EP2176314 - PROCESS FOR THE PREPARATION OF POLY- AND OLIGOTHIOPHENES ON AN INDUSTRIAL SCALE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 12.06.2015 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.06.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 15.07.2015 [2015/29] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Bayer Intellectual Property GmbH Alfred-Nobel-Strasse 10 40789 Monheim / DE | [2012/44] |
Former [2010/16] | For all designated states Bayer Technology Services GmbH 51368 Leverkusen / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HENNINGER, Björn Vondelstrasse 29-31 50677 Köln / DE | 02 /
RAUSCHER, Frank Oberländer Ufer 158 50968 Köln / DE | 03 /
MLECZKO, Leslaw Quittenweg 1 41542 Dormagen / DE | [2010/16] | Representative(s) | BIP Patents c/o Bayer Intellectual Property GmbH Alfred-Nobel-Straße 50 40789 Monheim am Rhein / DE | [N/P] |
Former [N/P] | BIP Patents c/o Bayer Intellectual Property GmbH Creative Campus Monheim Alfred-Nobel-Straße 10 DE-40789 Monheim / DE | ||
Former [2013/01] | BIP Patents Creative Campus Monheim Alfred-Nobel-Straße 10 40789 Monheim / DE | ||
Former [2012/44] | Bayer Intellectual Property GmbH Creative Campus Monheim Alfred-Nobel-Straße 10 40789 Monheim / DE | Application number, filing date | 08784985.7 | 23.07.2008 | [2010/16] | WO2008EP06026 | Priority number, date | DE20071036593 | 02.08.2007 Original published format: DE102007036593 | [2010/16] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2009015810 | Date: | 05.02.2009 | Language: | DE | [2009/06] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2176314 | Date: | 21.04.2010 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 05.02.2009 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2010/16] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 03.09.2009 | Classification | IPC: | C08G61/00, C08G61/12 | [2010/16] | CPC: |
C08G61/126 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2010/16] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON POLY- UND OLIGOTHIOPHENEN IN TECHNISCHEM MASSSTAB | [2010/16] | English: | PROCESS FOR THE PREPARATION OF POLY- AND OLIGOTHIOPHENES ON AN INDUSTRIAL SCALE | [2010/16] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE PRODUCTION DE POLY- ET OLIGOTHIOPHÈNES À ÉCHELLE INDUSTRIELLE | [2010/16] | Entry into regional phase | 02.03.2010 | National basic fee paid | 03.03.2010 | Designation fee(s) paid | 03.03.2010 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 03.03.2010 | Examination requested [2010/16] | 19.03.2010 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 01.06.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.08.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.02.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2015/29] | 27.02.2015 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2015/29] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 01.06.2010 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.08.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 01.08.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.07.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 10.07.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.07.2014 | 07   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]US5756653 (RIEKE REUBEN D [US]); | [X]EP1028136 (UNIV CARNEGIE MELLON [US]); | [X]US6602974 (MCCULLOUGH RICHARD D [US], et al); | [X]WO2005014691 (MERCK PATENT GMBH [DE], et al); | [X]WO2006084545 (MERCK PATENT GMBH [DE], et al); | [E]WO2008092490 (MERCK PATENT GMBH [DE], et al) | by applicant | US4521589 | EP1026138 | EP1028136 |