EP2139175 - METHOD, SYSTEM AND APPARATUS FOR NEGOTIATING THE SECURITY ABILITY WHEN A TERMINAL IS MOVING [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been limited Status updated on 01.09.2017 Database last updated on 01.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.05.2018 | Change - lapse in a contracting state State(s) deleted from list of lapses: LV | published on 13.06.2018 [2018/24] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Huawei Technologies Co., Ltd. Huawei Administration Building Bantian Longgang District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN | [2017/40] |
Former [2010/01] | For all designated states Huawei Technologies Co., Ltd. Huawei Administration Building Bantian Longgang District, Shenzhen Guangdong 518129 / CN | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HE, Chengdong Huawei Administration Building Bantian Longgang District Shenzhen Guangdong 518129 / CN | [2012/52] |
Former [2010/01] | 01 /
HE, Chengdong Huawei Administration Building Bantian Longgang District Shenzhen Guangdong 518129 / CN | Representative(s) | Prüfer & Partner mbB Patentanwälte · Rechtsanwälte Sohnckestraße 12 81479 München / DE | [2017/40] |
Former [2012/18] | Isarpatent Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Postfach 44 01 51 80750 München / DE | ||
Former [2010/01] | Charles, Glyndwr Reinhard, Skuhra, Weise & Partner GbR Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Friedrichstrasse 31 80801 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 08784154.0 | 27.08.2008 | [2010/01] | WO2008CN72165 | Priority number, date | CN200710145703 | 31.08.2007 Original published format: CN200710145703 | CN200710151700 | 26.09.2007 Original published format: CN200710151700 | [2010/01] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2009030155 | Date: | 12.03.2009 | Language: | ZH | [2009/11] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2139175 | Date: | 30.12.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/53] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2139175 | Date: | 26.12.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/52] | Type: | B3 Limited patent | No.: | EP2139175 | Date: | 04.10.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/40] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 12.03.2009 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.04.2010 | Classification | IPC: | H04L29/06, H04W12/06 | [2012/29] | CPC: |
H04L9/0844 (EP,US);
H04L63/0492 (US);
H04L63/062 (US);
H04L63/0876 (US);
H04L63/1441 (EP,US);
H04L63/20 (EP,US);
H04L63/205 (EP,US);
H04L69/24 (EP,US);
H04L9/088 (EP,US);
H04W12/041 (EP,US);
H04W12/0431 (EP,US);
H04W12/106 (EP,US);
H04W12/122 (EP,US);
H04W36/0038 (US);
H04W8/02 (US);
H04L2463/061 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2010/20] | H04L12/56, H04W12/06 | ||
Former IPC [2010/01] | H04L12/56 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2017/40] |
Former [2010/01] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | VERFAHREN, SYSTEM UND GERÄT ZUR AUSHANDLUNG DER SICHERHEITSFÄHIGKEIT WÄHREND EIN ENDGERÄT SICH BEWEGT | [2010/01] | English: | METHOD, SYSTEM AND APPARATUS FOR NEGOTIATING THE SECURITY ABILITY WHEN A TERMINAL IS MOVING | [2010/01] | French: | PROCÉDÉ, SYSTÈME ET APPAREIL POUR NÉGOCIER LES CAPACITÉS DE SÉCURITÉ LORS DU DÉPLACEMENT D'UN TERMINAL | [2010/01] | Entry into regional phase | 13.11.2009 | Translation filed | 13.11.2009 | National basic fee paid | 13.11.2009 | Search fee paid | 13.11.2009 | Designation fee(s) paid | 13.11.2009 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 13.11.2009 | Examination requested [2009/53] | 09.07.2010 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 19.10.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.12.