EP2171541 - METHOD FOR EXAMINING A WAFER WITH REGARD TO A CONTAMINATION LIMIT AND EUV PROJECTION EXPOSURE SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 20.07.2012 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.07.2014 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 20.08.2014 [2014/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Carl Zeiss SMT GmbH Rudolf-Eber-Strasse 2 73447 Oberkochen / DE | [2011/10] |
Former [2010/14] | For all designated states Carl Zeiss SMT AG Rudolf-Eber-Str. 2 73446 Oberkochen / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DORSEL, Andreas Egerlandstrasse 25 73431 Aalen / DE | 02 /
SCHMIDT, Stefan Zeppelinstrasse 73 73430 Aalen / DE | [2010/14] | Representative(s) | Kohler Schmid Möbus Patentanwälte Partnerschaftsgesellschaft mbB Gropiusplatz 10 70563 Stuttgart / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2011/37] | Kohler Schmid Möbus Patentanwälte Ruppmannstraße 27 70565 Stuttgart / DE | ||
Former [2010/14] | Kohler Schmid Möbus Patentanwälte Ruppmannstraße 27 70565 Stuttgart / DE | Application number, filing date | 08784811.5 | 16.07.2008 | [2010/14] | WO2008EP05807 | Priority number, date | US20070951125P | 20.07.2007 Original published format: US 951125 P | [2010/14] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2009012919 | Date: | 29.01.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/05] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2171541 | Date: | 07.04.2010 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 29.01.2009 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2010/14] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2171541 | Date: | 14.09.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/37] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 29.01.2009 | Classification | IPC: | G03F7/20 | [2010/14] | CPC: |
G03F7/70916 (EP,KR,US);
G03F7/70608 (EP,KR,US);
G03F7/70425 (EP,KR,US);
G03F7/7065 (KR);
G03F7/7075 (EP,KR,US);
G03F7/70808 (EP,KR,US);
G03F7/70866 (EP,KR,US);
G03F7/70925 (EP,KR,US);
G03F7/70983 (EP,KR,US);
H01L21/027 (KR)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2010/14] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR UNTERSUCHUNG EINES WAFERS HINSICHTLICH EINES KONTAMINATIONSLIMITS UND EUV-PROJEKTIONSBELICHTUNGSSYSTEM | [2011/05] | English: | METHOD FOR EXAMINING A WAFER WITH REGARD TO A CONTAMINATION LIMIT AND EUV PROJECTION EXPOSURE SYSTEM | [2010/14] | French: | PROCÉDÉ POUR EXAMINER UNE TRANCHE PAR RAPPORT À UNE LIMITE DE CONTAMINATION ET SYSTÈME D'EXPOSITION PAR PROJECTION D'EUV | [2011/05] |
Former [2010/14] | VERFAHREN ZUR UNTERSUCHUNG EINES WAFERS HINSICHTLICH EINES KONTAMINATIONSLIMITS UND EUV-AUSSETZUNGSSCHUTZSYSTEM | ||
