EP2179193 - SHIFTING ELEMENT COMPRISING AT LEAST THREE SHIFT POSITIONS FOR SHIFTING TWO GEAR RATIOS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 08.05.2015 Database last updated on 12.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.07.2016 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): LU, TR | published on 17.08.2016 [2016/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ZF Friedrichshafen AG Graf-von-Soden-Platz 1 88046 Friedrichshafen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2010/17] | For all designated states ZF Friedrichshafen AG 88038 Friedrichshafen / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GÖTZ, Manuel Raueneggstrasse 8 88212 Ravensburg / DE | 02 /
REISCH, Matthias Neuhaldenstr. 12 88214 Ravensburg / DE | 03 /
GUMPOLTSBERGER, Gerhard Saint-Dié-Str. 25 88045 Friedrichshafen / DE | [2010/17] | Application number, filing date | 08786500.2 | 28.07.2008 | [2010/17] | WO2008EP59859 | Priority number, date | DE20071040040 | 24.08.2007 Original published format: DE102007040040 | [2010/17] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2009027162 | Date: | 05.03.2009 | Language: | DE | [2009/10] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2179193 | Date: | 28.04.2010 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 05.03.2009 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2010/17] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2179193 | Date: | 02.07.2014 | Language: | DE | [2014/27] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 05.03.2009 | Classification | IPC: | F16D21/04 | [2010/17] | CPC: |
F16D21/04 (EP,US);
F16H2063/3093 (EP,US);
Y10T74/19228 (EP,US);
Y10T74/19288 (EP,US);
Y10T74/20396 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2010/17] | Title | German: | SCHALTELEMENT UMFASSEND ZUMINDEST DREI SCHALTSTELLUNGEN ZUM SCHALTEN VON ZWEI ÜBERSETZUNGSSTUFEN | [2010/17] | English: | SHIFTING ELEMENT COMPRISING AT LEAST THREE SHIFT POSITIONS FOR SHIFTING TWO GEAR RATIOS | [2010/17] | French: | ÉLÉMENT DE CHANGEMENT DE VITESSES COMPRENANT AU MOINS TROIS POSITIONS DE CHANGEMENT DE VITESSES POUR ENGAGER DEUX RAPPORTS DE TRANSMISSION | [2010/17] | Entry into regional phase | 26.01.2010 | National basic fee paid | 26.01.2010 | Designation fee(s) paid | 26.01.2010 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 26.01.2010 | Examination requested [2010/17] | 20.05.2010 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 29.06.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 02.12.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.04.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 11.10.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.04.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.07.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.02.2014 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.05.2014 | Fee for grant paid | 16.05.2014 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 16.05.2014 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 29.06.2011 | Opposition(s) | 07.04.2015 | No opposition filed within time limit [2015/24] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.07.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.07.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.07.