EP2187739 - SMALL MOLECULE INHIBITORS OF RNA SILENCING [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 16.12.2016 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.12.2016 | Withdrawal of application | published on 18.01.2017 [2017/03] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states The Regents of the University of California 1111 Franklin Street, 12th Floor Oakland, CA 94607 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2010/21] | For all designated states The Regents of the University of California 1111 Franklin Street, 12th Floor Oakland, CA 94607 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DING, Shou-Wei 8797 Barnwood Lane Riverside, California 92508 / US | [2010/21] | Representative(s) | Isarpatent Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Barth Charles Hassa Peckmann & Partner mbB Postfach 44 01 51 80750 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2012/18] | Isarpatent Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Postfach 44 01 51 80750 München / DE | ||
Former [2010/21] | Sandmann, Wolfgang, et al Reinhard, Skuhra, Weise & Partner GbR Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Friedrichstrasse 31 80801 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 08782319.1 | 24.07.2008 | [2010/21] | WO2008US71003 | Priority number, date | US20070953389P | 01.08.2007 Original published format: US 953389 P | [2010/21] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2009018084 | Date: | 05.02.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/06] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2187739 | Date: | 26.05.2010 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 05.02.2009 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2010/21] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 05.02.2009 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.05.2013 | Classification | IPC: | A01N43/40, A01N43/60, A01P7/04 | [2013/21] | CPC: |
A01N43/60 (EP,US);
A01N25/006 (US);
A01N35/04 (EP,US);
A01N37/24 (EP,US);
A01N37/40 (EP,US);
A01N41/06 (EP,US);
A01N43/08 (EP,US);
A01N43/10 (EP,US);
A01N43/40 (EP,US);
A01N43/52 (EP,US);
A01N43/54 (EP,US);
A01N43/56 (EP,US);
A01N43/62 (EP,US);
A01N43/653 (EP,US);
A01N43/78 (EP,US);
A01N47/32 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2010/21] | A01N41/06, A61K31/18 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2010/21] | Title | German: | KLEINMOLEKULARE HEMMER DES RNA-SILENCING | [2010/21] | English: | SMALL MOLECULE INHIBITORS OF RNA SILENCING | [2010/21] | French: | INHIBITEURS À PETITE MOLÉCULE DE SILENÇAGE DE L'ARN | [2010/21] | Entry into regional phase | 26.02.2010 | National basic fee paid | 26.02.2010 | Search fee paid | 26.02.2010 | Designation fee(s) paid | 26.02.2010 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 26.02.2010 | Examination requested [2010/21] | 29.01.2014 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report not received in time | 31.03.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 09.12.2016 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2017/03] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report/Supplementary European search report | 31.03.2014 | Request for further processing filed | 31.03.1922 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 05.05.2014 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.07.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.07.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.07.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.07.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 28.07.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 27.07.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 27.07.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]JPH01131158 ; | [A]WO0154504 (AKKADIX CORP [US], et al) [A] 1,2,9-15 * page 3, lines 7-26 * * page 21, line 11 - page 22, line 32 * * figures 55-56 *; | [A]EP0778267 (OTSUKA KAGAKU KK [JP]) [A] 1,2,9-15 * the whole document *; | [A]WO2006097488 (BASF AG [DE], et al) [A] 1,2,9-15 * the whole document * | [A] - REGISTRY, CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS SERVICE, COLUMBUS, OHIO, US, (20060628), Database accession no. 904812-32-4, XP002695445 [A] 1,2,9-15 * the whole document * | [P] - Chemcats, CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS SERVICE, COLUMBUS, OHIO, US, (20120417), Database accession no. 2098806728, XP002695446 [P] * Interchim Screening Library 2098806728/AN STK469573/OD * | [A] - REGISTRY, CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS SERVICE, COLUMBUS, OHIO, US, (20060731), Database accession no. 897546-19-9, XP002695447 [A] 1,2,9-15 * the whole document * | [P] - Chemcats, Chemical Abstracts Service, Columbus, Ohio, US, (20120417), Database accession no. 2098780228, XP002695448 [P] * Interchim Screening Library 2098780228/AN STK472531/OD * | [X] - DATABASE WPI, 0, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 1989, no. 27, Database accession no. 1989-195148, XP002695510 & JPH01131158 A 19890524 (SS PHARMACEUTICAL KK) [X] 1,9,10,12,13 * abstract * * Formula (I); page 622; compounds 12-13 * | International search | [Y]US4490380 (REDEMANN CARL T [US]); | [Y]US6613804 (CHAN MING FAI [US], et al) |