EP2190485 - METHOD FOR REDUCING THE NUMBER OF VIRUSES AND MICROORGANISMS IN BIOLOGICAL EXTRACTS CONTAINING SOLIDS, AND EXTRACTS PRODUCED ACCORDING TO THIS METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 06.05.2011 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.05.2011 | Withdrawal of application | published on 08.06.2011 [2011/23] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Nordmark Arzneimittel GmbH & Co. KG Pinnauallee 4 25436 Uetersen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2010/22] | For all designated states Nordmark Arzneimittel GmbH & Co.KG Pinnauallee 4 25436 Uetersen / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
RÄMSCH, Christian Dorfstrasse 85 25436 Gross Nordende / DE | 02 /
SCHRÄDER, Thomas Helene-Lange-Weg 16 25436 Uetersen / DE | 03 /
MOEST, Thomas An der Düne 9 25436 Moorrege / DE | 04 /
KURFÜRST, Manfred Kirchenstrasse 24 25436 Moorrege / DE | [2010/22] | Representative(s) | Richter, Joachim RGTH Patentanwälte PartGmbB Neuer Wall 10 20354 Hamburg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2010/22] | Richter, Joachim Richter, Werdermann, Gerbaulet & Hofmann Neuer Wall 10 20354 Hamburg / DE | Application number, filing date | 08785390.9 | 07.08.2008 | [2010/22] | WO2008EP06474 | Priority number, date | DE20072012915U | 14.09.2007 Original published format: DE 202007012915 U | DE20082000137U | 03.01.2008 Original published format: DE 202008000137 U | DE20082003806U | 18.03.2008 Original published format: DE 202008003806 U | [2010/22] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2009036842 | Date: | 26.03.2009 | Language: | DE | [2009/13] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2190485 | Date: | 02.06.2010 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 26.03.2009 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2010/22] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 26.03.2009 | Classification | IPC: | A61L2/00, C07K14/435 | [2010/22] | CPC: |
C07K14/435 (EP,US);
A61K41/17 (EP,US);
A61L2/0011 (EP,US);
A61L2/0035 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2010/22] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR REDUKTION DER VIREN- UND MIKROORGANISMEN-BELASTUNG FESTSTOFFHALTIGER BIOLOGISCHER EXTRAKTE UND NACH DEM VERFAHREN HERGESTELLTE EXTRAKTE | [2010/22] | English: | METHOD FOR REDUCING THE NUMBER OF VIRUSES AND MICROORGANISMS IN BIOLOGICAL EXTRACTS CONTAINING SOLIDS, AND EXTRACTS PRODUCED ACCORDING TO THIS METHOD | [2010/22] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE RÉDUCTION DE LA CHARGE DE VIRUS ET DE MICRO-ORGANISMES D'EXTRAITS BIOLOGIQUES CONTENANT DES SOLIDES ET EXTRAITS PRODUITS SELON LE PROCÉDÉ | [2010/22] | Entry into regional phase | 09.04.2009 | National basic fee paid | 09.04.2009 | Designation fee(s) paid | 09.04.2009 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 09.04.2009 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 09.04.2009 | Examination requested [2010/22] | 14.06.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 01.10.2010 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 19.10.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.04.2011 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2011/23] | 20.04.2011 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 30.05.2011 | 30.05.2011 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 14.06.2010 | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 19.10.2010 | Request for further processing filed | 19.10.2010 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 29.10.2010 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.08.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]US2003031584 (BURGESS WILSON [US], et al) [X] 1-30 * paragraph [0035]; figures 1-14; examples 1-14; claims 8-16 *; | [X]US2003059338 (MANN DAVID M [US], et al) [X] 1-30 * paragraphs [0027] , [0040]; examples 1-5; claims 40,41,74-81 *; | [X]US2006115376 (MANN DAVID M [US], et al) [X] 1-30* paragraph [0056]; figures 1-7; examples 1-10 *; | [DX] - QUEHL, LEUCHTENBERGER, SCHALINATUS, "Entkeimung von Pankreatinpräparaten mittels Gamma-Strahlen", DIE NAHRUNG, (1985), vol. 29, no. 1, pages 105 - 107, XP002504317 [DX] 1-30 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/food.19850290127 | by applicant | DE2135025 | DE2512746 | DE3248588 | US6749851 | EP1464342 | US2007003430 | - QUEHL ET AL., DIE NAHRUNG, (1985), vol. 29, no. 1, pages 105 - 107 |