EP2187747 - FUNGICIDAL MIXTURES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 17.02.2012 Database last updated on 10.05.2025 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.10.2013 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 06.11.2013 [2013/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BASF SE Carl-Bosch-Strasse 38 67056 Ludwigshafen am Rhein / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2010/21] | For all designated states BASF SE 67056 Ludwigshafen / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GOLD, Randall Evan Birkenweg 3 67283 Obrigheim / DE | 02 /
BESTMAN, Hans Eichstr. 52a 67434 Neustadt/Weinstrasse / DE | 03 /
HADEN, Egon Bayernstrasse 55 67061 Ludwigshafen / DE | [2010/21] | Application number, filing date | 08786613.3 | 30.07.2008 | [2010/21] | WO2008EP59979 | Priority number, date | EP20070114051 | 09.08.2007 Original published format: EP 07114051 | [2010/21] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2009019176 | Date: | 12.02.2009 | Language: | DE | [2009/07] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2187747 | Date: | 26.05.2010 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 12.02.2009 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2010/21] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2187747 | Date: | 13.04.2011 | Language: | DE | [2011/15] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 28.05.2009 | Classification | IPC: | A01P3/00, A01N43/54, A01N47/14 | [2010/43] | CPC: |
A01N43/54 (EP,US)
| C-Set: |
A01N43/54, A01N2300/00 (US,EP);
A01N43/54, A01N47/14 (EP,US) |
Former IPC [2010/21] | A01P3/00, A01N43/54 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2010/21] | Title | German: | FUNGIZIDE MISCHUNGEN | [2010/21] | English: | FUNGICIDAL MIXTURES | [2010/21] | French: | MELANGES FONGICIDES | [2010/21] | Entry into regional phase | 09.03.2010 | National basic fee paid | 09.03.2010 | Designation fee(s) paid | 09.03.2010 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 18.06.2009 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 04.02.2010 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 09.03.2010 | Examination requested [2010/21] | 16.07.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.09.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.10.2010 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.01.2011 | Fee for grant paid | 27.01.2011 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 16.01.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit [2012/12] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.08.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 13.04.2011 | CZ | 13.04.2011 | DK | 13.04.2011 | EE | 13.04.2011 | FI | 13.04.2011 | HR | 13.04.2011 | HU | 13.04.2011 | IE | 13.04.2011 | LT | 13.04.2011 | LV | 13.04.2011 | MT | 13.04.2011 | NL | 13.04.2011 | PL | 13.04.2011 | RO | 13.04.2011 | SE | 13.04.2011 | SI | 13.04.2011 | SK | 13.04.2011 | TR | 13.04.2011 | BG | 13.07.2011 | NO | 13.07.2011 | GR | 14.07.2011 | LU | 30.07.2011 | BE | 31.07.2011 | MC | 31.07.2011 | IS | 13.08.2011 | PT | 16.08.2011 | [2013/45] |
Former [2013/44] | CY | 13.04.2011 | |
CZ | 13.04.2011 | ||
DK | 13.04.2011 | ||
EE | 13.04.2011 | ||
FI | 13.04.2011 | ||
HR | 13.04.2011 | ||
IE | 13.04.2011 | ||
LT | 13.04.2011 | ||
LV | 13.04.2011 | ||
MT | 13.04.2011 | ||
NL | 13.04.2011 | ||
PL | 13.04.2011 | ||
RO | 13.04.2011 | ||
SE | 13.04.2011 | ||
SI | 13.04.2011 | ||
SK | 13.04.2011 | ||
TR | 13.04.2011 | ||
BG | 13.07.2011 | ||
NO | 13.07.2011 | ||
GR | 14.07.2011 | ||
LU | 30.07.2011 | ||
BE | 31.07.2011 | ||
MC | 31.07.2011 | ||
