EP2043430 - ARRANGEMENT FOR DESTROYING VERMIN [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 16.09.2011 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.10.2013 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 06.11.2013 [2013/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Schmitt, Robert Göteborgstrasse 28 97422 Schweinfurt / DE | [2009/15] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2009/15] | Representative(s) | Gosdin, Michael Adam-Stegerwald-Strasse 6 D-97422 Schweinfurt / DE | [2009/15] | Application number, filing date | 08784902.2 | 19.07.2008 | [2009/15] | WO2008EP05932 | Priority number, date | DE20071035152 | 25.07.2007 Original published format: DE102007035152 | DE20081003394 | 08.01.2008 Original published format: DE102008003394 | [2009/15] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2009012948 | Date: | 29.01.2009 | Language: | DE | [2009/05] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2043430 | Date: | 08.04.2009 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 29.01.2009 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2009/15] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2043430 | Date: | 10.11.2010 | Language: | DE | [2010/45] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 29.01.2009 | Classification | IPC: | A01M1/22, A01M3/00 | [2009/15] | CPC: |
A01M1/06 (EP,US);
A01M1/226 (EP,US);
A01M1/24 (EP,US);
A01M19/00 (EP,US);
A01M3/007 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/15] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG ZUR VERNICHTUNG VON UNGEZIEFER | [2009/15] | English: | ARRANGEMENT FOR DESTROYING VERMIN | [2009/15] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE DESTRUCTION DE LA VERMINE | [2009/15] | Entry into regional phase | 22.12.2008 | National basic fee paid | 22.12.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 22.12.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 22.12.2008 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 22.12.2008 | Examination requested [2010/25] | 17.06.2010 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 30.09.2010 | Fee for grant paid | 30.09.2010 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 11.08.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit [2011/42] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.08.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 10.11.2010 | CZ | 10.11.2010 | DK | 10.11.2010 | EE | 10.11.2010 | FI | 10.11.2010 | HR | 10.11.2010 | HU | 10.11.2010 | IE | 10.11.2010 | IT | 10.11.2010 | LT | 10.11.2010 | LV | 10.11.2010 | MT | 10.11.2010 | NL | 10.11.2010 | PL | 10.11.2010 | RO | 10.11.2010 | SE | 10.11.2010 | SI | 10.11.2010 | SK | 10.11.2010 | BG | 10.02.2011 | NO | 10.02.2011 | GR | 11.02.2011 | ES | 21.02.2011 | IS | 10.03.2011 | PT | 10.03.2011 | LU | 19.07.2011 | BE | 31.07.2011 | MC | 31.07.2011 | FR | 01.08.2011 | [2013/45] |
Former [2013/25] | CY | 10.11.2010 | |
