EP2174085 - METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR DRYING A MATERIAL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 28.07.2017 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.06.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HR | published on 22.07.2020 [2020/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Mars Incorporated 6885 Elm Street McLean, VA 22101-3883 / US | [2010/15] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SCHMIDT, Siegfried Weitzmühlener Strasse 96 27283 Verden / DE | 02 /
TOIVONEN, Maria Weitzmühlener Str. 102 27283 Verden / DE | [2010/15] | Representative(s) | Scholz, Volker, et al Boehmert & Boehmert Anwaltspartnerschaft mbB Pettenkoferstrasse 22 80336 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2016/38] | Scholz, Volker, et al Boehmert & Boehmert Anwaltspartnerschaft mbB Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte Pettenkoferstrasse 20-22 80336 München / DE | ||
Former [2013/24] | Scholz, Volker, et al Boehmert & Boehmert Pettenkoferstrasse 20-22 80336 München / DE | ||
Former [2010/15] | Winkler, Andreas Fritz Ernst Forrester & Boehmert Pettenkoferstrasse 20-22 80336 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 08785354.5 | 05.08.2008 | [2010/15] | WO2008EP06428 | Priority number, date | DE20071037605 | 07.08.2007 Original published format: DE102007037605 | [2010/15] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2009018996 | Date: | 12.02.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/07] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2174085 | Date: | 14.04.2010 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 12.02.2009 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2010/15] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2174085 | Date: | 21.09.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/38] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 30.04.2009 | Classification | IPC: | F26B3/02, F26B15/10, F26B21/14, F26B25/00 | [2010/15] | CPC: |
F26B25/006 (EP,US);
A23L3/185 (US);
A23L3/40 (US);
A23L5/21 (US);
B65B25/001 (US);
B65B3/04 (US);
B65B35/24 (US);
B65B7/00 (US);
B65B7/28 (US);
F26B15/143 (EP,US);
F26B15/18 (US);
F26B21/14 (EP,US);
F26B25/002 (US);
F26B3/00 (US);
F26B3/02 (EP,US);
F26B3/04 (US);
B65B31/02 (US);
B65B39/007 (US);
B65B63/08 (US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2016/38] |
Former [2010/15] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUM TROCKNEN EINES MATERIALS | [2010/15] | English: | METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR DRYING A MATERIAL | [2010/15] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET APPAREIL DE SÉCHAGE D'UN MATÉRIAU | [2010/15] | Entry into regional phase | 07.12.2009 | National basic fee paid | 07.12.2009 | Designation fee(s) paid | 07.12.2009 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 07.12.2009 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 07.12.2009 | Examination requested [2010/15] | 08.11.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.12.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.09.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.01.