EP2187842 - INFLATABLE INTRA OCULAR LENS/LENS RETAINER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 03.09.2021 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 25.09.2020 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 12.05.2020 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 20.09.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.09.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MT | published on 09.10.2024 [2024/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Webb, Garth T. 23544 20 Avenue Langley, BC V2Z 2Z7 / CA | [2021/14] |
Former [2010/21] | For all designated states Webb, Garth T. 12673 -14B Avenue Surrey, BC V4A 1J7 / CA | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2010/21] | Representative(s) | Eisenführ Speiser Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte PartGmbB Johannes-Brahms-Platz 1 20355 Hamburg / DE | [2020/44] |
Former [2012/34] | Eisenführ, Speiser & Partner Johannes-Brahms-Platz 1 20355 Hamburg / DE | ||
Former [2010/21] | Ehlers, Jochen Eisenführ, Speiser & Partner Johannes-Brahms-Platz 1 20355 Hamburg / DE | Application number, filing date | 08783366.1 | 12.08.2008 | [2010/21] | WO2008CA01456 | Priority number, date | US20070955591P | 13.08.2007 Original published format: US 955591 P | US20070985376P | 05.11.2007 Original published format: US 985376 P | US20080051075 | 07.05.2008 Original published format: US 51075 | [2010/21] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2009021327 | Date: | 19.02.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/08] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2187842 | Date: | 26.05.2010 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 19.02.2009 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2010/21] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2187842 | Date: | 28.10.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/44] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CA | 19.02.2009 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.06.2013 | Classification | IPC: | A61F2/16, A61L27/14, A61L27/18, A61L27/20, A61L27/24 | [2010/21] | CPC: |
A61F2/1613 (EP,US);
A61F2/1648 (US);
A61F2/14 (US);
A61F2/1635 (EP,US);
A61F2/1602 (EP,US);
A61F2/1624 (US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2020/44] |
Former [2010/21] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | AUFBLASBARE INTRAOKULARE LINSE/LINSENHALTER | [2010/21] | English: | INFLATABLE INTRA OCULAR LENS/LENS RETAINER | [2010/21] | French: | LENTILLE INTRAOCULAIRE GONFLABLE/DISPOSITIF DE RETENUE DE LENTILLE | [2010/21] | Entry into regional phase | 15.03.2010 | National basic fee paid | 15.03.2010 | Search fee paid | 15.03.2010 | Designation fee(s) paid | 15.03.2010 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 09.06.2009 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: CA | 15.03.2010 | Examination requested [2010/21] | 21.02.2014 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 29.04.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 10.11.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.03.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.09.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.11.