EP2200537 - CALCIUM PHOSPHATE BASED DELIVERY OF GROWTH AND DIFFERENTIATION FACTORS TO COMPROMISED BONE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 16.09.2016 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.08.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): BG | published on 19.09.2018 [2018/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Friedrich-Schiller-Universität Jena Fürstengraben 1 07745 Jena / DE | For all designated states Universitätsklinikum Jena Bachstrasse 18 07743 Jena / DE | [2010/33] |
Former [2010/26] | For all designated states DePuy-Biotech Gmbh Klosterlausnitzer Strasse 81 07607 Eisenberg / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
VENBROCKS, Rudolf, A. Ofenthaler Weg 20 97762 Hammelburg / DE | 02 /
KINNE, Raimund, W. August-Bebel-Strasse 19 07743 Jena / DE | 03 /
JANDT, Klaus, D. Laasaner Oberweg 11 07751 Jena / DE | 04 /
BOSSERT, Joerg Obere Zense 22 07616 Buergel / DE | 05 /
HORTSCHANSKY, Peter Haydnstrasse 17 07749 Jena / DE | 06 /
SCHMUCK, Klaus Am Speitewitz 120a 07552 Gera / DE | [2015/25] |
Former [2010/26] | 01 /
VENBROCKS, Rudolf, A. Klengelscher Weg 33 07607 Hainspitz / DE | ||
02 /
KINNE, Raimund, W. August-Bebel-Strasse 19 07743 Jena / DE | |||
03 /
JANDT, Klaus, D. Laasaner Oberweg 11 07751 Jena / DE | |||
04 /
BOSSERT, Joerg Obere Zense 22 07616 Buergel / DE | |||
05 /
HORTSCHANSKY, Peter Haydnstrasse 17 07749 Jena / DE | |||
06 /
SCHMUCK, Klaus Am Speitewitz 120a 07552 Gera / DE | Representative(s) | Jany, Peter, et al c/o LICHTI Patentanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Bergwaldstraße 1 76227 Karlsruhe / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2014/44] | Jany, Peter, et al Patentanwalt Karlstraße 87 76137 Karlsruhe / DE | ||
Former [2012/21] | Jany und Petersen Patentanwälte Partnerschaft Karlstraße 87 76137 Karlsruhe / DE | ||
Former [2010/26] | Jany, Peter, et al Patentanwalt Karlstrasse 87 76137 Karlsruhe / DE | Application number, filing date | 08785830.4 | 05.09.2008 | [2010/26] | WO2008EP07248 | Priority number, date | US20070970258P | 05.09.2007 Original published format: US 970258 P | US20070928889 | 30.10.2007 Original published format: US 928889 | EP20070022543 | 21.11.2007 Original published format: EP 07022543 | [2010/26] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2009030483 | Date: | 12.03.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/11] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2200537 | Date: | 30.06.2010 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 12.03.2009 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2010/26] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2200537 | Date: | 11.11.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/46] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 23.04.2009 | Classification | IPC: | A61K38/00, A61L27/56, A61L27/42, A61L27/54, A61L27/58, C07K14/495, A61F2/28 | [2014/44] | CPC: |