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.04.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 05.10.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.03.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.06.2016 | Fee for grant paid | 24.06.2016 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 24.06.2016 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 08.11.2012 | Opposition(s) | 22.06.2017 | No opposition filed within time limit [2017/35] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.08.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.08.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 10.08.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 19.08.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 13.08.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 10.08.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 11.08.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 05.08.2008 | AT | 21.09.2016 | BE | 21.09.2016 | CY | 21.09.2016 | CZ | 21.09.2016 | DK | 21.09.2016 | EE | 21.09.2016 | ES | 21.09.2016 | FI | 21.09.2016 | HR | 21.09.2016 | IT | 21.09.2016 | LT | 21.09.2016 | LV | 21.09.2016 | MC | 21.09.2016 | NL | 21.09.2016 | PL | 21.09.2016 | RO | 21.09.2016 | SE | 21.09.2016 | SI | 21.09.2016 | SK | 21.09.2016 | TR | 21.09.2016 | BG | 21.12.2016 | NO | 21.12.2016 | GR | 22.12.2016 | IS | 21.01.2017 | PT | 23.01.2017 | [2020/30] |
Former [2020/15] | HU | 05.08.2008 | |
AT | 21.09.2016 | ||
BE | 21.09.2016 | ||
CY | 21.09.2016 | ||
CZ | 21.09.2016 | ||
DK | 21.09.2016 | ||
EE | 21.09.2016 | ||
ES | 21.09.2016 | ||
FI | 21.09.2016 | ||
IT | 21.09.2016 | ||
LT | 21.09.2016 | ||
LV | 21.09.2016 | ||
MC | 21.09.2016 | ||
NL | 21.09.2016 | ||
PL | 21.09.2016 | ||
RO | 21.09.2016 | ||
SE | 21.09.2016 | ||
SI | 21.09.2016 | ||
SK | 21.09.2016 | ||
TR | 21.09.2016 | ||
BG | 21.12.2016 | ||
NO | 21.12.2016 | ||
GR | 22.12.2016 | ||
IS | 21.01.2017 | ||
PT | 23.01.2017 | ||
Former [2019/46] | HU | 05.08.2008 | |
AT | 21.09.2016 | ||
BE | 21.09.2016 | ||
CY | 21.09.2016 | ||
CZ | 21.09.2016 | ||
DK | 21.09.2016 | ||
EE | 21.09.2016 | ||
ES | 21.09.2016 | ||
FI | 21.09.2016 | ||
IT | 21.09.2016 | ||
LT | 21.09.2016 | ||
LV | 21.09.2016 | ||
MC | 21.09.2016 | ||
NL | 21.09.2016 | ||
PL | 21.09.2016 | ||
RO | 21.09.2016 | ||
SE | 21.09.2016 | ||
SI | 21.09.2016 | ||
SK | 21.09.2016 | ||
BG | 21.12.2016 | ||
NO | 21.12.2016 | ||
GR | 22.12.2016 | ||
IS | 21.01.2017 | ||
PT | 23.01.2017 | ||
Former [2019/31] | HU | 05.08.2008 | |
AT | 21.09.2016 | ||
BE | 21.09.2016 | ||
CZ | 21.09.2016 | ||
DK | 21.09.2016 | ||
EE | 21.09.2016 | ||
ES | 21.09.2016 | ||
FI | 21.09.2016 | ||
IT | 21.09.2016 | ||
LT | 21.09.2016 | ||
LV | 21.09.2016 | ||
MC | 21.09.2016 | ||
NL | 21.09.2016 | ||
PL | 21.09.2016 | ||
RO | 21.09.2016 | ||
SE | 21.09.2016 | ||
SI | 21.09.2016 | ||
SK | 21.09.2016 | ||
BG | 21.12.2016 | ||
NO | 21.12.2016 | ||
GR | 22.12.2016 | ||
IS | 21.01.2017 | ||
PT | 23.01.2017 | ||
Former [2018/18] | AT | 21.09.2016 | |
BE | 21.09.2016 | ||
CZ | 21.09.2016 | ||
DK | 21.09.2016 | ||
EE | 21.09.2016 | ||
ES | 21.09.2016 | ||