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.05.2020 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.09.2020 | Fee for grant paid | 22.09.2020 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 22.09.2020 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 10.11.2014 | Opposition(s) | 29.07.2021 | No opposition filed within time limit [2021/40] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to indicate the wish to proceed further with the application | 29.04.2014 | Request for further processing filed | 29.04.2014 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 13.05.2014 | Decision despatched | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report/Supplementary European search report | 29.04.2014 | Request for further processing filed | 29.04.2014 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 13.05.2014 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.08.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.08.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.08.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.08.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.08.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 27.08.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 29.08.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 28.08.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 27.08.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 27.08.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 27.08.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 13 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 12.08.2008 | CY | 28.10.2020 | CZ | 28.10.2020 | EE | 28.10.2020 | HR | 28.10.2020 | LT | 28.10.2020 | LV | 28.10.2020 | MC | 28.10.2020 | MT | 28.10.2020 | NL | 28.10.2020 | PL | 28.10.2020 | RO | 28.10.2020 | SI | 28.10.2020 | SK | 28.10.2020 | TR | 28.10.2020 | BG | 28.01.2021 | NO | 28.01.2021 | IS | 28.02.2021 | [2024/41] |
Former [2024/29] | HU | 12.08.2008 | |
CY | 28.10.2020 | ||
CZ | 28.10.2020 | ||
EE | 28.10.2020 | ||
HR | 28.10.2020 | ||
LT | 28.10.2020 | ||
LV | 28.10.2020 | ||
MC | 28.10.2020 | ||
NL | 28.10.2020 | ||
PL | 28.10.2020 | ||
RO | 28.10.2020 | ||
SI | 28.10.2020 | ||
SK | 28.10.2020 | ||
TR | 28.10.2020 | ||
BG | 28.01.2021 | ||
NO | 28.01.2021 | ||
IS | 28.02.2021 | ||
Former [2023/29] | HU | 12.08.2008 | |
CY | 28.10.2020 | ||
CZ | 28.10.2020 | ||
EE | 28.10.2020 | ||
HR | 28.10.2020 | ||
LT | 28.10.2020 | ||
LV | 28.10.2020 | ||
MC | 28.10.2020 | ||
NL | 28.10.2020 | ||
PL | 28.10.2020 | ||
RO | 28.10.2020 | ||
SI | 28.10.2020 | ||
SK | 28.10.2020 | ||
BG | 28.01.2021 | ||
NO | 28.01.2021 | ||
IS | 28.02.2021 | ||
Former [2023/24] | CY | 28.10.2020 | |
CZ | 28.10.2020 | ||
EE | 28.10.2020 | ||
HR | 28.10.2020 | ||
LT | 28.10.2020 | ||
LV | 28.10.2020 | ||
MC | 28.10.2020 | ||
NL | 28.10.2020 | ||
PL | 28.10.2020 | ||
RO | 28.10.2020 | ||
SI | 28.10.2020 | ||
SK | 28.10.2020 | ||
BG | 28.01.2021 | ||
NO | 28.01.2021 | ||
IS | 28.02.2021 | ||
Former [2022/23] | CZ | 28.10.2020 | |
EE | 28.10.2020 | ||
HR | 28.10.2020 | ||
LT | 28.10.2020 | ||
LV | 28.10.2020 | ||
MC | 28.10.2020 | ||
NL | 28.10.2020 | ||
PL | 28.10.2020 | ||
RO | 28.10.2020 | ||
SI | 28.10.2020 | ||
SK | 28.10.2020 | ||
BG | 28.01.2021 | ||
NO | 28.01.2021 | ||
IS | 28.02.2021 | ||
