EP2170520 - A METHOD OF USING A SEPARATOR AND A SEPARATOR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 13.04.2018 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 05.05.2017 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 01.01.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.05.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): PT | published on 01.07.2020 [2020/27] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Wärtsilä Finland Oy Tarhaajantie 2 65380 Vaasa / FI | [2010/14] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
PELTOKOSKI, Raine Rehtorinkuja 2 I 63 FI-65320 Vaasa / FI | [2010/14] | Representative(s) | Berggren Oy, Helsinki & Oulu P.O. Box 16 Eteläinen Rautatiekatu 10A 00101 Helsinki / FI | [2017/23] |
Former [2013/24] | Berggren Oy Ab P.O. Box 16 Antinkatu 3 C 00101 Helsinki / FI | ||
Former [2013/08] | Veräjänkorva, Janne, et al Berggren Oy Ab P.O. Box 16 00101 Helsinki / FI | ||
Former [2010/14] | Nissinen, Jyrki Antero, et al AWEK Industrial Patents Ltd Oy P.O. Box 230 00101 Helsinki / FI | Application number, filing date | 08787700.7 | 10.07.2008 | [2010/14] | WO2008FI50423 | Priority number, date | FI20070005541 | 13.07.2007 Original published format: FI 20075541 | [2010/14] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2009010630 | Date: | 22.01.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/04] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2170520 | Date: | 07.04.2010 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 22.01.2009 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2010/14] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2170520 | Date: | 07.06.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/23] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 22.01.2009 | Classification | IPC: | B04B1/14, B04B11/04, B04B13/00 | [2010/14] | CPC: |
B04B1/14 (EP);
B04B11/04 (EP,FI);
B04B1/08 (EP);
B04B13/00 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2017/23] |
Former [2010/14] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR VERWENDUNG EINES SEPARATORS UND SEPARATOR | [2010/14] | English: | A METHOD OF USING A SEPARATOR AND A SEPARATOR | [2010/14] | French: | PROCÉDÉ D'UTILISATION D'UN SÉPARATEUR ET SÉPARATEUR | [2010/14] | Entry into regional phase | 22.12.2009 | National basic fee paid | 22.12.2009 | Designation fee(s) paid | 22.12.2009 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 06.05.2009 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 22.12.2009 | Examination requested [2010/14] | 02.01.2017 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 25.04.2017 | Fee for grant paid | 25.04.2017 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 25.04.2017 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 02.01.2017 | Opposition(s) | 08.03.2018 | No opposition filed within time limit [2018/20] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.06.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.05.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 19.07.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 15.07.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 17.07.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 10.07.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 15.07.