014 | ||
EE | 19.03.2014 | ||
ES | 19.03.2014 | ||
FI | 19.03.2014 | ||
HR | 19.03.2014 | ||
IT | 19.03.2014 | ||
LT | 19.03.2014 | ||
LV | 19.03.2014 | ||
MC | 19.03.2014 | ||
MT | 19.03.2014 | ||
NL | 19.03.2014 | ||
PL | 19.03.2014 | ||
RO | 19.03.2014 | ||
SE | 19.03.2014 | ||
SI | 19.03.2014 | ||
SK | 19.03.2014 | ||
BG | 19.06.2014 | ||
NO | 19.06.2014 | ||
GR | 20.06.2014 | ||
IE | 11.07.2014 | ||
LU | 11.07.2014 | ||
IS | 19.07.2014 | ||
PT | 21.07.2014 | ||
CH | 31.07.2014 | ||
LI | 31.07.2014 | ||
Former [2016/21] | AT | 19.03.2014 | |
BE | 19.03.2014 | ||
CY | 19.03.2014 | ||
CZ | 19.03.2014 | ||
DK | 19.03.2014 | ||
EE | 19.03.2014 | ||
ES | 19.03.2014 | ||
FI | 19.03.2014 | ||
HR | 19.03.2014 | ||
IT | 19.03.2014 | ||
LT | 19.03.2014 | ||
LV | 19.03.2014 | ||
MC | 19.03.2014 | ||
NL | 19.03.2014 | ||
PL | 19.03.2014 | ||
RO | 19.03.2014 | ||
SE | 19.03.2014 | ||
SI | 19.03.2014 | ||
SK | 19.03.2014 | ||
BG | 19.06.2014 | ||
NO | 19.06.2014 | ||
IE | 11.07.2014 | ||
LU | 11.07.2014 | ||
IS | 19.07.2014 | ||
PT | 21.07.2014 | ||
CH | 31.07.2014 | ||
LI | 31.07.2014 | ||
Former [2015/37] | AT | 19.03.2014 | |
BE | 19.03.2014 | ||
CY | 19.03.2014 | ||
CZ | 19.03.2014 | ||
DK | 19.03.2014 | ||
EE | 19.03.2014 | ||
ES | 19.03.2014 | ||
FI | 19.03.2014 | ||
HR | 19.03.2014 | ||
IT | 19.03.2014 | ||
LT | 19.03.2014 | ||
LV | 19.03.2014 | ||
NL | 19.03.2014 | ||
PL | 19.03.2014 | ||
RO | 19.03.2014 | ||
SE | 19.03.2014 | ||
SI | 19.03.2014 | ||
SK | 19.03.2014 | ||
BG | 19.06.2014 | ||
NO | 19.06.2014 | ||
IE | 11.07.2014 | ||
LU | 11.07.2014 | ||
IS | 19.07.2014 | ||
PT | 21.07.2014 | ||
CH | 31.07.2014 | ||
LI | 31.07.2014 | ||
Former [2015/36] | AT | 19.03.2014 | |
BE | 19.03.2014 | ||
CY | 19.03.2014 | ||
CZ | 19.03.2014 | ||
DK | 19.03.2014 | ||
EE | 19.03.2014 | ||
ES | 19.03.2014 | ||
FI | 19.03.2014 | ||
HR | 19.03.2014 | ||
IT | 19.03.2014 | ||
LT | 19.03.2014 | ||
LV | 19.03.2014 | ||
NL | 19.03.2014 | ||
PL | 19.03.2014 | ||
RO | 19.03.2014 | ||
SE | 19.03.2014 | ||
SI | 19.03.2014 | ||
SK | 19.03.2014 | ||
BG | 19.06.2014 | ||
NO | 19.06.2014 | ||
LU | 11.07.2014 | ||
IS | 19.07.2014 | ||
PT | 21.07.2014 | ||
CH | 31.07.2014 | ||
LI | 31.07.2014 | ||
Former [2015/20] | AT | 19.03.2014 | |
BE | 19.03.2014 | ||
CY | 19.03.2014 | ||
CZ | 19.03.2014 | ||
