EP2188445 - METHOD FOR COMPENSATING FOR FAULTS IN A PAPER WEB [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 24.01.2014 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.01.2014 | Withdrawal of application | published on 26.02.2014 [2014/09] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Runtech Systems Oy Kastarintie 25 35990 Kolho / FI | [2010/21] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LOIPPO, Kimmo Tervasaarentie 6 FI-35990 Kolho / FI | 02 /
ODELL, Michael P.O.Box 512 P-2910-100 Setubal / PT | [2010/21] | Representative(s) | Langenskiöld, Tord Karl Walter, et al Oy Jalo Ant-Wuorinen Ab Iso-Roobertinkatu 4-6 00120 Helsinki / FI | [N/P] |
Former [2013/11] | Langenskiöld, Tord Karl Walter, et al Oy Jalo Ant-Wuorinen Ab Iso-Roobertinkatu 4-6 00120 Helsinki / FI | ||
Former [2010/21] | Laitinen, Pauli Sakari Patentti-Laitinen Oy, P.O. Box 29 02771 Espoo / FI | Application number, filing date | 08787740.3 | 18.08.2008 | [2010/21] | WO2008FI50467 | Priority number, date | FI20070000626 | 20.08.2007 Original published format: FI 20070626 | [2010/21] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2009024649 | Date: | 26.02.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/09] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2188445 | Date: | 26.05.2010 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 26.02.2009 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2010/21] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | SE | 26.02.2009 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.12.2013 | Classification | IPC: | D21F2/00, D21F1/02, D21F1/04, D21F1/06, D21G9/00 | [2010/21] | CPC: |
D21G9/0063 (EP,US);
D21F2/00 (FI);
D21F3/00 (FI);
D21F5/00 (FI)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2010/21] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR KOMPENSIERUNG VON FEHLERN IN EINER PAPIERBAHN | [2010/21] | English: | METHOD FOR COMPENSATING FOR FAULTS IN A PAPER WEB | [2010/21] | French: | PROCÉDÉ POUR COMPENSER DES DÉFAUTS DANS UNE BANDE DE PAPIER | [2010/21] | Entry into regional phase | 03.03.2010 | National basic fee paid | 03.03.2010 | Search fee paid | 03.03.2010 | Designation fee(s) paid | 03.03.2010 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 03.03.2010 | Examination requested [2010/21] | 16.01.2014 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2014/09] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.10.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 07.10.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.08.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.08.2010 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   12.10.2010 | 31.08.2011 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   07.10.2011 | 31.08.2013 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]GB1457667 (BELOIT CORP) [Y] 2* page 3, line 96 - line 115; figures 2-5 *; | [XY]WO0112898 (RUNTECH SYSTEMS OY [FI], et al) [X] 1,4,5 * page 5, line 17 - line 37 * * page 6, line 13 - line 24 * * page 7, line 7 - page 8, line 20; figures 1,3 * [Y] 2 | International search | [Y]GB1457667 (BELOIT CORP) [Y] 2 * , page 1, column 1, line 32 - line 44; page 3, column 2, line 95 - line 105, figure 2, abstract *; | [A]US5720852 (VIRTA RAIMO [FI], et al) [A] 1-5* , whole document *; | [A]WO9827275 (VALMET CORP [FI], et al) [A] 1-5 * , whole document *; | [A]DE19841639 (VOITH SULZER PAPIERTECH PATENT [DE]) [A] 1-5 * , whole document *; | [XY]WO0112898 (RUNTECH SYSTEMS OY [FI], et al) [X] 1, 4-5 * , page 5, line 17 - line 25; page 6, line 13 - line 24; page 7, line 7 - line 10, page 7, line 33 - page 8, line 20, figure 1, abstract * [Y] 2 |