Former [2022/18] | CZ | 28.10.2020 | |
EE | 28.10.2020 | ||
HR | 28.10.2020 | ||
LT | 28.10.2020 | ||
LV | 28.10.2020 | ||
MC | 28.10.2020 | ||
NL | 28.10.2020 | ||
PL | 28.10.2020 | ||
RO | 28.10.2020 | ||
SI | 28.10.2020 | ||
SK | 28.10.2020 | ||
BG | 28.01.2021 | ||
NO | 28.01.2021 | ||
Former [2022/10] | CZ | 28.10.2020 | |
EE | 28.10.2020 | ||
HR | 28.10.2020 | ||
LT | 28.10.2020 | ||
LV | 28.10.2020 | ||
NL | 28.10.2020 | ||
PL | 28.10.2020 | ||
RO | 28.10.2020 | ||
SI | 28.10.2020 | ||
SK | 28.10.2020 | ||
BG | 28.01.2021 | ||
NO | 28.01.2021 | ||
Former [2021/50] | CZ | 28.10.2020 | |
EE | 28.10.2020 | ||
HR | 28.10.2020 | ||
LT | 28.10.2020 | ||
LV | 28.10.2020 | ||
NL | 28.10.2020 | ||
PL | 28.10.2020 | ||
RO | 28.10.2020 | ||
SI | 28.10.2020 | ||
SK | 28.10.2020 | ||
BG | 28.01.2021 | ||
NO | 28.01.2021 | ||
IS | 28.02.2021 | ||
Former [2021/36] | CZ | 28.10.2020 | |
EE | 28.10.2020 | ||
HR | 28.10.2020 | ||
LT | 28.10.2020 | ||
LV | 28.10.2020 | ||
NL | 28.10.2020 | ||
PL | 28.10.2020 | ||
RO | 28.10.2020 | ||
SK | 28.10.2020 | ||
BG | 28.01.2021 | ||
NO | 28.01.2021 | ||
IS | 28.02.2021 | ||
Former [2021/35] | CZ | 28.10.2020 | |
HR | 28.10.2020 | ||
LT | 28.10.2020 | ||
LV | 28.10.2020 | ||
NL | 28.10.2020 | ||
PL | 28.10.2020 | ||
RO | 28.10.2020 | ||
SK | 28.10.2020 | ||
BG | 28.01.2021 | ||
NO | 28.01.2021 | ||
IS | 28.02.2021 | ||
Former [2021/34] | CZ | 28.10.2020 | |
HR | 28.10.2020 | ||
LT | 28.10.2020 | ||
LV | 28.10.2020 | ||
NL | 28.10.2020 | ||
PL | 28.10.2020 | ||
BG | 28.01.2021 | ||
NO | 28.01.2021 | ||
IS | 28.02.2021 | ||
Former [2021/33] | HR | 28.10.2020 | |
LT | 28.10.2020 | ||
LV | 28.10.2020 | ||
NL | 28.10.2020 | ||
PL | 28.10.2020 | ||
BG | 28.01.2021 | ||
NO | 28.01.2021 | ||
IS | 28.02.2021 | ||
Former [2021/28] | HR | 28.10.2020 | |
LV | 28.10.2020 | ||
NL | 28.10.2020 | ||
PL | 28.10.2020 | ||
BG | 28.01.2021 | ||
NO | 28.01.2021 | ||
IS | 28.02.2021 | ||
Former [2021/25] | LV | 28.10.2020 | |
NL | 28.10.2020 | ||
PL | 28.10.2020 | ||
BG | 28.01.2021 | ||
NO | 28.01.2021 | ||
IS | 28.02.2021 | ||
Former [2021/24] | LV | 28.10.2020 | |
NL | 28.10.2020 | ||
BG | 28.01.2021 | ||
NO | 28.01.2021 | ||
Former [2021/23] | LV | 28.10.2020 | |
NL | 28.10.2020 | ||
NO | 28.01.2021 | ||
Former [2021/22] | NL | 28.10.2020 | |
NO | 28.01.2021 | ||
Former [2021/21] | NL | 28.10.2020 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP0356050 (STORZ INSTR CO [US]) [X] 1-5,7-14* column 5, lines 7-48; figures 1,13 *; | [X]WO2004010904 (GROSS YOSEF [IL]) [X] 1-14 * page 6, paragraphs 2,3; figure 2 * | International search | [A]EP0202049 (BAXTER TRAVENOL LAB [US]) [A] 1-33; | [A]US4709996 (MICHELSON PAUL E [US]) [A] 1-33; | [A]US4822360 (DEACON JIM [US]) [A] 1-33; | [XY]WO9011736 (THOMASON FEASTER FRED [US]) [X] 1-10, 18-20, 23-24 and 33 [Y] 25-27 and 29; | [A]US5152788 (ISAACSON WILLIAM B [US], et al) [A] 1-33; | [A]WO0004849 (UNIV JOHNS HOPKINS [US]) [A] 1-33; | [A]US7137994 (DE JUAN JR EUGENE [US], et al) [A] 1-33; | [A]WO2007011879 (CLARKE GERALD [US]) [A] 1-33; | [A]CA2631261 (VISION SOLUTIONS TECHNOLOGIES [US]) [A] 1-33; | [XY]CA2630781 (BAUSCH & LOMB [US]) [X] 1-2, 10, 12-13, 13, 30 and 33 [Y] 25-27 and 29; | [A]CA2629884 (C & C VISION INT LTD [IE])[A] 1-33 | by applicant | WO2004010904 |