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 10.07.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 28.07.2008 | CY | 02.07.2014 | CZ | 02.07.2014 | DK | 02.07.2014 | EE | 02.07.2014 | ES | 02.07.2014 | FI | 02.07.2014 | HR | 02.07.2014 | IT | 02.07.2014 | LT | 02.07.2014 | LV | 02.07.2014 | MC | 02.07.2014 | MT | 02.07.2014 | NL | 02.07.2014 | PL | 02.07.2014 | RO | 02.07.2014 | SI | 02.07.2014 | SK | 02.07.2014 | TR | 02.07.2014 | AT | 28.07.2014 | IE | 28.07.2014 | LU | 28.07.2014 | BE | 31.07.2014 | CH | 31.07.2014 | LI | 31.07.2014 | BG | 02.10.2014 | GB | 02.10.2014 | NO | 02.10.2014 | GR | 03.10.2014 | IS | 02.11.2014 | PT | 03.11.2014 | [2016/33] |
Former [2016/32] | HU | 28.07.2008 | |
CY | 02.07.2014 | ||
CZ | 02.07.2014 | ||
DK | 02.07.2014 | ||
EE | 02.07.2014 | ||
ES | 02.07.2014 | ||
FI | 02.07.2014 | ||
HR | 02.07.2014 | ||
IT | 02.07.2014 | ||
LT | 02.07.2014 | ||
LV | 02.07.2014 | ||
MC | 02.07.2014 | ||
MT | 02.07.2014 | ||
NL | 02.07.2014 | ||
PL | 02.07.2014 | ||
RO | 02.07.2014 | ||
SI | 02.07.2014 | ||
SK | 02.07.2014 | ||
AT | 28.07.2014 | ||
IE | 28.07.2014 | ||
BE | 31.07.2014 | ||
CH | 31.07.2014 | ||
LI | 31.07.2014 | ||
BG | 02.10.2014 | ||
GB | 02.10.2014 | ||
NO | 02.10.2014 | ||
GR | 03.10.2014 | ||
IS | 02.11.2014 | ||
PT | 03.11.2014 | ||
Former [2016/28] | CY | 02.07.2014 | |
CZ | 02.07.2014 | ||
DK | 02.07.2014 | ||
EE | 02.07.2014 | ||
ES | 02.07.2014 | ||
FI | 02.07.2014 | ||
HR | 02.07.2014 | ||
IT | 02.07.2014 | ||
LT | 02.07.2014 | ||
LV | 02.07.2014 | ||
MC | 02.07.2014 | ||
MT | 02.07.2014 | ||
NL | 02.07.2014 | ||
PL | 02.07.2014 | ||
RO | 02.07.2014 | ||
SI | 02.07.2014 | ||
SK | 02.07.2014 | ||
AT | 28.07.2014 | ||
IE | 28.07.2014 | ||
CH | 31.07.2014 | ||
LI | 31.07.2014 | ||
BG | 02.10.2014 | ||
GB | 02.10.2014 | ||
NO | 02.10.2014 | ||
GR | 03.10.2014 | ||
IS | 02.11.2014 | ||
PT | 03.11.2014 | ||
Former [2015/51] | CY | 02.07.2014 | |
CZ | 02.07.2014 | ||
DK | 02.07.2014 | ||
EE | 02.07.2014 | ||
ES | 02.07.2014 | ||
FI | 02.07.2014 | ||
HR | 02.07.2014 | ||
IT | 02.07.2014 | ||
LT | 02.07.2014 | ||
LV | 02.07.2014 | ||
MC | 02.07.2014 | ||
NL | 02.07.2014 | ||
PL | 02.07.2014 | ||
RO | 02.07.2014 | ||
SI | 02.07.2014 | ||
SK | 02.07.2014 | ||
AT | 28.07.2014 | ||
IE | 28.07.2014 | ||
CH | 31.07.2014 | ||
LI | 31.07.2014 | ||
BG | 02.10.2014 | ||
GB | 02.10.2014 | ||
NO | 02.10.2014 | ||
GR | 03.10.2014 | ||
IS | 02.11.2014 | ||
PT | 03.11.2014 | ||
Former [2015/50] | CY | 02.07.2014 | |
CZ | 02.07.2014 | ||
DK | 02.07.2014 | ||
EE | 02.07.2014 | ||
ES | 02.07.2014 | ||
FI | 02.07.2014 | ||
HR | 02.07.2014 | ||
IT | 02.07.2014 | ||
LT | 02.07.2014 | ||
LV | 02.07.2014 | ||
MC | 02.07.2014 | ||
NL | 02.07.2014 | ||
PL | 02.07.2014 | ||
RO | 02.07.2014 | ||
SI | 02.07.2014 | ||
SK | 02.07.2014 | ||
IE | 28.07.2014 | ||
CH | 31.07.2014 | ||
LI | 31.07.2014 | ||
BG | 02.10.2014 | ||
GB | 02.10.2014 | ||
NO | 02.10.2014 | ||
GR | 03.10.2014 | ||
IS | 02.11.2014 | ||
PT | 03.11.2014 | ||
Former [2015/37] | CY | 02.07.2014 | |
CZ | 02.07.2014 | ||
DK | 02.07.2014 | ||
EE | 02.07.2014 | ||
ES | 02.07.2014 | ||
FI | 02.07.2014 | ||
HR | 02.07.2014 | ||
IT | 02.07.2014 | ||
LT | 02.07.2014 | ||
LV | 02.07.2014 | ||
MC | 02.07.2014 | ||
NL | 02.07.2014 | ||
PL | 02.07.2014 | ||
RO | 02.07.2014 | ||
