EP2168967 - INTERMEDIATES FOR PREPARATION OF AN INHIBITOR OF PHOSPHODIESTERASE TYPE 5 [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 27.09.2013 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.09.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 30.10.2013 [2013/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Galenicum Health, S.l. Diagonal 123, Planta 11 08005 Barcelona / ES | [N/P] |
Former [2010/13] | For all designated states Galenicum Health, S.l. Av. Diagonal 538 4º 1ª 08006 Barcelona / ES | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CANTOS LLOPART, Carme Parc Científic de Barcelona C. Josep Samitier, 1-5 E-08028 Barcelona / ES | 02 /
COMELY, Alexander, Christian C/ Entença, 44, 2n 1a E-08015 Barcelona / ES | 03 /
RAFECAS JANÉ, Llorenç Pau Casals, 13 E-43712 Llorenç del Penedès (Tarragona) / ES | 04 /
TESSON, Nicolas Justa Goicoechea, 8 3°2ª 08902 L'Hospitalet de Llobregat / ES | [2010/23] |
Former [2010/13] | 01 /
CANTOS LLOPART, Carme Parc Científic de Barcelona C. Josep Samitier, 1-5 E-08028 Barcelona / ES | ||
02 /
COMELY, Alexander, Christian C/ Entença, 44, 2n 1a E-08015 Barcelona / ES | |||
03 /
RAFECAS JANÉ, Llorenç Pau Casals, 13 E-43712 Llorenç del Penedès (Tarragona) / ES | |||
04 /
TESSON, Nicolas Rambla de Catalunya, 10 4rt 2ª E-08007 Barcelona / ES | Representative(s) | ZBM Patents - Zea, Barlocci & Markvardsen Rambla Catalunya, 123 08008 Barcelona / ES | [N/P] |
Former [2010/13] | ZBM Patents Zea, Barlocci & Markvardsen Plaza Catalunya, 1 08002 Barcelona / ES | Application number, filing date | 08787649.6 | 12.06.2008 | [2010/13] | WO2008ES70115 | Priority number, date | ES20070001718 | 15.06.2007 Original published format: ES 200701718 | Filing language | ES | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2008152177 | Date: | 18.12.2008 | Language: | ES | [2008/51] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2168967 | Date: | 31.03.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/13] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | ES | 18.12.2008 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.07.2011 | Classification | IPC: | C07D487/04, C07F5/02 | [2010/13] | CPC: |
C07F5/025 (EP);
C07D487/04 (EP,ES);
C07F5/02 (ES)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2010/13] | Title | German: | ZWISCHENPRODUKTE ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON PHOSPHODIESTERASE-5-HEMMERN | [2010/13] | English: | INTERMEDIATES FOR PREPARATION OF AN INHIBITOR OF PHOSPHODIESTERASE TYPE 5 | [2010/13] | French: | INTERMÉDIAIRES UTILISÉS DANS LA PRÉPARATION D'UN INHIBITEUR DE LA PHOSPHODIESTÉRASE DE TYPE 5 | [2010/13] | Entry into regional phase | 14.01.2010 | Translation filed | 15.01.2010 | National basic fee paid | 15.01.2010 | Search fee paid | 15.01.2010 | Designation fee(s) paid | 15.01.2010 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 15.01.2010 | Examination requested [2010/13] | 20.01.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 28.09.2012 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.02.2013 | Fee for grant paid | 08.02.2013 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 09.02.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2013/44] | 10.06.2013 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2013/44] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 28.09.2012 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.06.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.06.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 02.07.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.06.2013 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US6756373 (ALLERTON CHARLOTTE MOIRA NORFO [GB], et al) | International search | [A]WO0198284 (PFIZER LTD [GB], et al); | by applicant | EP0463756 | WO9428902 | EP0812845 | EP1077214 | US6204383 | WO0119827 | WO0198284 | WO0198303 | WO2006046135 |