EP2185460 - PROFILE SHAPE FOR A CRANE JIB [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 19.02.2016 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.02.2016 | Refusal of application | published on 23.03.2016 [2016/12] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Palfinger AG F.-W.-Scherer-Strasse 24-28 5101 Bergheim / AT | [2010/20] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WIMMER, Eckhard Staufenweg 61 A-5400 Hallein / AT | [2010/20] | Representative(s) | Gangl, Markus, et al Torggler & Hofinger Patentanwälte Wilhelm-Greil-Strasse 16 6020 Innsbruck / AT | [N/P] |
Former [2010/20] | Gangl, Markus, et al Postfach 332 6010 Innsbruck / AT | Application number, filing date | 08782835.6 | 29.08.2008 | [2010/20] | WO2008AT00307 | Priority number, date | AT20070000527U | 05.09.2007 Original published format: AT 52707 U | [2013/10] |
Former [2010/20] | AT20070000527U | 05.09.2007 | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2009029965 | Date: | 12.03.2009 | Language: | DE | [2009/11] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2185460 | Date: | 19.05.2010 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 12.03.2009 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2010/20] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 12.03.2009 | Classification | IPC: | B66C23/687 | [2010/20] | CPC: |
B66C23/701 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2010/20] | Title | German: | PROFILFORM FÜR EINEN KRANARM | [2010/20] | English: | PROFILE SHAPE FOR A CRANE JIB | [2010/20] | French: | FORME PROFILÉE POUR BRAS DE GRUE | [2010/20] | Entry into regional phase | 03.03.2010 | National basic fee paid | 03.03.2010 | Designation fee(s) paid | 03.03.2010 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 03.03.2010 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 03.03.2010 | Examination requested [2010/20] | 06.07.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 02.11.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.07.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 11.01.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.09.2012 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 28.09.2012 | 28.09.2012 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 18.10.2012 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2016/12] | 11.02.2016 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2016/12] | Appeal following examination | 18.12.2012 | Appeal received No. T0459/13 | 18.02.2013 | Statement of grounds filed | 11.02.2016 | Result of appeal procedure: appeal of the applicant withdrawn | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 06.07.2010 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.08.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.08.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.08.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.08.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.08.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 25.08.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]DE2317595 (KASPAR KLAUS) [X] 1-5,7-9,15-18,20,21,27-32 * page 6, paragraph L - page 8, paragraph 2 * * figures 1,2,7,8 *; | [X]JPH03100280U (KOMATSU KK) [X] 1,2,4,10,11,13,15-18,21,24,27-29,31,32 * figures 1a,1b *; | [X]EP1302435 (EFFER S P A [IT]) [X] 1-3,10-13,22-32 * abstract * * paragraph [0039] - paragraph [0041] * * paragraph [0046] - paragraph [0056] * * figures 1,3,4,7-10 *; | [X]DE3015599 (EILER PETER DIPL ING DR) [X] 1-4,10,11,13,14,21,24,27-29,31,32 * figure 1 * | by applicant | EP0583552 | EP1302435 |