EP2190578 - APPARATUS AND PROCESS FOR REMOVING SUBSTANCES FROM PRE-FILLED CONTAINERS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 13.01.2017 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.07.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MT | published on 22.08.2018 [2018/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Qiagen GmbH Qiagen Strasse 1 40724 Hilden / DE | [2010/22] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
VOIT, Thomas Heinrich Heine Str. 44 40721 Hilden / DE | 02 /
WILDHABER, Andrea Schwärzi 1 CH-8732 Neuhaus / CH | [2010/22] | Representative(s) | Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | [2016/10] |
Former [2010/22] | Viktor, Rainer Vossius & Partner Siebertstrasse 4 81675 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 08787293.3 | 18.08.2008 | [2010/22] | WO2008EP60810 | Priority number, date | EP20070016192 | 17.08.2007 Original published format: EP 07016192 | EP20070018725 | 24.09.2007 Original published format: EP 07018725 | [2010/22] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2009024559 | Date: | 26.02.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/09] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2190578 | Date: | 02.06.2010 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 26.02.2009 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2010/22] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2190578 | Date: | 09.03.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/10] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 26.02.2009 | Classification | IPC: | B01L3/00, B01L3/02, G01N35/10, B65D51/00 | [2010/22] | CPC: |
B01L3/50853 (EP,US);
B65B69/0041 (US);
B65D77/08 (US);
G01N35/1079 (EP,US);
B01L2200/16 (EP,US);
B01L2300/044 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2016/10] |
Former [2010/22] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG UND METHODE ZUR ENTNAHME EINER SUBSTANZ AUS EINEM VORGEFÜLLTEN BEHÄLTNIS | [2015/38] | English: | APPARATUS AND PROCESS FOR REMOVING SUBSTANCES FROM PRE-FILLED CONTAINERS | [2010/22] | French: | DISPOSITIF ET PROCÉDÉ DESTINÉ AU RETRAIT DE SUBSTANCES DE RÉCIPIENTS PRÉREMPLIS | [2015/36] |
Former [2010/22] | VORRICHTUNG UND VERFAHREN ZUM ENTFERNEN VON STOFFEN AUS VORGEFÜLLTEN BEHÄLTERN | ||
Former [2010/22] | APPAREIL ET PROCÉDÉ POUR ÉLIMINER DES SUBSTANCES DE CONTENANTS PRÉREMPLIS | Entry into regional phase | 08.03.2010 | National basic fee paid | 08.03.2010 | Designation fee(s) paid | 08.03.2010 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 08.03.2010 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 08.03.2010 | Examination requested [2010/22] | 01.08.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 05.12.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.06.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.06.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.09.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.12.2015 | Fee for grant paid | 22.12.2015 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 22.12.2015 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 01.08.2013 | Opposition(s) | 12.12.2016 | No opposition filed within time limit [2017/07] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.08.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.08.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.08.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 23.08.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 25.08.