Former [2010/14] | PROCÉDÉ POUR EXAMINER UNE TRANCHE EN RAPPORT À UNE LIMITE DE CONTAMINATION ET SYSTÈME D'EXPOSITION PAR PROJECTION D'EUV | Entry into regional phase | 23.10.2009 | National basic fee paid | 23.10.2009 | Designation fee(s) paid | 23.10.2009 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 23.10.2009 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 23.10.2009 | Examination requested [2010/14] | 08.06.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.09.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.10.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.11.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.04.2011 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.07.2011 | Fee for grant paid | 22.07.2011 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 08.06.2010 | Opposition(s) | 15.06.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit [2012/34] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.07.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.07.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 16.07.2008 | AT | 14.09.2011 | BE | 14.09.2011 | CY | 14.09.2011 | CZ | 14.09.2011 | DK | 14.09.2011 | EE | 14.09.2011 | FI | 14.09.2011 | HR | 14.09.2011 | IT | 14.09.2011 | LT | 14.09.2011 | LV | 14.09.2011 | MT | 14.09.2011 | PL | 14.09.2011 | RO | 14.09.2011 | SE | 14.09.2011 | SI | 14.09.2011 | SK | 14.09.2011 | TR | 14.09.2011 | BG | 14.12.2011 | NO | 14.12.2011 | GR | 15.12.2011 | ES | 25.12.2011 | IS | 14.01.2012 | PT | 16.01.2012 | [2014/34] |
Former [2014/21] | AT | 14.09.2011 | |
BE | 14.09.2011 | ||
CY | 14.09.2011 | ||
CZ | 14.09.2011 | ||
DK | 14.09.2011 | ||
EE | 14.09.2011 | ||
FI | 14.09.2011 | ||
HR | 14.09.2011 | ||
IT | 14.09.2011 | ||
LT | 14.09.2011 | ||
LV | 14.09.2011 | ||
MT | 14.09.2011 | ||
PL | 14.09.2011 | ||
RO | 14.09.2011 | ||
SE | 14.09.2011 | ||
SI | 14.09.2011 | ||
SK | 14.09.2011 | ||
TR | 14.09.2011 | ||
BG | 14.12.2011 | ||
NO | 14.12.2011 | ||
GR | 15.12.2011 | ||
ES | 25.12.2011 | ||
IS | 14.01.2012 | ||
PT | 16.01.2012 | ||
Former [2013/35] | AT | 14.09.2011 | |
BE | 14.09.2011 | ||
CY | 14.09.2011 | ||
CZ | 14.09.2011 | ||
DK | 14.09.2011 | ||
EE | 14.09.2011 | ||
FI | 14.09.2011 | ||
HR | 14.09.2011 | ||
IT | 14.09.2011 | ||
LT | 14.09.2011 | ||
LV | 14.09.2011 | ||
MT | 14.09.2011 | ||
PL | 14.09.2011 | ||
RO | 14.09.2011 | ||
SE | 14.09.2011 | ||
SI | 14.09.2011 | ||
SK | 14.09.2011 | ||
BG | 14.12.2011 | ||
NO | 14.12.2011 | ||
GR | 15.12.2011 | ||
ES | 25.12.2011 | ||
IS | 14.01.2012 | ||
PT | 16.01.2012 | ||
Former [2013/29] | AT | 14.09.2011 | |
BE | 14.09.2011 | ||
CY | 14.09.2011 | ||
CZ | 14.09.2011 | ||
DK | 14.09.2011 | ||
EE | 14.09.2011 | ||
FI | 14.09.2011 | ||
HR | 14.09.2011 | ||
IT | 14.09.2011 | ||
LT | 14.09.2011 | ||
LV | 14.09.2011 | ||
PL | 14.09.2011 | ||
RO | 14.09.2011 | ||
SE | 14.09.2011 | ||