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.07.2012 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.10.2012 | Fee for grant paid | 24.10.2012 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP12188170.0 / EP2549701 | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 19.10.2010 | Opposition(s) | 27.09.2013 | No opposition filed within time limit [2013/49] | Limitations: | 29.06.2017 | Date of receipt of request for limitation | admissible | 08.08.2017 | Communication of intention to limit the patent | 24.08.2017 | Fee for printing patent specification after limitation | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.08.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.08.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.08.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 26.12.2012 | CZ | 26.12.2012 | DK | 26.12.2012 | EE | 26.12.2012 | HR | 26.12.2012 | LT | 26.12.2012 | MC | 26.12.2012 | MT | 26.12.2012 | RO | 26.12.2012 | SI | 26.12.2012 | SK | 26.12.2012 | TR | 26.12.2012 | BG | 26.03.2013 | GR | 27.03.2013 | IS | 26.04.2013 | PT | 26.04.2013 | IE | 27.08.2013 | LU | 27.08.2013 | CH | 31.08.2013 | LI | 31.08.2013 | [2018/24] |
Former [2015/34] | CY | 26.12.2012 | |
CZ | 26.12.2012 | ||
DK | 26.12.2012 | ||
EE | 26.12.2012 | ||
HR | 26.12.2012 | ||
LT | 26.12.2012 | ||
LV | 26.12.2012 | ||
MC | 26.12.2012 | ||
MT | 26.12.2012 | ||
RO | 26.12.2012 | ||
SI | 26.12.2012 | ||
SK | 26.12.2012 | ||
TR | 26.12.2012 | ||
BG | 26.03.2013 | ||
GR | 27.03.2013 | ||
IS | 26.04.2013 | ||
PT | 26.04.2013 | ||
IE | 27.08.2013 | ||
LU | 27.08.2013 | ||
CH | 31.08.2013 | ||
LI | 31.08.2013 | ||
Former [2015/32] | CY | 26.12.2012 | |
CZ | 26.12.2012 | ||
DK | 26.12.2012 | ||
EE | 26.12.2012 | ||
HR | 26.12.2012 | ||
LT | 26.12.2012 | ||
LV | 26.12.2012 | ||
MC | 26.12.2012 | ||
MT | 26.12.2012 | ||
RO | 26.12.2012 | ||
SI | 26.12.2012 | ||
SK | 26.12.2012 | ||
TR | 26.12.2012 | ||
BG | 26.03.2013 | ||
GR | 27.03.2013 | ||
IS | 26.04.2013 | ||
PT | 26.04.2013 | ||
IE | 27.08.2013 | ||
CH | 31.08.2013 | ||
LI | 31.08.2013 | ||
Former [2014/33] | CY | 26.12.2012 | |
CZ | 26.12.2012 | ||
DK | 26.12.2012 | ||
EE | 26.12.2012 | ||
HR | 26.12.2012 | ||
LT | 26.12.2012 | ||
LV | 26.12.2012 | ||
MC | 26.12.2012 | ||
RO | 26.12.2012 | ||
SI | 26.12.2012 | ||
SK | 26.12.2012 | ||
BG | 26.03.2013 | ||
GR | 27.03.2013 | ||
IS | 26.04.2013 | ||
PT | 26.04.2013 | ||
IE | 27.08.2013 | ||
CH | 31.08.2013 | ||
LI | 31.08.2013 | ||
Former [2014/20] | CY | 26.12.2012 | |
CZ | 26.12.2012 | ||
DK | 26.12.2012 | ||
EE | 26.12.2012 | ||
HR | 26.12.2012 | ||
LT | 26.12.2012 | ||
LV | 26.12.2012 | ||
MC | 26.12.2012 | ||
RO | 26.12.2012 | ||
SI | 26.12.2012 | ||
SK | 26.12.2012 | ||
BG | 26.03.2013 | ||
GR | 27.03.2013 | ||
IS | 26.04.2013 | ||
PT | 26.04.2013 | ||
CH | 31.08.2013 | ||
LI | 31.08.2013 | ||
Former [2013/52] | CY | 26.12.2012 | |
CZ | 26.12.2012 | ||
DK | 26.12.2012 | ||
EE | 26.12.2012 | ||
HR | 26.12.2012 | ||
LT | 26.12.2012 | ||
LV | 26.12.2012 | ||
RO | 26.12.2012 | ||
SI | 26.12.2012 | ||
SK | 26.12.2012 | ||
BG | 26.03.2013 | ||
GR | 27.03.2013 | ||
IS | 26.04.2013 | ||
PT | 26.04.2013 | ||
Former [2013/48] | CZ | 26.12.2012 | |
DK | 26.12.2012 | ||
EE | 26.12.2012 | ||
HR | 26.12.2012 | ||
LT | 26.12.2012 | ||
LV | 26.12.2012 | ||
RO | 26.12.2012 | ||
SI | 26.12.2012 | ||
SK | 26.12.2012 | ||
BG | 26.03.2013 | ||
GR | 27.03.2013 | ||
IS | 26.04.2013 | ||
PT | 26.04.2013 | ||
Former [2013/40] | CZ | 26.12.2012 | |
EE | 26.12.2012 | ||
HR | 26.12.2012 | ||
LT | 26.12.2012 | ||
LV | 26.12.2012 | ||
RO | 26.12.2012 | ||
SI | 26.12.2012 | ||
SK | 26.12.2012 | ||
BG | 26.03.2013 | ||
GR | 27.03.2013 | ||
IS | 26.04.2013 | ||
PT | 26.04.2013 | ||
Former [2013/37] | CZ | 26.12.2012 | |
EE | 26.12.2012 | ||
HR | 26.12.2012 | ||
LT | 26.12.2012 | ||
LV | 26.12.2012 | ||
RO | 26.12.2012 | ||
SI | 26.12.2012 | ||
SK | 26.12.2012 | ||
BG | 26.03.2013 | ||
GR | 27.03.2013 | ||
IS | 26.04.2013 | ||
Former [2013/35] | CZ | 26.12.2012 | |
EE | 26.12.2012 | ||
HR | 26.12.2012 | ||
LT | 26.12.2012 | ||
LV | 26.12.2012 | ||
SI | 26.12.2012 | ||
