EP2175924 - NONRETURN VALVE, IN PARTICULAR FOR MEDICAL USES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 20.05.2011 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.05.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 22.06.2011 [2011/25] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Filtertek B.V. Industrial Estate Newcastle West County of Limerick / IE | [2010/16] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CARMODY, Colm Trieneragh Duag Listowel. Co. Kerry / IE | 02 /
COSTELLO, Kieran 9 Fernhill Cullenagh Ballina/Killaloe Co. Clare / IE | [2010/16] | Representative(s) | Vogeser, Werner Hansmann & Vogeser Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Albert-Rosshaupter-Strasse 65 81369 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2010/16] | Vogeser, Werner Hansmann & Vogeser Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Albert-Rosshaupter-Strasse 65 D-81369 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 08785052.5 | 24.07.2008 | [2010/16] | WO2008EP06099 | Priority number, date | DE20072011322U | 13.08.2007 Original published format: DE 202007011322 U | DE20072012680U | 11.09.2007 Original published format: DE 202007012680 U | [2010/16] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2009021605 | Date: | 19.02.2009 | Language: | DE | [2009/08] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2175924 | Date: | 21.04.2010 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 19.02.2009 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2010/16] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 19.02.2009 | Classification | IPC: | A61M39/24, F16K15/14 | [2010/16] | CPC: |
F16K15/144 (EP,US);
A61M39/24 (EP,US);
A61M2039/2433 (EP,US);
A61M2039/246 (EP,US);
Y10T137/7839 (EP,US);
Y10T137/7879 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2010/16] | Title | German: | RÜCKSCHLAGVENTIL, INSBESONDERE FÜR MEDIZINISCHE ANWENDUNGEN | [2010/16] | English: | NONRETURN VALVE, IN PARTICULAR FOR MEDICAL USES | [2010/16] | French: | SOUPAPE DE RETENUE, EN PARTICULIER POUR APPLICATIONS MÉDICALES | [2010/16] | Entry into regional phase | 25.01.2010 | National basic fee paid | 25.01.2010 | Designation fee(s) paid | 25.01.2010 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 25.01.2010 | Examination requested [2010/16] | 20.08.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 31.12.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2011/25] | 07.02.2011 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2011/25] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 20.08.2010 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.07.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]EP0031988 (LORENZO BRUCE DE) [X] 1-7 * figure - *; | [A]EP1703183 (FREUDENBERG CARL KG [DE]) [A] 1-7 * figure 1 *; | [A]GB690897 (HYMATIC ENG CO LTD) [A] 1-7 * figure 4 *; | [A]US4141379 (MANSKE REINHOLD R) [A] 1-7 * figures 2,3 * |