CZ | 10.11.2010 | ||
DK | 10.11.2010 | ||
EE | 10.11.2010 | ||
FI | 10.11.2010 | ||
HR | 10.11.2010 | ||
IE | 10.11.2010 | ||
IT | 10.11.2010 | ||
LT | 10.11.2010 | ||
LV | 10.11.2010 | ||
MT | 10.11.2010 | ||
NL | 10.11.2010 | ||
PL | 10.11.2010 | ||
RO | 10.11.2010 | ||
SE | 10.11.2010 | ||
SI | 10.11.2010 | ||
SK | 10.11.2010 | ||
BG | 10.02.2011 | ||
NO | 10.02.2011 | ||
GR | 11.02.2011 | ||
ES | 21.02.2011 | ||
IS | 10.03.2011 | ||
PT | 10.03.2011 | ||
LU | 19.07.2011 | ||
BE | 31.07.2011 | ||
MC | 31.07.2011 | ||
FR | 01.08.2011 | ||
Former [2012/22] | CY | 10.11.2010 | |
CZ | 10.11.2010 | ||
DK | 10.11.2010 | ||
EE | 10.11.2010 | ||
FI | 10.11.2010 | ||
HR | 10.11.2010 | ||
IE | 10.11.2010 | ||
IT | 10.11.2010 | ||
LT | 10.11.2010 | ||
LV | 10.11.2010 | ||
MT | 10.11.2010 | ||
NL | 10.11.2010 | ||
PL | 10.11.2010 | ||
RO | 10.11.2010 | ||
SE | 10.11.2010 | ||
SI | 10.11.2010 | ||
SK | 10.11.2010 | ||
BG | 10.02.2011 | ||
NO | 10.02.2011 | ||
GR | 11.02.2011 | ||
ES | 21.02.2011 | ||
IS | 10.03.2011 | ||
PT | 10.03.2011 | ||
BE | 31.07.2011 | ||
MC | 31.07.2011 | ||
FR | 01.08.2011 | ||
Former [2012/21] | CY | 10.11.2010 | |
CZ | 10.11.2010 | ||
DK | 10.11.2010 | ||
EE | 10.11.2010 | ||
FI | 10.11.2010 | ||
HR | 10.11.2010 | ||
IE | 10.11.2010 | ||
IT | 10.11.2010 | ||
LT | 10.11.2010 | ||
LV | 10.11.2010 | ||
MT | 10.11.2010 | ||
NL | 10.11.2010 | ||
PL | 10.11.2010 | ||
RO | 10.11.2010 | ||
SE | 10.11.2010 | ||
SI | 10.11.2010 | ||
SK | 10.11.2010 | ||
BG | 10.02.2011 | ||
NO | 10.02.2011 | ||
GR | 11.02.2011 | ||
ES | 21.02.2011 | ||
IS | 10.03.2011 | ||
PT | 10.03.2011 | ||
BE | 31.07.2011 | ||
MC | 31.07.2011 | ||
Former [2012/13] | CY | 10.11.2010 | |
CZ | 10.11.2010 | ||
DK | 10.11.2010 | ||
EE | 10.11.2010 | ||
FI | 10.11.2010 | ||
HR | 10.11.2010 | ||
IE | 10.11.2010 | ||
IT | 10.11.2010 | ||
LT | 10.11.2010 | ||
LV | 10.11.2010 | ||
MT | 10.11.2010 | ||
NL | 10.11.2010 | ||
PL | 10.11.2010 | ||
RO | 10.11.2010 | ||
SE | 10.11.2010 | ||
SI | 10.11.2010 | ||
SK | 10.11.2010 | ||
BG | 10.02.2011 | ||
NO | 10.02.2011 | ||
GR | 11.02.2011 | ||
ES | 21.02.2011 | ||
IS | 10.03.2011 | ||
PT | 10.03.2011 | ||
MC | 31.07.2011 | ||
Former [2012/05] | CY | 10.11.2010 | |
CZ | 10.11.2010 | ||
DK | 10.11.2010 | ||
EE | 10.11.2010 | ||
FI | 10.11.2010 | ||
HR | 10.11.2010 | ||
IE | 10.11.2010 | ||
IT | 10.11.2010 | ||
LT | 10.11.2010 | ||
LV | 10.11.2010 | ||
MT | 10.11.2010 | ||
NL | 10.11.2010 | ||
PL | 10.11.2010 | ||
RO | 10.11.2010 | ||
SE | 10.11.2010 | ||
SI | 10.11.2010 | ||
SK | 10.11.2010 | ||
BG | 10.02.2011 | ||
NO | 10.02.2011 | ||
GR | 11.02.2011 | ||
ES | 21.02.2011 | ||
IS | 10.03.2011 | ||
PT | 10.03.2011 | ||
Former [2012/03] | CY | 10.11.2010 | |
CZ | 10.11.2010 | ||
DK | 10.11.2010 | ||
EE | 10.11.2010 | ||
FI | 10.11.2010 | ||
HR | 10.11.2010 | ||
IE | 10.11.2010 | ||
IT | 10.11.2010 | ||
LT | 10.11.2010 | ||
LV | 10.11.2010 | ||
NL | 10.11.2010 | ||
PL | 10.11.2010 | ||
