EP2235864 - DECODING SCHEME USING MULTIPLE HYPOTHESES ABOUT TRANSMITTED MESSAGES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 13.01.2017 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.01.2017 | Refusal of application | published on 15.02.2017 [2017/07] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states QUALCOMM Incorporated Attn: International IP Administration 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego, California 92121-1714 / US | [2010/40] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
PARK, Jong Hyeon 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego California 92121-1714 / US | 02 /
SIM, Bok Tae 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego California 92121-1714 / US | 03 /
KIM, Je Woo 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego California 92121-1714 / US | 04 /
GLAZKO, Serguei A. 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego California 92121-1714 / US | 05 /
NANAVATI, Sameer 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego California 92121-1714 / US | 06 /
PARK, Ju Won 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego California 92121-1714 / US | 07 /
LEE, Chun Woo 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego California 92121-1714 / US | 08 /
CHANG, Tae Ryun 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego California 92121-1714 / US | [2010/40] | Representative(s) | Carstens, Dirk Wilhelm, et al Wagner & Geyer Partnerschaft mbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Gewürzmühlstraße 5 80538 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2010/40] | Carstens, Dirk Wilhelm, et al Wagner & Geyer Gewürzmühlstrasse 5 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 08782007.2 | 17.07.2008 | [2010/40] | WO2008US70380 | Priority number, date | US20080969857 | 04.01.2008 Original published format: US 969857 | [2010/40] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2009088534 | Date: | 16.07.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/29] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2235864 | Date: | 06.10.2010 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 16.07.2009 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2010/40] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 16.07.2009 | Classification | IPC: | H04L1/00 | [2010/40] | CPC: |
H04L1/0054 (EP,US);
H04L1/006 (EP,US);
H04L1/0072 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2010/40] | Title | German: | DEKODIERUNGSSCHEMA MIT MEHREREN HYPOTHESEN ÜBER GESENDETE NACHRICHTEN | [2010/40] | English: | DECODING SCHEME USING MULTIPLE HYPOTHESES ABOUT TRANSMITTED MESSAGES | [2010/40] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE DÉCODAGE UTILISANT DE MULTIPLES HYPOTHÈSES CONCERNANT DES MESSAGES TRANSMIS | [2010/40] | Entry into regional phase | 04.08.2010 | National basic fee paid | 04.08.2010 | Designation fee(s) paid | 04.08.2010 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 28.01.2009 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 04.08.2010 | Examination requested [2010/40] | 29.09.2010 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 06.10.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.02.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.03.2013 | Date of oral proceedings | 25.03.2013 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 27.03.2013 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2017/07] | 02.12.2016 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2017/07] | Appeal following examination | 27.05.2013 | Appeal received No. T2177/13 | 24.07.2013 | Statement of grounds filed | 03.02.2016 | Invitation to file observations in an appeal (Time limit: M04) [2016/06] | 31.05.2016 | Date of receipt of observations in an appeal [2016/23] | 02.12.2016 | Result of appeal procedure: appeal of the applicant was rejected | 02.12.2016 | Date of oral proceedings | 15.12.2016 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | Divisional application(s) | EP16201538.2 Application deemed to be withdrawn : 03.01.2017 | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 06.10.2011 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 04.08.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 16.07.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 10.07.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 08.07.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 08.07.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 09.07.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 11.07.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XY]EP1463207 (TANDBERG TELEVISION ASA [NO]) [X] 1-4,8-14,17-19,23-25 * abstract * * column 6, paragraph 22 - column 8, paragraph 29 * [Y] 7; | [X]US2007089037 (JIANG WENYU [US]) [X] 1,9,17,23 * page 2, paragraph 15 - page 3, paragraph 27 *; | [X]US2003009724 (INO HIROYUKI [JP]) [X] 1,9,17,23 * page 2, paragraph 15 - paragraph 19 *; | [Y]WO2007032642 (SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO LTD [KR]) [Y] 7 * page 15, line 4 - page 16, line 17 * | Examination | US2003097625 |