SI | 14.09.2011 | ||
SK | 14.09.2011 | ||
BG | 14.12.2011 | ||
NO | 14.12.2011 | ||
GR | 15.12.2011 | ||
ES | 25.12.2011 | ||
IS | 14.01.2012 | ||
PT | 16.01.2012 | ||
Former [2013/22] | AT | 14.09.2011 | |
BE | 14.09.2011 | ||
CY | 14.09.2011 | ||
CZ | 14.09.2011 | ||
DK | 14.09.2011 | ||
EE | 14.09.2011 | ||
FI | 14.09.2011 | ||
HR | 14.09.2011 | ||
IT | 14.09.2011 | ||
LT | 14.09.2011 | ||
LV | 14.09.2011 | ||
PL | 14.09.2011 | ||
RO | 14.09.2011 | ||
SE | 14.09.2011 | ||
SI | 14.09.2011 | ||
SK | 14.09.2011 | ||
NO | 14.12.2011 | ||
GR | 15.12.2011 | ||
ES | 25.12.2011 | ||
IS | 14.01.2012 | ||
PT | 16.01.2012 | ||
Former [2012/35] | AT | 14.09.2011 | |
BE | 14.09.2011 | ||
CY | 14.09.2011 | ||
CZ | 14.09.2011 | ||
DK | 14.09.2011 | ||
EE | 14.09.2011 | ||
FI | 14.09.2011 | ||
HR | 14.09.2011 | ||
IT | 14.09.2011 | ||
LT | 14.09.2011 | ||
LV | 14.09.2011 | ||
PL | 14.09.2011 | ||
RO | 14.09.2011 | ||
SE | 14.09.2011 | ||
SI | 14.09.2011 | ||
SK | 14.09.2011 | ||
NO | 14.12.2011 | ||
GR | 15.12.2011 | ||
IS | 14.01.2012 | ||
PT | 16.01.2012 | ||
Former [2012/26] | AT | 14.09.2011 | |
BE | 14.09.2011 | ||
CY | 14.09.2011 | ||
CZ | 14.09.2011 | ||
EE | 14.09.2011 | ||
FI | 14.09.2011 | ||
HR | 14.09.2011 | ||
IT | 14.09.2011 | ||
LT | 14.09.2011 | ||
LV | 14.09.2011 | ||
PL | 14.09.2011 | ||
RO | 14.09.2011 | ||
SE | 14.09.2011 | ||
SI | 14.09.2011 | ||
SK | 14.09.2011 | ||
NO | 14.12.2011 | ||
GR | 15.12.2011 | ||
IS | 14.01.2012 | ||
PT | 16.01.2012 | ||
Former [2012/23] | AT | 14.09.2011 | |
BE | 14.09.2011 | ||
CY | 14.09.2011 | ||
CZ | 14.09.2011 | ||
EE | 14.09.2011 | ||
FI | 14.09.2011 | ||
HR | 14.09.2011 | ||
IT | 14.09.2011 | ||
LT | 14.09.2011 | ||
LV | 14.09.2011 | ||
RO | 14.09.2011 | ||
SE | 14.09.2011 | ||
SI | 14.09.2011 | ||
SK | 14.09.2011 | ||
NO | 14.12.2011 | ||
GR | 15.12.2011 | ||
IS | 14.01.2012 | ||
PT | 16.01.2012 | ||
Former [2012/21] | AT | 14.09.2011 | |
BE | 14.09.2011 | ||
CY | 14.09.2011 | ||
CZ | 14.09.2011 | ||
FI | 14.09.2011 | ||
HR | 14.09.2011 | ||
LT | 14.09.2011 | ||
LV | 14.09.2011 | ||
SE | 14.09.2011 | ||
SI | 14.09.2011 | ||
NO | 14.12.2011 | ||
GR | 15.12.2011 | ||
IS | 14.01.2012 | ||
Former [2012/18] | AT | 14.09.2011 | |
BE | 14.09.2011 | ||
CY | 14.09.2011 | ||
FI | 14.09.2011 | ||
HR | 14.09.2011 | ||
LT | 14.09.2011 | ||
LV | 14.09.2011 | ||
SE | 14.09.2011 | ||
SI | 14.09.2011 | ||
NO | 14.12.2011 | ||
GR | 15.12.2011 | ||
Former [2012/13] | AT | 14.09.2011 | |
CY | 14.09.2011 | ||
FI | 14.09.2011 | ||
HR | 14.09.2011 | ||
LT | 14.09.2011 | ||
LV | 14.09.2011 | ||
SE | 14.09.2011 | ||
SI | 14.09.2011 | ||
NO | 14.12.2011 | ||
GR | 15.12.2011 | Cited in | International search | [X]EP1455233 (CANON KK [JP]); | [A]US6842221 (SHIRAISHI NAOMASA [JP]); | [X]GB2413645 (BOC GROUP PLC [GB]); |