EP2181038 - COUPLING DEVICE INTENDED TO CONNECT FIRST AND SECOND ELEMENTS WHICH ARE ARTICULATED WITH RESPECT TO ONE ANOTHER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 15.03.2019 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 17.02.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.03.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 17.04.2019 [2019/16] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Safran Nacelles route du Pont 8 76700 Gonfreville-l'Orcher / FR | [2017/04] |
Former [2010/18] | For all designated states Aircelle 8 Route du Pont 76700 Gonfreville L'Orcher / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SOULIER, Pascal-Marie Paul Marcel 45 rue Lesueur F-76600 Le Havre / FR | 02 /
DE SORBAY, Aurélie 1 rue Joseph Clerc F-76600 Le Havre / FR | [2010/18] | Representative(s) | Chevalier, Renaud Philippe Cabinet Germain & Maureau BP 6153 69466 Lyon Cedex 06 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2010/18] | Chevalier, Renaud Philippe Cabinet Germain & Maureau BP 6153 69466 Lyon Cedex 06 / FR | Application number, filing date | 08786954.1 | 06.08.2008 | [2010/18] | WO2008EP60348 | Priority number, date | FR20070005935 | 20.08.2007 Original published format: FR 0705935 | [2010/18] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2009024470 | Date: | 26.02.2009 | Language: | FR | [2009/09] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2181038 | Date: | 05.05.2010 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 26.02.2009 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2010/18] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 26.02.2009 | Classification | IPC: | B64D29/06, B64D29/08 | [2010/18] | CPC: |
B64D27/40 (EP,US);
B64D27/406 (EP,US);
F02K1/763 (EP,US);
F16B2200/63 (EP,US);
Y02T50/60 (EP,US);
Y10T403/32221 (EP,US);
Y10T403/32861 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2010/18] | Title | German: | KOPPLUNGSVORRICHTUNG ZUR VERBINDUNG ZWEIER IM VERHÄLTNIS ZUEINANDER SCHWENKBARER ELEMENTE | [2010/18] | English: | COUPLING DEVICE INTENDED TO CONNECT FIRST AND SECOND ELEMENTS WHICH ARE ARTICULATED WITH RESPECT TO ONE ANOTHER | [2010/18] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE LIAISON, DESTINÉ À RELIER UN PREMIER ET UN SECOND ÉLÉMENTS ARTICULÉS L'UN PAR RAPPORT À L'AUTRE | [2010/18] | Entry into regional phase | 13.01.2010 | National basic fee paid | 13.01.2010 | Designation fee(s) paid | 13.01.2010 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 13.01.2010 | Examination requested [2010/18] | 21.02.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 27.07.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.11.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 02.05.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.07.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.11.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2019/16] | 12.12.2018 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2019/16] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 21.02.2017 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.06.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.06.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.06.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.06.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 30.06.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 15.07.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 15.07.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 17.07.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 16.08.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 11 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]FR2771459 (AEROSPATIALE [FR]) [X] 1-3 * page 5, line 7 - page 8, line 14; figure - *; | [X]FR2771710 (AEROSPATIALE [FR]) [X] 1-3 * page 5, line 24 - page 9, line 25; figure - *; | [A]FR2830842 (SHORT BROTHERS PLC [GB]) [A] 1-7* page 11, line 14 - page 16, line 21; figure - *; | [A]US6622963 (AHRENDT TERRY J [US], et al) [A] 1-7 * column 2, line 45 - column 5, line 63; figure - * |