EP2197631 - CUTTING HEAD AND CUTTING NOZZLE FOR A LIQUID/ABRASIVE JET CUTTING ARRANGMENT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 19.12.2014 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.12.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 21.01.2015 [2015/04] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Abrasive Cutting Technology Ltd. Arthur Cox Building, Earlsfort Centre Earlsfort Terrace Dublin / IE | [2010/25] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LIWSZYC, Danek 17-19 Iida Road Canning Vale, WA 6155 / AU | 02 /
LIWSZYC, Adam 17-19 Iida Road Canning Vale, WA 6155 / AU | 03 /
LIWSZYC, Joshua, Adam 17-19 Iida Road Canning Vale, WA 6155 / AU | [2010/25] | Representative(s) | Kramer Barske Schmidtchen Patentanwälte PartG mbB European Patent Attorneys Landsberger Strasse 300 80687 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2010/25] | Kramer - Barske - Schmidtchen European Patent Attorneys Landsberger Strasse 300 D-80687 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 08782976.8 | 21.08.2008 | [2010/25] | WO2008AU01228 | Priority number, date | AU20070904499P | 21.08.2007 Original published format: AU 2007904499 P | AU20070904498P | 21.08.2007 Original published format: AU 2007904498 P | AU20070904500P | 21.08.2007 Original published format: AU 2007904500 P | [2010/25] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2009023929 | Date: | 26.02.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/09] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2197631 | Date: | 23.06.2010 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 26.02.2009 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2010/25] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | AU | 26.02.2009 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.11.2011 | Classification | IPC: | B24C1/08, B24C5/02, B24C5/04 | [2010/25] | CPC: |
B24C1/045 (EP,KR,US);
B24C5/02 (EP,KR,US);
B24C5/04 (EP,KR,US);
B24C7/0007 (EP,KR,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2010/25] | Title | German: | SCHNEIDKOPF UND SCHNEIDDÜSE FÜR EINE ABTRAGEND WIRKENDE/FLÜSSIGKEITSSTRAHLSCHNEIDANORDNUNG | [2010/25] | English: | CUTTING HEAD AND CUTTING NOZZLE FOR A LIQUID/ABRASIVE JET CUTTING ARRANGMENT | [2010/25] | French: | TÊTE DE DÉCOUPAGE ET BUSE DE DÉCOUPAGE POUR DISPOSITIF DE DÉCOUPAGE AU JET DE LIQUIDE/ABRASIF | [2010/25] | Entry into regional phase | 17.03.2010 | National basic fee paid | 17.03.2010 | Search fee paid | 17.03.2010 | Designation fee(s) paid | 17.03.2010 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 17.03.2010 | Examination requested [2010/25] | 22.06.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 25.09.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 30.01.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.04.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.08.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2015/04] | 15.09.2014 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2015/04] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 25.09.2013 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.08.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.08.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 18.02.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.08.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.08.2012 | 05   M06   Fee paid on   18.02.2013 | 31.08.2014 | 07   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US5018317 (KIYOSHIGE MASANORI [JP], et al) [X] 1,2,4-15 * figures 1,2,6 *; | [X]WO02087827 (MILLER DONALD STUART [GB]) [X] 1,2,4-15 * page 17, line 4 - paragraph 3 * * page 18, paragraph 4 - page 20, paragraph 3 * * page 22, paragraph 2 - page 23, paragraph 4 *; | [X]US4707952 (KRASNOFF EUGENE L [US]) [X] 1,2,4-15 * the whole document *; | [A]US4330968 (KOBAYASHI SHIGEHARU, et al) [A] 3 * column 2, lines 5-8,24-32 * | International search | [X]US4707952 (KRASNOFF EUGENE L [US]) [X] 23, 24 * . See columns 2 and 3 and figures 1 and 2. *; | [X]US5018317 (KIYOSHIGE MASANORI [JP], et al) [X] 1, 2, 4-24 * . See entire document especially columns 3 to 11 and figure 6. *; | [A]WO2007052027 (MILLER DONALD STUART [GB]) [A] 0 * . See page 23 and 24 and figure 2. *; | [A]DE10348805 (FRAUNHOFER GES FORSCHUNG [DE]) [A] 0 * . See pages 4 and 5 and figure 1. *; | [A]US5155946 (DOMANN HANNES [DE]) [A] 0 * . See columns 7 and 8 and figures 1, 3 and 5. *; | [X]WO9101852 (INSITUFORM GROUP LTD [GB]) [X] 1, 2, 4-24. * . See page 2 and 3 and figure 1. *; | [A]JP2007130716 (HITACHI LTD) [A] 0 * . See entire abstract. *; | [X]US6425805 (MASSA TED R [US], et al) [X] 25, 26. * . See columns 9 to 14 and figures 11a, 11b, 12 and 13. *; | [A]US2003027100 (GRANT SIDNEY [GB]) [A] 0 * . See entire document. *; | [A]WO9740963 (STRECHOVSKY JAN [CZ]) [A] 0 * . See entire document. *; | [A]WO9707378 (ELBLAST LTD [IL], et al) [A] 0 * . See entire document. *; | [A]US4555872 (YIE GENE G [US]) [A] 0 * . See entire document. * | by applicant | WO02087827 | US5018317 |