DK | 19.03.2014 | ||
EE | 19.03.2014 | ||
ES | 19.03.2014 | ||
FI | 19.03.2014 | ||
HR | 19.03.2014 | ||
IT | 19.03.2014 | ||
LT | 19.03.2014 | ||
LV | 19.03.2014 | ||
NL | 19.03.2014 | ||
PL | 19.03.2014 | ||
RO | 19.03.2014 | ||
SE | 19.03.2014 | ||
SK | 19.03.2014 | ||
BG | 19.06.2014 | ||
NO | 19.06.2014 | ||
LU | 11.07.2014 | ||
IS | 19.07.2014 | ||
PT | 21.07.2014 | ||
CH | 31.07.2014 | ||
LI | 31.07.2014 | ||
Former [2015/18] | AT | 19.03.2014 | |
BE | 19.03.2014 | ||
CY | 19.03.2014 | ||
CZ | 19.03.2014 | ||
DK | 19.03.2014 | ||
EE | 19.03.2014 | ||
ES | 19.03.2014 | ||
FI | 19.03.2014 | ||
HR | 19.03.2014 | ||
IT | 19.03.2014 | ||
LT | 19.03.2014 | ||
LV | 19.03.2014 | ||
NL | 19.03.2014 | ||
PL | 19.03.2014 | ||
RO | 19.03.2014 | ||
SE | 19.03.2014 | ||
SK | 19.03.2014 | ||
BG | 19.06.2014 | ||
NO | 19.06.2014 | ||
LU | 11.07.2014 | ||
IS | 19.07.2014 | ||
PT | 21.07.2014 | ||
Former [2015/13] | AT | 19.03.2014 | |
BE | 19.03.2014 | ||
CY | 19.03.2014 | ||
CZ | 19.03.2014 | ||
DK | 19.03.2014 | ||
EE | 19.03.2014 | ||
ES | 19.03.2014 | ||
FI | 19.03.2014 | ||
HR | 19.03.2014 | ||
LT | 19.03.2014 | ||
LV | 19.03.2014 | ||
NL | 19.03.2014 | ||
PL | 19.03.2014 | ||
RO | 19.03.2014 | ||
SE | 19.03.2014 | ||
SK | 19.03.2014 | ||
BG | 19.06.2014 | ||
NO | 19.06.2014 | ||
LU | 11.07.2014 | ||
IS | 19.07.2014 | ||
PT | 21.07.2014 | ||
Former [2015/08] | AT | 19.03.2014 | |
BE | 19.03.2014 | ||
CY | 19.03.2014 | ||
CZ | 19.03.2014 | ||
DK | 19.03.2014 | ||
EE | 19.03.2014 | ||
ES | 19.03.2014 | ||
FI | 19.03.2014 | ||
HR | 19.03.2014 | ||
LT | 19.03.2014 | ||
LV | 19.03.2014 | ||
NL | 19.03.2014 | ||
PL | 19.03.2014 | ||
RO | 19.03.2014 | ||
SE | 19.03.2014 | ||
SK | 19.03.2014 | ||
BG | 19.06.2014 | ||
NO | 19.06.2014 | ||
IS | 19.07.2014 | ||
PT | 21.07.2014 | ||
Former [2015/02] | AT | 19.03.2014 | |
BE | 19.03.2014 | ||
CY | 19.03.2014 | ||
CZ | 19.03.2014 | ||
EE | 19.03.2014 | ||
ES | 19.03.2014 | ||
FI | 19.03.2014 | ||
HR | 19.03.2014 | ||
LT | 19.03.2014 | ||
LV | 19.03.2014 | ||
NL | 19.03.2014 | ||
PL | 19.03.2014 | ||
RO | 19.03.2014 | ||
SE | 19.03.2014 | ||
SK | 19.03.2014 | ||
BG | 19.06.2014 | ||
NO | 19.06.2014 | ||
IS | 19.07.2014 | ||
PT | 21.07.2014 | ||
Former [2014/51] | AT | 19.03.2014 | |
BE | 19.03.2014 | ||
CY | 19.03.2014 | ||
CZ | 19.03.2014 | ||
