EP2188333 - MOLDED PARTS HAVING IMPROVED SURFACES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 26.11.2010 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.11.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 29.12.2010 [2010/52] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Bayer MaterialScience AG 51368 Leverkusen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2010/21] | For all designated states Bayer MaterialScience AG 51368 Leverkusen / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WEHRMANN, Rolf Scheiblerstrasse 101 47800 Krefeld / DE | 02 /
ERKELENZ, Michael Ringstrasse 23 47239 Duisburg / DE | 03 /
DERN, Gesa Karolingerstrasse 50 40223 Düsseldorf / DE | 04 /
KRAUTER, Berit Tilmannstr.3 41464 Neuss / DE | [2010/21] | Application number, filing date | 08785612.6 | 19.08.2008 | [2010/21] | WO2008EP06794 | Priority number, date | DE20071040926 | 30.08.2007 Original published format: DE102007040926 | [2010/21] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2009030357 | Date: | 12.03.2009 | Language: | DE | [2009/11] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2188333 | Date: | 26.05.2010 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 12.03.2009 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2010/21] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 12.03.2009 | Classification | IPC: | C08K7/24 | [2010/21] | CPC: |
C08K3/041 (EP,KR,US);
B82Y30/00 (KR);
C08J5/005 (KR);
C08K7/24 (KR);
C08L23/00 (KR);
C08L25/06 (KR);
C08L33/08 (KR);
C08L67/00 (KR);
C08L69/00 (KR);
| C-Set: |
C08K3/041, C08L69/00 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2010/21] | Title | German: | FORMTEILE MIT VERBESSERTEN OBERFLÄCHEN | [2010/21] | English: | MOLDED PARTS HAVING IMPROVED SURFACES | [2010/21] | French: | PIÈCES MOULÉES PRÉSENTANT DES SURFACES DE QUALITÉ AMÉLIORÉE | [2010/21] | Entry into regional phase | 30.03.2010 | National basic fee paid | 30.03.2010 | Designation fee(s) paid | 30.03.2010 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 30.03.2010 | Examination requested [2010/21] | 27.05.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2010/52] | 13.07.2010 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report not received in time [2010/52] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.08.2010 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]JP2006083195 ; | [X]US2002040090 (KURASAWA YOSHIHIRO [JP], et al) [X] 1-8 * tables 1-3 * * paragraph [0168] * * claims 1-5 *; | [X]WO2005082988 (BASF AG [DE], et al) [X] 1-5,8 * examples 1-6 ** claims 1-5 *; | [X] - DATABASE WPI, 0, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 2006, no. 26, Database accession no. 2006-246475, XP002505029 & JP2006083195 A 20060330 (IDEMITSU KOSAN CO LTD) [X] 1-8 * abstract * |