IS | 13.08.2011 | ||
PT | 16.08.2011 | ||
Former [2013/29] | CY | 13.04.2011 | |
CZ | 13.04.2011 | ||
DK | 13.04.2011 | ||
EE | 13.04.2011 | ||
FI | 13.04.2011 | ||
HR | 13.04.2011 | ||
IE | 13.04.2011 | ||
LT | 13.04.2011 | ||
LV | 13.04.2011 | ||
MT | 13.04.2011 | ||
NL | 13.04.2011 | ||
PL | 13.04.2011 | ||
RO | 13.04.2011 | ||
SE | 13.04.2011 | ||
SI | 13.04.2011 | ||
SK | 13.04.2011 | ||
BG | 13.07.2011 | ||
NO | 13.07.2011 | ||
GR | 14.07.2011 | ||
LU | 30.07.2011 | ||
BE | 31.07.2011 | ||
MC | 31.07.2011 | ||
IS | 13.08.2011 | ||
PT | 16.08.2011 | ||
Former [2013/25] | CY | 13.04.2011 | |
CZ | 13.04.2011 | ||
DK | 13.04.2011 | ||
EE | 13.04.2011 | ||
FI | 13.04.2011 | ||
HR | 13.04.2011 | ||
IE | 13.04.2011 | ||
LT | 13.04.2011 | ||
LV | 13.04.2011 | ||
MT | 13.04.2011 | ||
NL | 13.04.2011 | ||
PL | 13.04.2011 | ||
RO | 13.04.2011 | ||
SE | 13.04.2011 | ||
SI | 13.04.2011 | ||
SK | 13.04.2011 | ||
NO | 13.07.2011 | ||
GR | 14.07.2011 | ||
LU | 30.07.2011 | ||
BE | 31.07.2011 | ||
MC | 31.07.2011 | ||
IS | 13.08.2011 | ||
PT | 16.08.2011 | ||
Former [2012/21] | CY | 13.04.2011 | |
CZ | 13.04.2011 | ||
DK | 13.04.2011 | ||
EE | 13.04.2011 | ||
FI | 13.04.2011 | ||
HR | 13.04.2011 | ||
IE | 13.04.2011 | ||
LT | 13.04.2011 | ||
LV | 13.04.2011 | ||
MT | 13.04.2011 | ||
NL | 13.04.2011 | ||
PL | 13.04.2011 | ||
RO | 13.04.2011 | ||
SE | 13.04.2011 | ||
SI | 13.04.2011 | ||
SK | 13.04.2011 | ||
NO | 13.07.2011 | ||
GR | 14.07.2011 | ||
BE | 31.07.2011 | ||
MC | 31.07.2011 | ||
IS | 13.08.2011 | ||
PT | 16.08.2011 | ||
Former [2012/13] | CY | 13.04.2011 | |
CZ | 13.04.2011 | ||
DK | 13.04.2011 | ||
EE | 13.04.2011 | ||
FI | 13.04.2011 | ||
HR | 13.04.2011 | ||
IE | 13.04.2011 | ||
LT | 13.04.2011 | ||
LV | 13.04.2011 | ||
MT | 13.04.2011 | ||
NL | 13.04.2011 | ||
PL | 13.04.2011 | ||
RO | 13.04.2011 | ||
SE | 13.04.2011 | ||
SI | 13.04.2011 | ||
SK | 13.04.2011 | ||
NO | 13.07.2011 | ||
GR | 14.07.2011 | ||
MC | 31.07.2011 | ||
IS | 13.08.2011 | ||
PT | 16.08.2011 | ||
Former [2012/05] | CY | 13.04.2011 | |
FI | 13.04.2011 | ||
HR | 13.04.2011 | ||
LT | 13.04.2011 | ||
LV | 13.04.2011 | ||
MT | 13.04.2011 | ||
NL | 13.04.2011 | ||
SE | 13.04.2011 | ||
SI | 13.04.2011 | ||
NO | 13.07.2011 | ||
GR | 14.07.2011 | ||
IS | 13.08.2011 | ||
PT | 16.08.2011 | ||
Former [2012/02] | CY | 13.04.2011 | |
FI | 13.04.2011 | ||
HR | 13.04.2011 | ||
LT | 13.04.2011 | ||
LV | 13.04.2011 | ||
NL | 13.04.2011 | ||
SE | 13.04.2011 | ||
SI | 13.04.2011 | ||
NO | 13.07.2011 | ||
GR | 14.07.2011 | ||
IS | 13.08.2011 | ||
PT | 16.08.2011 | ||
Former [2011/50] | CY | 13.04.2011 | |
FI | 13.04.2011 | ||
HR | 13.04.2011 | ||
LT | 13.04.2011 | ||
LV | 13.04.2011 | ||
SE | 13.04.2011 | ||
SI | 13.04.2011 | ||
NO | 13.07.2011 | ||
GR | 14.07.2011 | ||
IS | 13.08.2011 | ||
PT | 16.08.2011 | ||
Former [2011/49] | CY | 13.04.2011 | |
FI | 13.04.2011 | ||
HR | 13.04.2011 | ||
LT | 13.04.2011 | ||
SE | 13.04.2011 | ||
NO | 13.07.2011 | ||
GR | 14.07.2011 | ||
PT | 16.08.2011 | ||
Former [2011/48] | LT | 13.04.2011 | |
SE | 13.04.2011 | ||
NO | 13.07.2011 | ||
PT | 16.08.2011 | ||
Former [2011/47] | LT | 13.04.2011 | |
NO | 13.07.2011 | ||
PT | 16.08.2011 | Cited in | International search | [A]WO2005104847 (BASF AG [DE], et al) [A] * page 8, line 33; claim 1 *; | [X] - SHOLBERG PETER L ET AL, "Effect of preharvest application of cyprodinil on postharvest decay of apples caused by Botrytis cinerea.", PLANT DISEASE, (200309), vol. 87, no. 9, ISSN 0191-2917, pages 1067 - 1071, XP002518262 [X] 1-13 * table 1 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1094/PDIS.2003.87.9.1067 |