A61L27/425 (EP,US);
A61L27/54 (EP,US);
A61L27/56 (EP,US);
A61L27/58 (EP,US);
C07K14/495 (EP,US);
A61F2002/2817 (EP,US);
A61F2310/00293 (EP,US);
A61K38/00 (EP,US);
A61L2300/414 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2010/26] | A61F2/28, A61L27/42, A61L27/54, C07K14/495, A61L27/58 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2015/46] |
Former [2010/26] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | CALCIUMPHOSPHAT-BASIERTE ABGABE VON WACHSTUMS- UND DIFFERENZIERUNGSFAKTOREN AN BEEINTRÄCHTIGTEN KNOCHEN | [2010/26] | English: | CALCIUM PHOSPHATE BASED DELIVERY OF GROWTH AND DIFFERENTIATION FACTORS TO COMPROMISED BONE | [2010/26] | French: | ADMINISTRATION AVEC DU PHOSPHATE DE CALCIUM DE FACTEURS DE CROISSANCE ET DE DIFFÉRENCIATION À UN OS FRAGILISÉ | [2010/26] | Entry into regional phase | 03.04.2010 | National basic fee paid | 03.04.2010 | Designation fee(s) paid | 03.04.2010 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 03.04.2010 | Examination requested [2010/26] | 05.06.2010 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 27.10.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 29.11.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.07.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M08) | 03.02.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.10.2014 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 30.03.2015 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time | 22.04.2015 | Fee for grant paid | 22.04.2015 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 22.04.2015 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 27.10.2011 | Opposition(s) | 12.08.2016 | No opposition filed within time limit [2016/42] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to fulfill actions required for granting the patent | 22.04.2015 | Request for further processing filed | 22.04.2015 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 19.05.2015 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.09.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.09.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.09.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 29.09.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 29.09.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 05.09.2008 | AT | 11.11.2015 | BE | 11.11.2015 | BG | 11.11.2015 | CY | 11.11.2015 | CZ | 11.11.2015 | DK | 11.11.2015 | EE | 11.11.2015 | ES | 11.11.2015 | FI | 11.11.2015 | HR | 11.11.2015 | IT | 11.11.2015 | LT | 11.11.2015 | LV | 11.11.2015 | MC | 11.11.2015 | NL | 11.11.2015 | PL | 11.11.2015 | RO | 11.11.2015 | SE | 11.11.2015 | SI | 11.11.2015 | SK | 11.11.2015 | TR | 11.11.2015 | NO | 11.02.2016 | GR | 12.02.2016 | IS | 11.03.2016 | PT | 11.03.2016 | [2018/38] |
Former [2018/33] | HU | 05.09.2008 | |