RO | 10.11.2010 | ||
SE | 10.11.2010 | ||
SI | 10.11.2010 | ||
SK | 10.11.2010 | ||
BG | 10.02.2011 | ||
NO | 10.02.2011 | ||
GR | 11.02.2011 | ||
ES | 21.02.2011 | ||
IS | 10.03.2011 | ||
PT | 10.03.2011 | ||
Former [2011/38] | CY | 10.11.2010 | |
CZ | 10.11.2010 | ||
DK | 10.11.2010 | ||
EE | 10.11.2010 | ||
FI | 10.11.2010 | ||
HR | 10.11.2010 | ||
IE | 10.11.2010 | ||
LT | 10.11.2010 | ||
LV | 10.11.2010 | ||
NL | 10.11.2010 | ||
PL | 10.11.2010 | ||
RO | 10.11.2010 | ||
SE | 10.11.2010 | ||
SI | 10.11.2010 | ||
SK | 10.11.2010 | ||
BG | 10.02.2011 | ||
NO | 10.02.2011 | ||
GR | 11.02.2011 | ||
ES | 21.02.2011 | ||
IS | 10.03.2011 | ||
PT | 10.03.2011 | ||
Former [2011/36] | CY | 10.11.2010 | |
CZ | 10.11.2010 | ||
DK | 10.11.2010 | ||
EE | 10.11.2010 | ||
FI | 10.11.2010 | ||
HR | 10.11.2010 | ||
IE | 10.11.2010 | ||
LT | 10.11.2010 | ||
LV | 10.11.2010 | ||
NL | 10.11.2010 | ||
PL | 10.11.2010 | ||
SE | 10.11.2010 | ||
SI | 10.11.2010 | ||
SK | 10.11.2010 | ||
BG | 10.02.2011 | ||
NO | 10.02.2011 | ||
GR | 11.02.2011 | ||
ES | 21.02.2011 | ||
IS | 10.03.2011 | ||
PT | 10.03.2011 | ||
Former [2011/35] | CY | 10.11.2010 | |
CZ | 10.11.2010 | ||
EE | 10.11.2010 | ||
FI | 10.11.2010 | ||
HR | 10.11.2010 | ||
IE | 10.11.2010 | ||
LT | 10.11.2010 | ||
LV | 10.11.2010 | ||
NL | 10.11.2010 | ||
SE | 10.11.2010 | ||
SI | 10.11.2010 | ||
BG | 10.02.2011 | ||
NO | 10.02.2011 | ||
GR | 11.02.2011 | ||
ES | 21.02.2011 | ||
IS | 10.03.2011 | ||
PT | 10.03.2011 | ||
Former [2011/34] | CY | 10.11.2010 | |
FI | 10.11.2010 | ||
HR | 10.11.2010 | ||
IE | 10.11.2010 | ||
LT | 10.11.2010 | ||
LV | 10.11.2010 | ||
NL | 10.11.2010 | ||
SE | 10.11.2010 | ||
SI | 10.11.2010 | ||
BG | 10.02.2011 | ||
NO | 10.02.2011 | ||
GR | 11.02.2011 | ||
ES | 21.02.2011 | ||
IS | 10.03.2011 | ||
PT | 10.03.2011 | ||
Former [2011/29] | CY | 10.11.2010 | |
FI | 10.11.2010 | ||
HR | 10.11.2010 | ||
LT | 10.11.2010 | ||
LV | 10.11.2010 | ||
NL | 10.11.2010 | ||
SE | 10.11.2010 | ||
SI | 10.11.2010 | ||
BG | 10.02.2011 | ||
NO | 10.02.2011 | ||
GR | 11.02.2011 | ||
IS | 10.03.2011 | ||
PT | 10.03.2011 | Cited in | International search | [Y]WO9423632 (TECHNOCOM AB [SE], et al) [Y] 3,27 * page 1, paragraph 5 - page 2, paragraph 3 * * page 4, paragraph 6 - page 6, paragraph 1 * * figures 1-3 *; | [Y]US5452539 (KUROSAWA TOSHISHIGE [JP], et al) [Y] 12 * column 1, line 53 - column 2, line 39 * * figures 1,3,4 *; | [XY]US5926997 (WILCOX RICHARD W [US]) [X] 1,2,4-7,10,11,20,25,26 * column 2, lines 16-39 * * column 3, lines 7-17 * * figures 1,2 * [Y] 3,8,9,12,19,21-23,27; | [Y]GB2346062 (DAKA DEV LIMITED [HK]) [Y] 8,9,19,22,23 * page 10, paragraph 1 - page 12, paragraph 1 * * figures 1-3 *; | [Y]EP1040756 (IND CO LTD AK [HK]) [Y] 19,21 * column 2, paragraph 8 - column 3, paragraph 11 * * figures 1-4 *; | [A]US2005028428 (WILLS HUBERT O [US]) [A] 1,7,19,20,25-27 * paragraphs [0011] - [0016] - [0023] - [0025] ** figures 1-3 * |