EP2171736 - ELECTRICAL PROTECTIVE DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 24.05.2013 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.05.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 26.06.2013 [2013/26] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Siemens Aktiengesellschaft Wittelsbacherplatz 2 80333 München / DE | [2013/11] |
Former [2010/14] | For all designated states Siemens Aktiengesellschaft Wittelsbacherplatz 2 80333 München / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
RITZER, Thomas Telemannstrasse 4 93128 Regenstauf / DE | [2010/14] | Application number, filing date | 08785879.1 | 25.06.2008 | [2010/14] | WO2008EP58053 | Priority number, date | DE20071034526 | 24.07.2007 Original published format: DE102007034526 | [2010/14] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2009013091 | Date: | 29.01.2009 | Language: | DE | [2009/05] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2171736 | Date: | 07.04.2010 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 29.01.2009 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2010/14] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 29.01.2009 | Classification | IPC: | H01H1/22, H01H3/02, H01H9/32, H01H73/04, H01H73/18 | [2010/14] | CPC: |
H01H1/22 (EP);
H01H3/0253 (EP);
H01H73/04 (EP);
H01H73/18 (EP);
H01H9/30 (EP);
H01H9/32 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2010/14] | Title | German: | ELEKTRISCHE SCHUTZEINRICHTUNG | [2010/14] | English: | ELECTRICAL PROTECTIVE DEVICE | [2010/14] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE PROTECTION ÉLECTRIQUE | [2010/14] | Entry into regional phase | 08.12.2009 | National basic fee paid | 08.12.2009 | Designation fee(s) paid | 08.12.2009 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 30.04.2009 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 08.12.2009 | Examination requested [2010/14] | 27.05.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.07.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.01.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2013/26] | 04.02.2013 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2013/26] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 27.05.2010 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.06.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.06.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.06.2012 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XY]DE1135552 (SCHIELE VERWALTUNGSGMBH) [X] 1-5,7,11-14 * page 1 - page 2; figures 1-6 * [Y] 6,8-10; | [Y]US3205333 (JEAN BONNEFOIS, et al) [Y] 6,8-10 * column 2, line 3 - column 3, line 49; figures 1,2 *; | [A]FR2866751 (FUJI ELEC FA COMPONENTS & SYS [JP]) [A] 1 * page 1 - page 10; figures 1A-5 * | by applicant | DE3539976 | DE1763007 | US2005184837 | US3205333 | DE1135552 |