EP2176360 - CONDUCTIVE POWDER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 04.07.2014 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.07.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 06.08.2014 [2014/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Merck Patent GmbH Frankfurter Strasse 250 64293 Darmstadt / DE | [2010/16] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HONJO, Tetsuji 1-16-14-303 Izumitamatsuyu Iwaki-shi Fukushima 971-8172 / JP | 02 /
KOBAYASHI, Satoru 1-23-3-103 Izumitamatsuyu Iwaki-shi Fukushima 971-8172 / JP | 03 /
NITTA, Katsuhisa 1-3-2 Shonandai Iwaki-shi Fukushima 971-8152 / JP | [2010/16] | Application number, filing date | 08785325.5 | 04.08.2008 | [2010/16] | WO2008EP06395 | Priority number, date | JP20070207276 | 08.08.2007 Original published format: JP 2007207276 | [2010/16] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2009018984 | Date: | 12.02.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/07] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2176360 | Date: | 21.04.2010 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 12.02.2009 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2010/16] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 12.02.2009 | Classification | IPC: | C09C1/00, C09D5/29, C09D7/12, C09D11/00 | [2010/16] | CPC: |
C09D5/29 (EP,US);
C09C1/0021 (EP,US);
C09D11/52 (EP,US);
C09D5/002 (EP,US);
C09D5/36 (EP,US);
C09D7/62 (EP,US);
C09D7/69 (EP,US);
C09D7/70 (EP,US);
C01P2004/03 (EP,US);
C01P2006/40 (EP,US);
C08K3/22 (EP,US);
C08K9/02 (EP,US);
C09C2200/1004 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2010/16] | Title | German: | LEITENDES PULVER | [2010/16] | English: | CONDUCTIVE POWDER | [2010/16] | French: | POUDRE CONDUCTRICE | [2010/16] | Entry into regional phase | 12.01.2010 | National basic fee paid | 12.01.2010 | Designation fee(s) paid | 12.01.2010 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 12.01.2010 | Examination requested [2010/16] | 25.08.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 01.03.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.03.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2014/32] | 28.03.2014 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2014/32] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 25.08.2010 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.08.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.08.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 10.08.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.08.2013 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]DE10302589 (MERCK PATENT GMBH [DE]); | [X]US2004180203 (YADAV TAPESH [US], et al); | [PX]EP1932889 (DAINICHISEIKA COLOR CHEM [JP]) | by applicant | JPS60260424 | JPH0692636 | JPH09503739 | JPH09278445 | JP2002179948 | DE10148055 | DE10302589 | US2004180203 | JP2004349167 | JP2006172916 |