EP2172587 - STAIN-REMOVING MACHINE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 27.02.2015 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.02.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 01.04.2015 [2015/14] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Perez-toril Galan, Francisco Javier C/ Antonio Silva, 3 10002 Caceres / ES | [2010/14] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2010/14] | Representative(s) | ABG Intellectual Property Law, S.L. Avenida de Burgos, 16D Edificio Euromor 28036 Madrid / ES | [N/P] |
Former [2010/14] | ABG Patentes, S.L. Avenida de Burgos 16D Edificio Euromor 28036 Madrid / ES | Application number, filing date | 08787595.1 | 06.06.2008 | [2010/14] | WO2008ES00414 | Priority number, date | ES20070001282U | 14.06.2007 Original published format: ES 200701282 U | [2010/14] | Filing language | ES | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2008152168 | Date: | 18.12.2008 | Language: | ES | [2008/51] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2172587 | Date: | 07.04.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/14] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | ES | 12.02.2009 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.02.2014 | Classification | IPC: | D06B5/22, D06F7/00, D06F19/00, D06F43/00 | [2014/12] | CPC: |
D06F43/002 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2010/14] | D06B5/22, D06F7/00, D06F19/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2010/14] | Title | German: | FLECKENENTFERNUNGSMASCHINE | [2010/14] | English: | STAIN-REMOVING MACHINE | [2010/14] | French: | DISPOSITIF DÉTACHEUR | [2010/14] | Entry into regional phase | 28.12.2009 | Translation filed | 28.12.2009 | National basic fee paid | 28.12.2009 | Search fee paid | 28.12.2009 | Designation fee(s) paid | 28.12.2009 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 28.12.2009 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 28.12.2009 | Examination requested [2010/14] | 18.09.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2015/14] | 30.10.2014 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2015/14] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 01.06.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 06.04.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.05.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 10.05.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.06.2014 | 07   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO9305225 (JUNG HERBERT C JR [US]) [A] 1-12* the whole document *; | [XAY]JPH07100288 (KIMIJIMA TAKAYUKI) [X] 1-5 * the whole document * [A] 7-12 [Y] 6; | [YA]US5493744 (BECKSTEIN HELMUT [DE], et al) [Y] 6 * column 3, line 39 - column 4, line 13; figure - * [A] 1-5,7-12; | [A]WO03074775 (SOEBERG JESPER [DK]) [A] 1-12 * page 7, line 20 - page 13, line 26; figure - *; | [A]DE102004026861 (RUETH UWE [DE]) [A] 1-12 * the whole document * | International search | [X]US656802 (BATZ JOHANNA M [US]); | [A]WO9305225 (JUNG HERBERT C JR [US]); | [X]JPH07100288 (KIMIJIMA TAKAYUKI); | [Y]US5493744 (BECKSTEIN HELMUT [DE], et al); | [X]US5707163 (GREGORY JACK [US]); | [X]WO03074775 (SOEBERG JESPER [DK]); | [Y]US2005284190 (FAN TIEN-CHU [TW], et al) |