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 10.07.2008 | AT | 07.06.2017 | CY | 07.06.2017 | CZ | 07.06.2017 | DK | 07.06.2017 | EE | 07.06.2017 | ES | 07.06.2017 | FI | 07.06.2017 | HR | 07.06.2017 | LT | 07.06.2017 | LV | 07.06.2017 | MC | 07.06.2017 | PL | 07.06.2017 | PT | 07.06.2017 | RO | 07.06.2017 | SI | 07.06.2017 | SK | 07.06.2017 | TR | 07.06.2017 | IE | 10.07.2017 | LU | 10.07.2017 | MT | 10.07.2017 | BE | 31.07.2017 | CH | 31.07.2017 | LI | 31.07.2017 | BG | 07.09.2017 | GB | 07.09.2017 | NO | 07.09.2017 | GR | 08.09.2017 | IS | 07.10.2017 | [2020/27] |
Former [2020/15] | HU | 10.07.2008 | |
AT | 07.06.2017 | ||
CY | 07.06.2017 | ||
CZ | 07.06.2017 | ||
DK | 07.06.2017 | ||
EE | 07.06.2017 | ||
ES | 07.06.2017 | ||
FI | 07.06.2017 | ||
HR | 07.06.2017 | ||
LT | 07.06.2017 | ||
LV | 07.06.2017 | ||
MC | 07.06.2017 | ||
PL | 07.06.2017 | ||
RO | 07.06.2017 | ||
SI | 07.06.2017 | ||
SK | 07.06.2017 | ||
TR | 07.06.2017 | ||
IE | 10.07.2017 | ||
LU | 10.07.2017 | ||
MT | 10.07.2017 | ||
BE | 31.07.2017 | ||
CH | 31.07.2017 | ||
LI | 31.07.2017 | ||
BG | 07.09.2017 | ||
GB | 07.09.2017 | ||
NO | 07.09.2017 | ||
GR | 08.09.2017 | ||
IS | 07.10.2017 | ||
Former [2019/46] | HU | 10.07.2008 | |
AT | 07.06.2017 | ||
CY | 07.06.2017 | ||
CZ | 07.06.2017 | ||
DK | 07.06.2017 | ||
EE | 07.06.2017 | ||
ES | 07.06.2017 | ||
FI | 07.06.2017 | ||
HR | 07.06.2017 | ||
LT | 07.06.2017 | ||
LV | 07.06.2017 | ||
MC | 07.06.2017 | ||
PL | 07.06.2017 | ||
RO | 07.06.2017 | ||
SI | 07.06.2017 | ||
SK | 07.06.2017 | ||
IE | 10.07.2017 | ||
LU | 10.07.2017 | ||
MT | 10.07.2017 | ||
BE | 31.07.2017 | ||
CH | 31.07.2017 | ||
LI | 31.07.2017 | ||
BG | 07.09.2017 | ||
GB | 07.09.2017 | ||
NO | 07.09.2017 | ||
GR | 08.09.2017 | ||
IS | 07.10.2017 | ||
Former [2019/31] | HU | 10.07.2008 | |
AT | 07.06.2017 | ||
CZ | 07.06.2017 | ||
DK | 07.06.2017 | ||
EE | 07.06.2017 | ||
ES | 07.06.2017 | ||
FI | 07.06.2017 | ||
HR | 07.06.2017 | ||
LT | 07.06.2017 | ||
LV | 07.06.2017 | ||
MC | 07.06.2017 | ||
PL | 07.06.2017 | ||
RO | 07.06.2017 | ||
SI | 07.06.2017 | ||
SK | 07.06.2017 | ||
IE | 10.07.2017 | ||
LU | 10.07.2017 | ||
MT | 10.07.2017 | ||
BE | 31.07.2017 | ||
CH | 31.07.2017 | ||
LI | 31.07.2017 | ||
BG | 07.09.2017 | ||
GB | 07.09.2017 | ||
NO | 07.09.2017 | ||
GR | 08.09.2017 | ||
IS | 07.10.2017 | ||
Former [2018/43] | AT | 07.06.2017 | |
CZ | 07.06.2017 | ||
DK | 07.06.2017 | ||
EE | 07.06.2017 | ||
ES | 07.06.2017 | ||
FI | 07.06.2017 | ||
HR | 07.06.2017 | ||
LT | 07.06.2017 | ||
LV | 07.06.2017 | ||
MC | 07.06.2017 | ||
PL | 07.06.2017 | ||
RO | 07.06.2017 | ||
SI | 07.06.2017 | ||
SK | 07.06.2017 | ||
IE | 10.07.2017 | ||
LU | 10.07.2017 | ||
MT | 10.07.2017 | ||
BE | 31.07.2017 | ||
CH | 31.07.2017 | ||
LI | 31.07.2017 | ||
BG | 07.09.2017 | ||
GB | 07.09.2017 | ||
NO | 07.09.2017 | ||
GR | 08.09.2017 | ||
IS | 07.10.2017 | ||
Former [2018/37] | AT | 07.06.2017 | |
CZ | 07.06.2017 | ||
DK | 07.06.2017 | ||
EE | 07.06.2017 | ||
ES | 07.06.2017 | ||
FI | 07.06.2017 | ||
HR | 07.06.2017 | ||
LT | 07.06.2017 | ||
LV | 07.06.2017 | ||
MC | 07.06.2017 | ||
PL | 07.06.2017 | ||
RO | 07.06.2017 | ||
SI | 07.06.2017 | ||
SK | 07.06.2017 | ||
IE | 10.07.2017 | ||
LU | 10.07.2017 | ||
BE | 31.07.2017 | ||