AT | 11.11.2015 | ||
BE | 11.11.2015 | ||
CY | 11.11.2015 | ||
CZ | 11.11.2015 | ||
DK | 11.11.2015 | ||
EE | 11.11.2015 | ||
ES | 11.11.2015 | ||
FI | 11.11.2015 | ||
HR | 11.11.2015 | ||
IT | 11.11.2015 | ||
LT | 11.11.2015 | ||
LV | 11.11.2015 | ||
MC | 11.11.2015 | ||
NL | 11.11.2015 | ||
PL | 11.11.2015 | ||
RO | 11.11.2015 | ||
SE | 11.11.2015 | ||
SI | 11.11.2015 | ||
SK | 11.11.2015 | ||
TR | 11.11.2015 | ||
NO | 11.02.2016 | ||
GR | 12.02.2016 | ||
IS | 11.03.2016 | ||
PT | 11.03.2016 | ||
Former [2018/29] | HU | 05.09.2008 | |
AT | 11.11.2015 | ||
BE | 11.11.2015 | ||
CY | 11.11.2015 | ||
CZ | 11.11.2015 | ||
DK | 11.11.2015 | ||
EE | 11.11.2015 | ||
ES | 11.11.2015 | ||
FI | 11.11.2015 | ||
HR | 11.11.2015 | ||
IT | 11.11.2015 | ||
LT | 11.11.2015 | ||
LV | 11.11.2015 | ||
MC | 11.11.2015 | ||
NL | 11.11.2015 | ||
PL | 11.11.2015 | ||
RO | 11.11.2015 | ||
SE | 11.11.2015 | ||
SI | 11.11.2015 | ||
SK | 11.11.2015 | ||
TR | 11.11.2015 | ||
NO | 11.02.2016 | ||
GR | 12.02.2016 | ||
IS | 11.03.2016 | ||
PT | 11.03.2016 | ||
Former [2018/28] | HU | 05.09.2008 | |
AT | 11.11.2015 | ||
BE | 11.11.2015 | ||
CY | 11.11.2015 | ||
CZ | 11.11.2015 | ||
DK | 11.11.2015 | ||
EE | 11.11.2015 | ||
ES | 11.11.2015 | ||
FI | 11.11.2015 | ||
HR | 11.11.2015 | ||
IT | 11.11.2015 | ||
LT | 11.11.2015 | ||
LV | 11.11.2015 | ||
MC | 11.11.2015 | ||
NL | 11.11.2015 | ||
PL | 11.11.2015 | ||
RO | 11.11.2015 | ||
SE | 11.11.2015 | ||
SI | 11.11.2015 | ||
SK | 11.11.2015 | ||
NO | 11.02.2016 | ||
GR | 12.02.2016 | ||
IS | 11.03.2016 | ||
PT | 11.03.2016 | ||
Former [2017/31] | AT | 11.11.2015 | |
BE | 11.11.2015 | ||
CZ | 11.11.2015 | ||
DK | 11.11.2015 | ||
EE | 11.11.2015 | ||
ES | 11.11.2015 | ||
FI | 11.11.2015 | ||
HR | 11.11.2015 | ||
IT | 11.11.2015 | ||
LT | 11.11.2015 | ||
LV | 11.11.2015 | ||
MC | 11.11.2015 | ||
NL | 11.11.2015 | ||
PL | 11.11.2015 | ||
RO | 11.11.2015 | ||
SE | 11.11.2015 | ||
SI | 11.11.2015 | ||
SK | 11.11.2015 | ||
NO | 11.02.2016 | ||
GR | 12.02.2016 | ||
IS | 11.03.2016 | ||
PT | 11.03.2016 | ||
Former [2017/03] | AT | 11.11.2015 | |
BE | 11.11.2015 | ||
CZ | 11.11.2015 | ||
DK | 11.11.2015 | ||
EE | 11.11.2015 | ||
ES | 11.11.2015 | ||
FI | 11.11.2015 | ||
HR | 11.11.2015 | ||
IT | 11.11.2015 | ||
LT | 11.11.2015 | ||
LV | 11.11.2015 | ||
NL | 11.11.2015 | ||
PL | 11.11.2015 | ||
RO | 11.11.2015 | ||
SE | 11.11.2015 | ||
SI | 11.11.2015 | ||
SK | 11.11.2015 | ||
NO | 11.02.2016 | ||
GR | 12.02.2016 | ||
IS | 11.03.2016 | ||
PT | 11.03.2016 | ||
Former [2016/49] | AT | 11.11.2015 | |
CZ | 11.11.2015 | ||
DK | 11.11.2015 | ||
EE | 11.11.2015 | ||
ES | 11.11.2015 | ||
FI | 11.11.2015 | ||
HR | 11.11.2015 | ||
IT | 11.11.2015 | ||
LT | 11.11.2015 | ||
LV | 11.11.2015 | ||
NL | 11.11.2015 | ||
PL | 11.11.2015 | ||
RO | 11.11.2015 | ||
SE | 11.11.2015 | ||
SI | 11.11.2015 | ||