FI | 21.09.2016 | ||
IT | 21.09.2016 | ||
LT | 21.09.2016 | ||
LV | 21.09.2016 | ||
MC | 21.09.2016 | ||
NL | 21.09.2016 | ||
PL | 21.09.2016 | ||
RO | 21.09.2016 | ||
SE | 21.09.2016 | ||
SI | 21.09.2016 | ||
SK | 21.09.2016 | ||
BG | 21.12.2016 | ||
NO | 21.12.2016 | ||
GR | 22.12.2016 | ||
IS | 21.01.2017 | ||
PT | 23.01.2017 | ||
Former [2017/52] | AT | 21.09.2016 | |
BE | 21.09.2016 | ||
CZ | 21.09.2016 | ||
DK | 21.09.2016 | ||
EE | 21.09.2016 | ||
ES | 21.09.2016 | ||
FI | 21.09.2016 | ||
IT | 21.09.2016 | ||
LT | 21.09.2016 | ||
LV | 21.09.2016 | ||
NL | 21.09.2016 | ||
PL | 21.09.2016 | ||
RO | 21.09.2016 | ||
SE | 21.09.2016 | ||
SI | 21.09.2016 | ||
SK | 21.09.2016 | ||
BG | 21.12.2016 | ||
NO | 21.12.2016 | ||
GR | 22.12.2016 | ||
IS | 21.01.2017 | ||
PT | 23.01.2017 | ||
Former [2017/34] | AT | 21.09.2016 | |
BE | 21.09.2016 | ||
CZ | 21.09.2016 | ||
DK | 21.09.2016 | ||
EE | 21.09.2016 | ||
ES | 21.09.2016 | ||
FI | 21.09.2016 | ||
IT | 21.09.2016 | ||
LT | 21.09.2016 | ||
LV | 21.09.2016 | ||
NL | 21.09.2016 | ||
PL | 21.09.2016 | ||
RO | 21.09.2016 | ||
SE | 21.09.2016 | ||
SK | 21.09.2016 | ||
BG | 21.12.2016 | ||
NO | 21.12.2016 | ||
GR | 22.12.2016 | ||
IS | 21.01.2017 | ||
PT | 23.01.2017 | ||
Former [2017/32] | AT | 21.09.2016 | |
BE | 21.09.2016 | ||
CZ | 21.09.2016 | ||
EE | 21.09.2016 | ||
ES | 21.09.2016 | ||
FI | 21.09.2016 | ||
IT | 21.09.2016 | ||
LT | 21.09.2016 | ||
LV | 21.09.2016 | ||
NL | 21.09.2016 | ||
PL | 21.09.2016 | ||
RO | 21.09.2016 | ||
SE | 21.09.2016 | ||
SK | 21.09.2016 | ||
BG | 21.12.2016 | ||
NO | 21.12.2016 | ||
GR | 22.12.2016 | ||
IS | 21.01.2017 | ||
PT | 23.01.2017 | ||
Former [2017/13] | FI | 21.09.2016 | |
LT | 21.09.2016 | ||
LV | 21.09.2016 | ||
NL | 21.09.2016 | ||
SE | 21.09.2016 | ||
NO | 21.12.2016 | ||
GR | 22.12.2016 | ||
Former [2017/12] | FI | 21.09.2016 | |
LT | 21.09.2016 | ||
SE | 21.09.2016 | ||
NO | 21.12.2016 | ||
GR | 22.12.2016 | ||
Former [2017/10] | FI | 21.09.2016 | |
LT | 21.09.2016 | ||
SE | 21.09.2016 | ||
NO | 21.12.2016 | ||
Former [2017/09] | FI | 21.09.2016 | |
LT | 21.09.2016 | ||
NO | 21.12.2016 | ||
Former [2017/07] | LT | 21.09.2016 | Cited in | International search | [XY]US5915815 (MOORE PHILIP [GB], et al) [X] 1-8,14,15,20 * the whole document * [Y] 9-12,16-24,26-29; | [Y]DE4326468 (HENKEL KGAA [DE]) [Y] 9-11 * column 26, lines 30-50; figure 1 *; | [Y]US5101717 (MANSER JOSEF [CH], et al) [Y] 12 * column 14 *; | [DY]US5711086 (STUBBING THOMAS JOHN [GB]) [DY] 16-20,27 * the whole document *; | [Y]US3292272 (POWISCHILL JOHN W) [Y] 21-23 * the whole document *; | [YA]US3197312 (DAVE EOLKIN) [Y] 24 * column 5, lines 1-4; figure . * [A] 13; | [Y]US6287618 (SHINJI KAWAMATA [JP], et al) [Y] 26 * abstract *; | [Y]WO9951924 (ASJ HOLDING APS [DK], et al) [Y] 28,29 * abstract *; | [X]US3803726 (PIKON J, et al) [X] 1,14-18,22,23 * the whole document *; | [XA]EP0372444 (BABCOCK TEXTILMASCH [DE]) [X] 1 * the whole document * [A] 16-18,20,27; | [A]EP0703814 (HENKEL KGAA [DE]) [A] 6 * claims 1,3 *; | [A]US2003070317 (ANDERSON GEORGE E [US], et al); | [A]DE806111 (ALFRED LUETGE); | [A]GB2378498 (STUBBING THOMAS JOHN [GB], et al) |