CH | 31.07.2017 | ||
LI | 31.07.2017 | ||
BG | 07.09.2017 | ||
GB | 07.09.2017 | ||
NO | 07.09.2017 | ||
GR | 08.09.2017 | ||
IS | 07.10.2017 | ||
Former [2018/34] | AT | 07.06.2017 | |
CZ | 07.06.2017 | ||
DK | 07.06.2017 | ||
EE | 07.06.2017 | ||
ES | 07.06.2017 | ||
FI | 07.06.2017 | ||
HR | 07.06.2017 | ||
LT | 07.06.2017 | ||
LV | 07.06.2017 | ||
MC | 07.06.2017 | ||
PL | 07.06.2017 | ||
RO | 07.06.2017 | ||
SI | 07.06.2017 | ||
SK | 07.06.2017 | ||
IE | 10.07.2017 | ||
LU | 10.07.2017 | ||
CH | 31.07.2017 | ||
LI | 31.07.2017 | ||
BG | 07.09.2017 | ||
NO | 07.09.2017 | ||
GR | 08.09.2017 | ||
IS | 07.10.2017 | ||
Former [2018/23] | AT | 07.06.2017 | |
CZ | 07.06.2017 | ||
DK | 07.06.2017 | ||
EE | 07.06.2017 | ||
ES | 07.06.2017 | ||
FI | 07.06.2017 | ||
HR | 07.06.2017 | ||
LT | 07.06.2017 | ||
LV | 07.06.2017 | ||
MC | 07.06.2017 | ||
PL | 07.06.2017 | ||
RO | 07.06.2017 | ||
SI | 07.06.2017 | ||
SK | 07.06.2017 | ||
IE | 10.07.2017 | ||
CH | 31.07.2017 | ||
LI | 31.07.2017 | ||
BG | 07.09.2017 | ||
NO | 07.09.2017 | ||
GR | 08.09.2017 | ||
IS | 07.10.2017 | ||
Former [2018/21] | AT | 07.06.2017 | |
CZ | 07.06.2017 | ||
DK | 07.06.2017 | ||
EE | 07.06.2017 | ||
ES | 07.06.2017 | ||
FI | 07.06.2017 | ||
HR | 07.06.2017 | ||
LT | 07.06.2017 | ||
LV | 07.06.2017 | ||
MC | 07.06.2017 | ||
PL | 07.06.2017 | ||
RO | 07.06.2017 | ||
SK | 07.06.2017 | ||
CH | 31.07.2017 | ||
LI | 31.07.2017 | ||
BG | 07.09.2017 | ||
NO | 07.09.2017 | ||
GR | 08.09.2017 | ||
IS | 07.10.2017 | ||
Former [2018/18] | AT | 07.06.2017 | |
CZ | 07.06.2017 | ||
EE | 07.06.2017 | ||
ES | 07.06.2017 | ||
FI | 07.06.2017 | ||
HR | 07.06.2017 | ||
LT | 07.06.2017 | ||
LV | 07.06.2017 | ||
MC | 07.06.2017 | ||
PL | 07.06.2017 | ||
RO | 07.06.2017 | ||
SK | 07.06.2017 | ||
BG | 07.09.2017 | ||
NO | 07.09.2017 | ||
GR | 08.09.2017 | ||
IS | 07.10.2017 | ||
Former [2018/11] | AT | 07.06.2017 | |
CZ | 07.06.2017 | ||
EE | 07.06.2017 | ||
ES | 07.06.2017 | ||
FI | 07.06.2017 | ||
HR | 07.06.2017 | ||
LT | 07.06.2017 | ||
LV | 07.06.2017 | ||
PL | 07.06.2017 | ||
RO | 07.06.2017 | ||
SK | 07.06.2017 | ||
BG | 07.09.2017 | ||
NO | 07.09.2017 | ||
GR | 08.09.2017 | ||
IS | 07.10.2017 | ||
Former [2018/10] | AT | 07.06.2017 | |
CZ | 07.06.2017 | ||
EE | 07.06.2017 | ||
ES | 07.06.2017 | ||
FI | 07.06.2017 | ||
HR | 07.06.2017 | ||
LT | 07.06.2017 | ||
LV | 07.06.2017 | ||
RO | 07.06.2017 | ||
SK | 07.06.2017 | ||
BG | 07.09.2017 | ||
NO | 07.09.2017 | ||
GR | 08.09.2017 | ||
Former [2018/09] | EE | 07.06.2017 | |
ES | 07.06.2017 | ||
FI | 07.06.2017 | ||
HR | 07.06.2017 | ||
LT | 07.06.2017 | ||
LV | 07.06.2017 | ||
BG | 07.09.2017 | ||
NO | 07.09.2017 | ||
GR | 08.09.2017 | ||
Former [2017/50] | ES | 07.06.2017 | |
FI | 07.06.2017 | ||
HR | 07.06.2017 | ||
LT | 07.06.2017 | ||
LV | 07.06.2017 | ||
BG | 07.09.2017 | ||
NO | 07.09.2017 | ||
GR | 08.09.2017 | ||
Former [2017/49] | ES | 07.06.2017 | |
FI | 07.06.2017 | ||
HR | 07.06.2017 | ||
LT | 07.06.2017 | ||
NO | 07.09.2017 | ||
GR | 08.09.2017 | Cited in | International search | [XI]WO8601436 (ALFA LAVAL ZETA AS [DK]) [X] 1-3 * page 5, lines 3-13; figures 1,2 * [I] 4; | [A]JPH07246349 (MITSUBISHI KAKOKI KK) [A] 1-4 * abstract *; | [A]WO9603214 (TETRA LAVAL HOLDINGS & FINANCE [CH], et al) [A] 1,4 |