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 20.08.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 18.08.2008 | AT | 09.03.2016 | BE | 09.03.2016 | CY | 09.03.2016 | CZ | 09.03.2016 | DK | 09.03.2016 | EE | 09.03.2016 | ES | 09.03.2016 | FI | 09.03.2016 | HR | 09.03.2016 | LT | 09.03.2016 | LV | 09.03.2016 | MC | 09.03.2016 | NL | 09.03.2016 | PL | 09.03.2016 | RO | 09.03.2016 | SE | 09.03.2016 | SI | 09.03.2016 | SK | 09.03.2016 | TR | 09.03.2016 | BG | 09.06.2016 | NO | 09.06.2016 | GR | 10.06.2016 | IS | 09.07.2016 | PT | 11.07.2016 | IE | 18.08.2016 | LU | 18.08.2016 | MT | 31.08.2016 | [2018/33] |
Former [2018/29] | HU | 18.08.2008 | |
AT | 09.03.2016 | ||
BE | 09.03.2016 | ||
CY | 09.03.2016 | ||
CZ | 09.03.2016 | ||
DK | 09.03.2016 | ||
EE | 09.03.2016 | ||
ES | 09.03.2016 | ||
FI | 09.03.2016 | ||
HR | 09.03.2016 | ||
LT | 09.03.2016 | ||
LV | 09.03.2016 | ||
MC | 09.03.2016 | ||
NL | 09.03.2016 | ||
PL | 09.03.2016 | ||
RO | 09.03.2016 | ||
SE | 09.03.2016 | ||
SI | 09.03.2016 | ||
SK | 09.03.2016 | ||
TR | 09.03.2016 | ||
BG | 09.06.2016 | ||
NO | 09.06.2016 | ||
GR | 10.06.2016 | ||
IS | 09.07.2016 | ||
PT | 11.07.2016 | ||
IE | 18.08.2016 | ||
LU | 18.08.2016 | ||
Former [2018/28] | HU | 18.08.2008 | |
AT | 09.03.2016 | ||
BE | 09.03.2016 | ||
CY | 09.03.2016 | ||
CZ | 09.03.2016 | ||
DK | 09.03.2016 | ||
EE | 09.03.2016 | ||
ES | 09.03.2016 | ||
FI | 09.03.2016 | ||
HR | 09.03.2016 | ||
LT | 09.03.2016 | ||
LV | 09.03.2016 | ||
MC | 09.03.2016 | ||
NL | 09.03.2016 | ||
PL | 09.03.2016 | ||
RO | 09.03.2016 | ||
SE | 09.03.2016 | ||
SI | 09.03.2016 | ||
SK | 09.03.2016 | ||
BG | 09.06.2016 | ||
NO | 09.06.2016 | ||
GR | 10.06.2016 | ||
IS | 09.07.2016 | ||
PT | 11.07.2016 | ||
IE | 18.08.2016 | ||
LU | 18.08.2016 | ||
Former [2017/37] | AT | 09.03.2016 | |
BE | 09.03.2016 | ||
CZ | 09.03.2016 | ||
DK | 09.03.2016 | ||
EE | 09.03.2016 | ||
ES | 09.03.2016 | ||
FI | 09.03.2016 | ||
HR | 09.03.2016 | ||
LT | 09.03.2016 | ||
LV | 09.03.2016 | ||
MC | 09.03.2016 | ||
NL | 09.03.2016 | ||
PL | 09.03.2016 | ||
RO | 09.03.2016 | ||
SE | 09.03.2016 | ||
SI | 09.03.2016 | ||
SK | 09.03.2016 | ||
BG | 09.06.2016 | ||
NO | 09.06.2016 | ||
GR | 10.06.2016 | ||
IS | 09.07.2016 | ||
PT | 11.07.2016 | ||
IE | 18.08.2016 | ||
LU | 18.08.2016 | ||
Former [2017/23] | AT | 09.03.2016 | |
BE | 09.03.2016 | ||
CZ | 09.03.2016 | ||
DK | 09.03.2016 | ||
EE | 09.03.2016 | ||
ES | 09.03.2016 | ||
FI | 09.03.2016 | ||
HR | 09.03.2016 | ||
LT | 09.03.2016 | ||
LV | 09.03.2016 | ||
MC | 09.03.2016 | ||
NL | 09.03.2016 | ||
PL | 09.03.2016 | ||
RO | 09.03.2016 | ||
SE | 09.03.2016 | ||
SI | 09.03.2016 | ||
SK | 09.03.2016 | ||
BG | 09.06.2016 | ||
NO | 09.06.2016 | ||
GR | 10.06.2016 | ||
IS | 09.07.2016 | ||
PT | 11.07.2016 | ||
Former [2017/20] | AT | 09.03.2016 | |
BE | 09.03.2016 | ||
CZ | 09.03.2016 | ||
DK | 09.03.2016 | ||
EE | 09.03.2016 | ||
ES | 09.03.2016 | ||
FI | 09.03.2016 | ||
HR | 09.03.2016 | ||
LT | 09.03.2016 | ||
LV | 09.03.2016 | ||
MC | 09.03.2016 | ||
NL | 09.03.2016 | ||
PL | 09.03.2016 | ||
RO | 09.03.2016 | ||
SE | 09.03.2016 | ||
SK | 09.03.2016 | ||
BG | 09.06.2016 | ||
NO | 09.06.2016 | ||
GR | 10.06.2016 | ||
IS | 09.07.2016 | ||
PT | 11.07.2016 | ||
Former [2017/07] | AT | 09.03.2016 | |
BE | 09.03.2016 | ||
CZ | 09.03.2016 | ||
DK | 09.03.2016 | ||
EE | 09.03.2016 | ||
ES | 09.03.2016 | ||
FI | 09.03.2016 | ||
HR | 09.03.2016 | ||
LT | 09.03.2016 | ||
LV | 09.03.2016 | ||