EE | 19.03.2014 | ||
ES | 19.03.2014 | ||
FI | 19.03.2014 | ||
HR | 19.03.2014 | ||
LT | 19.03.2014 | ||
LV | 19.03.2014 | ||
NL | 19.03.2014 | ||
PL | 19.03.2014 | ||
RO | 19.03.2014 | ||
SE | 19.03.2014 | ||
SK | 19.03.2014 | ||
BG | 19.06.2014 | ||
NO | 19.06.2014 | ||
IS | 19.07.2014 | ||
Former [2014/50] | BE | 19.03.2014 | |
CY | 19.03.2014 | ||
CZ | 19.03.2014 | ||
EE | 19.03.2014 | ||
ES | 19.03.2014 | ||
FI | 19.03.2014 | ||
HR | 19.03.2014 | ||
LT | 19.03.2014 | ||
LV | 19.03.2014 | ||
NL | 19.03.2014 | ||
PL | 19.03.2014 | ||
RO | 19.03.2014 | ||
SE | 19.03.2014 | ||
SK | 19.03.2014 | ||
BG | 19.06.2014 | ||
NO | 19.06.2014 | ||
IS | 19.07.2014 | ||
Former [2014/49] | BE | 19.03.2014 | |
CY | 19.03.2014 | ||
CZ | 19.03.2014 | ||
EE | 19.03.2014 | ||
FI | 19.03.2014 | ||
HR | 19.03.2014 | ||
LT | 19.03.2014 | ||
LV | 19.03.2014 | ||
RO | 19.03.2014 | ||
SE | 19.03.2014 | ||
BG | 19.06.2014 | ||
NO | 19.06.2014 | ||
IS | 19.07.2014 | ||
Former [2014/48] | BE | 19.03.2014 | |
CY | 19.03.2014 | ||
CZ | 19.03.2014 | ||
EE | 19.03.2014 | ||
FI | 19.03.2014 | ||
HR | 19.03.2014 | ||
LT | 19.03.2014 | ||
LV | 19.03.2014 | ||
SE | 19.03.2014 | ||
BG | 19.06.2014 | ||
NO | 19.06.2014 | ||
Former [2014/46] | BE | 19.03.2014 | |
CY | 19.03.2014 | ||
FI | 19.03.2014 | ||
HR | 19.03.2014 | ||
LT | 19.03.2014 | ||
LV | 19.03.2014 | ||
SE | 19.03.2014 | ||
NO | 19.06.2014 | ||
Former [2014/41] | CY | 19.03.2014 | |
FI | 19.03.2014 | ||
HR | 19.03.2014 | ||
LT | 19.03.2014 | ||
LV | 19.03.2014 | ||
SE | 19.03.2014 | ||
NO | 19.06.2014 | ||
Former [2014/37] | CY | 19.03.2014 | |
FI | 19.03.2014 | ||
LT | 19.03.2014 | ||
SE | 19.03.2014 | ||
NO | 19.06.2014 | ||
Former [2014/36] | LT | 19.03.2014 | |
NO | 19.06.2014 | Cited in | International search | [A]US4798007 (EICHENLAUB JOHN E [US]) [A] 1-7* abstract *; | [Y]WO03080905 (NANO TECHNICS CO LTD [KR], et al) [Y] 1-4,6,7 * the whole document *; | [Y]US2004016143 (CLEARY JOHN C [US], et al) [Y] 1-4,6,7 * the whole document *; | [X]US2005056956 (ZHAO RONGGUO [US], et al) [X] 7 * paragraph [0027]; figure 3 *; | [A]WO2005085730 (BEKAERT SA NV [BE], et al) [A] 1-7 * figures 1-6; claims 1-20 *; | [PA]WO2008060424 (DU PONT [US], et al) [PA] 1 * the whole document *; | [PX]WO2008076412 (DU PONT [US], et al) [PX] 1 * the whole document * |