SK | 26.12.2012 | ||
BG | 26.03.2013 | ||
GR | 27.03.2013 | ||
IS | 26.04.2013 | ||
Former [2013/34] | HR | 26.12.2012 | |
LT | 26.12.2012 | ||
LV | 26.12.2012 | ||
SI | 26.12.2012 | ||
BG | 26.03.2013 | ||
GR | 27.03.2013 | ||
IS | 26.04.2013 | ||
Former [2013/26] | HR | 26.12.2012 | |
LT | 26.12.2012 | ||
LV | 26.12.2012 | ||
SI | 26.12.2012 | ||
GR | 27.03.2013 | ||
Former [2013/24] | HR | 26.12.2012 | |
LT | 26.12.2012 | ||
LV | 26.12.2012 | ||
GR | 27.03.2013 | ||
Former [2013/23] | HR | 26.12.2012 | |
LT | 26.12.2012 | ||
LV | 26.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/20] | LT | 26.12.2012 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y] - "3rd Generation Partnership Project; Technical Specification Group Services and System Aspects; GPRS enhancements for E-UTRAN access (Release 8)", 3GPP STANDARD; 3GPP TS 23.401, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, (20070701), no. V1.1.0, pages 1 - 78, XP050363612 [Y] 1-16 * Section 5.3: " Authentication ,security and location management" * | [Y] - NOKIA SIEMENS NETWORKS ET AL, "Pseudo-CR to TR 33.821: Key handling on idle mode mobility", 3GPP DRAFT; S3-070529, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, (20070703), vol. SA WG3, no. Montreal; 20070703, XP050279999 [Y] 1-16 * the whole document * | [Y] - 3GPP, "3rd Generation Partnership Project;Technical Specification Group Services and System Aspects; Rationale and track of security decisions in Long Term Evolved (LTE) RAN / 3GPP System Architecture Evolution (SAE) (Release 8)", 3GPP DRAFT; S3-070625-TR33821-V040-CL, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, (20070714), vol. SA WG3, no. Montreal; 20070714, XP050280077 [Y] 1-16 * Section 7: Control Plane Security * | [XP] - HUAWEI, "Key handling on idle mode mobility from UTRAN to E-UTRAN", 3GPP DRAFT; S3-070685, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, (20070930), vol. SA WG3, no. Munich; 20070930, XP050280154 [XP] 1-16 * the whole document * | [A] - "3rd Generation Partnership Project; Technical Specification Group Services and System Aspects; 3GPP System Architecture Evolution: Report on Technical Options and Conclusions (Release 7)", 3GPP STANDARD; 3GPP TR 23.882, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, (20070701), no. V1.11.0, pages 147 - 176, XP050364123 [A] 1-16 * the whole document * | International search | [A]CN1801698 (HUAWEI TECH CO LTD [CN]) [A] 1-16 * The whole document *; | [A]CN1983921 (HUAWEI TECH CO LTD [CN]) [A] 1-16 * The whole document *; | [A]WO2007078159 (SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO LTD [KR], et al) [A] 1-16* The whole document * | by applicant | - "3rd Generation Partnership Project; Technical Specification Group Services and System Aspects; GPRS enhancements for E-UTRAN access (Release 8)", 3GPP STANDARD; 3GPP TS, vol. 23, page 401 | - "3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP)", MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE, (20070701), vol. 1.1.0, pages 1 - 78 | - NOKIA SIEMENS NETWORKS ET AL., "Pseudo-CR to TR 33.821: Key handling on idle mode mobility", 3GPP DRAFT, pages 3 - 070529 | - "3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP)", MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE, (20070703), vol. SA WG3 | - "3rd Generation Partnership Project; Technical Specification Group Services and System Aspects; Rational and track of security decisions in Long Term Evolved (LTE) RAN/3GPP System Architecture Evolution(SAE) (Release 8)", 3GPP DRAFT, pages S3TR33821 - 070625 | - "3rd Generation Partnership Project; Technical Specification Group Services and System Aspects; 3GPP System Architecture Evolution: Report on Technical Options and Conclusions (Release 7)", 3GPP STANDARD; 3GPP TR, vol. 23, page 882 | - "3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP)", MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE, (20070701), vol. 11.0, pages 147 - 176 |