NL | 09.03.2016 | ||
PL | 09.03.2016 | ||
RO | 09.03.2016 | ||
SE | 09.03.2016 | ||
SK | 09.03.2016 | ||
NO | 09.06.2016 | ||
GR | 10.06.2016 | ||
IS | 09.07.2016 | ||
PT | 11.07.2016 | ||
Former [2017/03] | AT | 09.03.2016 | |
BE | 09.03.2016 | ||
CZ | 09.03.2016 | ||
EE | 09.03.2016 | ||
ES | 09.03.2016 | ||
FI | 09.03.2016 | ||
HR | 09.03.2016 | ||
LT | 09.03.2016 | ||
LV | 09.03.2016 | ||
NL | 09.03.2016 | ||
PL | 09.03.2016 | ||
RO | 09.03.2016 | ||
SE | 09.03.2016 | ||
SK | 09.03.2016 | ||
NO | 09.06.2016 | ||
GR | 10.06.2016 | ||
IS | 09.07.2016 | ||
PT | 11.07.2016 | ||
Former [2016/51] | AT | 09.03.2016 | |
CZ | 09.03.2016 | ||
EE | 09.03.2016 | ||
ES | 09.03.2016 | ||
FI | 09.03.2016 | ||
HR | 09.03.2016 | ||
LT | 09.03.2016 | ||
LV | 09.03.2016 | ||
NL | 09.03.2016 | ||
PL | 09.03.2016 | ||
RO | 09.03.2016 | ||
SE | 09.03.2016 | ||
SK | 09.03.2016 | ||
NO | 09.06.2016 | ||
GR | 10.06.2016 | ||
IS | 09.07.2016 | ||
PT | 11.07.2016 | ||
Former [2016/50] | AT | 09.03.2016 | |
CZ | 09.03.2016 | ||
EE | 09.03.2016 | ||
ES | 09.03.2016 | ||
FI | 09.03.2016 | ||
HR | 09.03.2016 | ||
LT | 09.03.2016 | ||
LV | 09.03.2016 | ||
NL | 09.03.2016 | ||
PL | 09.03.2016 | ||
RO | 09.03.2016 | ||
SE | 09.03.2016 | ||
SK | 09.03.2016 | ||
NO | 09.06.2016 | ||
GR | 10.06.2016 | ||
IS | 09.07.2016 | ||
Former [2016/49] | EE | 09.03.2016 | |
ES | 09.03.2016 | ||
FI | 09.03.2016 | ||
HR | 09.03.2016 | ||
LT | 09.03.2016 | ||
LV | 09.03.2016 | ||
NL | 09.03.2016 | ||
PL | 09.03.2016 | ||
SE | 09.03.2016 | ||
NO | 09.06.2016 | ||
GR | 10.06.2016 | ||
IS | 09.07.2016 | ||
Former [2016/48] | ES | 09.03.2016 | |
FI | 09.03.2016 | ||
HR | 09.03.2016 | ||
LT | 09.03.2016 | ||
LV | 09.03.2016 | ||
NL | 09.03.2016 | ||
PL | 09.03.2016 | ||
SE | 09.03.2016 | ||
NO | 09.06.2016 | ||
GR | 10.06.2016 | ||
IS | 09.07.2016 | ||
Former [2016/40] | ES | 09.03.2016 | |
FI | 09.03.2016 | ||
HR | 09.03.2016 | ||
LT | 09.03.2016 | ||
LV | 09.03.2016 | ||
NL | 09.03.2016 | ||
PL | 09.03.2016 | ||
SE | 09.03.2016 | ||
NO | 09.06.2016 | ||
GR | 10.06.2016 | ||
Former [2016/39] | ES | 09.03.2016 | |
FI | 09.03.2016 | ||
HR | 09.03.2016 | ||
LT | 09.03.2016 | ||
LV | 09.03.2016 | ||
PL | 09.03.2016 | ||
SE | 09.03.2016 | ||
NO | 09.06.2016 | ||
GR | 10.06.2016 | ||
Former [2016/36] | ES | 09.03.2016 | |
FI | 09.03.2016 | ||
HR | 09.03.2016 | ||
LT | 09.03.2016 | ||
PL | 09.03.2016 | ||
NO | 09.06.2016 | ||
GR | 10.06.2016 | ||
Former [2016/35] | ES | 09.03.2016 | |
FI | 09.03.2016 | ||
HR | 09.03.2016 | ||
NO | 09.06.2016 | ||
GR | 10.06.2016 | Cited in | International search | [XY]EP0126390 (DU PONT [US]) [X] 1-4,7-9 * figures 1-12 * [Y] 5,6,16-29; | [A]US4577514 (BRADLEY CHARLES A [US], et al) [A] 1-9,16-21 * figures 1-6 *; | [Y]WO8912829 (BAXTER INT [US]) [Y] 1-9,16-21 * figures 4,6-8 *; | [Y]WO9011752 (CLEANTECH S C I AB [SE]) [Y] 1-9,16-21 * figures 4-6 *; | [XY]US4982740 (BRODEN BENGT-INGE [SE]) [X] 16-19 * figures 1-5 * [Y] 1-9,20,21; | [Y]EP0478905 (HOFFMANN LA ROCHE [CH]) [Y] 1-9,16-21 * figures 1-15 *; | [Y]DE19512607 (RULL JOHANN DR MED [DE]) [Y] 5,6,16-21 * figures 1,3-5,8 *; | [X]US6027694 (BOULTON DAVID A [US], et al) [X] 10-15 * figures 1-3,6,7,9 *; | [XY]US6475774 (GUPTA HEMANT [US]) [X] 10-15 * figures 1-15 * [Y] 22-29; | [A]WO2005100945 (BIOTROVE INC [US], et al) [A] 1-9,16-21 * figures 1-4 *; | [A]DE102004038152 (EPPENDORF AG [DE]) [A] 14* figures 1-4 *; | [A]US2006263250 (BLOUIN MATTHEW [US], et al) [A] 1-9,16-21 * figures 1,3-7 * |