SK | 11.11.2015 | ||
NO | 11.02.2016 | ||
GR | 12.02.2016 | ||
IS | 11.03.2016 | ||
PT | 11.03.2016 | ||
Former [2016/39] | AT | 11.11.2015 | |
CZ | 11.11.2015 | ||
DK | 11.11.2015 | ||
EE | 11.11.2015 | ||
ES | 11.11.2015 | ||
FI | 11.11.2015 | ||
HR | 11.11.2015 | ||
IT | 11.11.2015 | ||
LT | 11.11.2015 | ||
LV | 11.11.2015 | ||
NL | 11.11.2015 | ||
PL | 11.11.2015 | ||
RO | 11.11.2015 | ||
SE | 11.11.2015 | ||
SK | 11.11.2015 | ||
NO | 11.02.2016 | ||
GR | 12.02.2016 | ||
IS | 11.03.2016 | ||
PT | 11.03.2016 | ||
Former [2016/36] | AT | 11.11.2015 | |
CZ | 11.11.2015 | ||
EE | 11.11.2015 | ||
ES | 11.11.2015 | ||
FI | 11.11.2015 | ||
HR | 11.11.2015 | ||
IT | 11.11.2015 | ||
LT | 11.11.2015 | ||
LV | 11.11.2015 | ||
NL | 11.11.2015 | ||
PL | 11.11.2015 | ||
RO | 11.11.2015 | ||
SE | 11.11.2015 | ||
SK | 11.11.2015 | ||
NO | 11.02.2016 | ||
GR | 12.02.2016 | ||
IS | 11.03.2016 | ||
PT | 11.03.2016 | ||
Former [2016/34] | AT | 11.11.2015 | |
CZ | 11.11.2015 | ||
ES | 11.11.2015 | ||
FI | 11.11.2015 | ||
HR | 11.11.2015 | ||
IT | 11.11.2015 | ||
LT | 11.11.2015 | ||
LV | 11.11.2015 | ||
NL | 11.11.2015 | ||
PL | 11.11.2015 | ||
SE | 11.11.2015 | ||
NO | 11.02.2016 | ||
GR | 12.02.2016 | ||
IS | 11.03.2016 | ||
PT | 11.03.2016 | ||
Former [2016/25] | AT | 11.11.2015 | |
ES | 11.11.2015 | ||
FI | 11.11.2015 | ||
HR | 11.11.2015 | ||
IT | 11.11.2015 | ||
LT | 11.11.2015 | ||
LV | 11.11.2015 | ||
NL | 11.11.2015 | ||
PL | 11.11.2015 | ||
SE | 11.11.2015 | ||
NO | 11.02.2016 | ||
GR | 12.02.2016 | ||
IS | 11.03.2016 | ||
PT | 11.03.2016 | ||
Former [2016/24] | AT | 11.11.2015 | |
ES | 11.11.2015 | ||
FI | 11.11.2015 | ||
HR | 11.11.2015 | ||
IT | 11.11.2015 | ||
LT | 11.11.2015 | ||
NL | 11.11.2015 | ||
PL | 11.11.2015 | ||
SE | 11.11.2015 | ||
NO | 11.02.2016 | ||
GR | 12.02.2016 | ||
IS | 11.03.2016 | ||
PT | 11.03.2016 | ||
Former [2016/23] | ES | 11.11.2015 | |
HR | 11.11.2015 | ||
IT | 11.11.2015 | ||
LT | 11.11.2015 | ||
NL | 11.11.2015 | ||
SE | 11.11.2015 | ||
NO | 11.02.2016 | ||
IS | 11.03.2016 | ||
Former [2016/22] | ES | 11.11.2015 | |
IT | 11.11.2015 | ||
LT | 11.11.2015 | ||
NL | 11.11.2015 | ||
NO | 11.02.2016 | ||
IS | 11.03.2016 | ||
Former [2016/21] | ES | 11.11.2015 | |
IT | 11.11.2015 | ||
LT | 11.11.2015 | ||
NO | 11.02.2016 | ||
Former [2016/20] | ES | 11.11.2015 | |
LT | 11.11.2015 | Cited in | International search | [X]DE19647853 (BIOPH BIOTECH ENTW PHARM GMBH [DE], et al) [X] 1-16,26-28,32-46 * page 2 - page 10 *; | [X]EP1604693 (SCIL TECHNOLOGY GMBH [DE]) [X] 1-3,6,7,14-16,32,34,36,39-41,46 * pages 3,4 * * pages 14,17 * * examples 2,3 *; | [X]US2005170012 (DALAL PARESH S [US], et al) [X] 8-15,17-26,33,38-46 * page 6, paragraphs 63,65 * * page 7, paragraphs 71,72,80,81 * * page 9, paragraph 99 * * page 1, paragraph 8 * * page 17, paragraph 161 * * page 16, paragraphs 152,155 * * page 5, paragraph 61 * |