SK | 02.07.2014 | ||
IE | 28.07.2014 | ||
CH | 31.07.2014 | ||
LI | 31.07.2014 | ||
BG | 02.10.2014 | ||
GB | 02.10.2014 | ||
NO | 02.10.2014 | ||
GR | 03.10.2014 | ||
IS | 02.11.2014 | ||
PT | 03.11.2014 | ||
Former [2015/36] | CY | 02.07.2014 | |
CZ | 02.07.2014 | ||
DK | 02.07.2014 | ||
EE | 02.07.2014 | ||
ES | 02.07.2014 | ||
FI | 02.07.2014 | ||
HR | 02.07.2014 | ||
IT | 02.07.2014 | ||
LT | 02.07.2014 | ||
LV | 02.07.2014 | ||
MC | 02.07.2014 | ||
NL | 02.07.2014 | ||
PL | 02.07.2014 | ||
RO | 02.07.2014 | ||
SK | 02.07.2014 | ||
CH | 31.07.2014 | ||
LI | 31.07.2014 | ||
BG | 02.10.2014 | ||
GB | 02.10.2014 | ||
NO | 02.10.2014 | ||
GR | 03.10.2014 | ||
IS | 02.11.2014 | ||
PT | 03.11.2014 | ||
Former [2015/23] | CY | 02.07.2014 | |
CZ | 02.07.2014 | ||
DK | 02.07.2014 | ||
EE | 02.07.2014 | ||
ES | 02.07.2014 | ||
FI | 02.07.2014 | ||
HR | 02.07.2014 | ||
IT | 02.07.2014 | ||
LT | 02.07.2014 | ||
LV | 02.07.2014 | ||
MC | 02.07.2014 | ||
NL | 02.07.2014 | ||
PL | 02.07.2014 | ||
RO | 02.07.2014 | ||
SK | 02.07.2014 | ||
CH | 31.07.2014 | ||
LI | 31.07.2014 | ||
BG | 02.10.2014 | ||
NO | 02.10.2014 | ||
GR | 03.10.2014 | ||
IS | 02.11.2014 | ||
PT | 03.11.2014 | ||
Former [2015/22] | CY | 02.07.2014 | |
CZ | 02.07.2014 | ||
DK | 02.07.2014 | ||
ES | 02.07.2014 | ||
FI | 02.07.2014 | ||
HR | 02.07.2014 | ||
IT | 02.07.2014 | ||
LT | 02.07.2014 | ||
LV | 02.07.2014 | ||
MC | 02.07.2014 | ||
NL | 02.07.2014 | ||
PL | 02.07.2014 | ||
RO | 02.07.2014 | ||
CH | 31.07.2014 | ||
LI | 31.07.2014 | ||
BG | 02.10.2014 | ||
NO | 02.10.2014 | ||
GR | 03.10.2014 | ||
IS | 02.11.2014 | ||
PT | 03.11.2014 | ||
Former [2015/20] | CY | 02.07.2014 | |
CZ | 02.07.2014 | ||
ES | 02.07.2014 | ||
FI | 02.07.2014 | ||
HR | 02.07.2014 | ||
LT | 02.07.2014 | ||
LV | 02.07.2014 | ||
MC | 02.07.2014 | ||
NL | 02.07.2014 | ||
PL | 02.07.2014 | ||
CH | 31.07.2014 | ||
LI | 31.07.2014 | ||
BG | 02.10.2014 | ||
NO | 02.10.2014 | ||
GR | 03.10.2014 | ||
IS | 02.11.2014 | ||
PT | 03.11.2014 | ||
Former [2015/12] | CY | 02.07.2014 | |
CZ | 02.07.2014 | ||
ES | 02.07.2014 | ||
FI | 02.07.2014 | ||
HR | 02.07.2014 | ||
LT | 02.07.2014 | ||
LV | 02.07.2014 | ||
NL | 02.07.2014 | ||
PL | 02.07.2014 | ||
BG | 02.10.2014 | ||
NO | 02.10.2014 | ||
GR | 03.10.2014 | ||
IS | 02.11.2014 | ||
PT | 03.11.2014 | ||
Former [2015/11] | CY | 02.07.2014 | |
CZ | 02.07.2014 | ||
ES | 02.07.2014 | ||
FI | 02.07.2014 | ||
LT | 02.07.2014 | ||
PL | 02.07.2014 | ||
BG | 02.10.2014 | ||
NO | 02.10.2014 | ||
GR | 03.10.2014 | ||
PT | 03.11.2014 | ||
Former [2015/10] | CZ | 02.07.2014 | |
ES | 02.07.2014 | ||
FI | 02.07.2014 | ||
LT | 02.07.2014 | ||
BG | 02.10.2014 | ||
NO | 02.10.2014 | ||
Former [2015/09] | FI | 02.07.2014 | |
LT | 02.07.2014 | ||
Former [2015/08] | LT | 02.07.2014 | Cited in | International search | [A]US3333661 (PAWLINA JULIAN S, et al) [A] 24* figures 1,2 *; | [X]US4111288 (FOGELBERG MARK JOHN) [X] 1 * column 2, line 12 - column 4, line 64; figures 1-10b *; | [A]US4303151 (KOLACZ FERDYNAND) [A] 8 * abstract *; | [X]FR2875183 (PEUGEOT CITROEN AUTOMOBILES SA [FR]) [X] 1-4 * page 6, line 19 - page 16, line 12; figures 2a,2b,2c,3a,3b *; | [X]FR2875280 (PEUGEOT CITROEN AUTOMOBILES SA [FR]) [X] 1-4 * the whole document * | by applicant | DE3233931 | DE10232835 | FR2875280 |