EP2188604 - SPECTROMETER FOR MEASURING MOVING SAMPLE MATERIAL AND THE METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 12.04.2019 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 04.05.2018 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 19.12.2017 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 25.11.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.06.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU, PT | published on 08.07.2020 [2020/28] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Honeywell International Inc. 115 Tabor Road Morris Plains NJ 07950 / US | For all designated states Honeywell Oy Viestikatu 1-3 70600 Kuopio / FI | [2018/51] |
Former [2018/23] | For all designated states Valtion Teknillinen Tutkimuskeskus Vuorimiehentie 3 02150 Espoo / FI | ||
For all designated states Honeywell Oy Viestikatu 1-3 70600 Kuopio / FI | |||
Former [2010/21] | For all designated states Valtion Teknillinen Tutkimuskeskus Vuorimiehentie 3 02150 Espoo / FI | ||
For all designated states Honeywell Oy Viestikatu 1-3 70600 Kuopio / FI | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MALINEN, Jouko Kaitoväylä 1 FI-90570 Oulu / FI | 02 /
KATAJA, Kari Kaitoväylä 1 FI-90570 Oulu / FI | 03 /
KIVI, Sini Microkatu 1 FI-70200 Kuopio / FI | 04 /
VASAMA, Hannu Kaitoväylä 1 FI-90570 Oulu / FI | 05 /
KUUSELA, Reijo Viestikatu 1-3 FI-70600 Kuopio / FI | [2018/23] |
Former [2010/21] | 01 /
MALINEN, Jouko Kaitoväylä 1 FI-90570 Oulu / FI | ||
02 /
KATAJA, Kari Kaitovaäylä 1 FI-90570 Oulu / FI | |||
03 /
KIVI, Sini Microkatu 1 FI-70200 Kuopio / FI | |||
04 /
VASAMA, Hannu Kaitoväylä 1 FI-90570 Oulu / FI | |||
05 /
KUUSELA, Reijo Viestikatu FI-70200 Kuopio / FI | Representative(s) | Berggren Oy, Helsinki & Oulu Isokatu 32 90100 Oulu / FI | [2018/23] |
Former [2014/08] | Vanhala, Jorma Kalevi, et al Berggren Oy Ab Sepänkatu 20 90100 Oulu / FI | ||
Former [2010/21] | Vanhala, Jorma Kalevi Berggren Oy Ab Kirkkokatu 9 90100 Oulu / FI | Application number, filing date | 08787757.7 | 03.09.2008 | [2010/21] | WO2008FI50484 | Priority number, date | FI20070005622 | 07.09.2007 Original published format: FI 20075622 | [2010/21] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2009030812 | Date: | 12.03.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/11] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2188604 | Date: | 26.05.2010 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 12.03.2009 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2010/21] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2188604 | Date: | 06.06.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/23] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | FI | 12.03.2009 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.03.2015 | Classification | IPC: | G01J3/26, G01J3/28, G01N21/85, G01N21/86, G01J3/02 | [2015/18] | CPC: |
G01J3/26 (EP,US);
G01J3/02 (EP,US);
G01J3/0218 (EP,US);
G01J3/0232 (EP,US);
G01J3/0286 (EP,US);
G01J3/2803 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2010/21] | G01J3/26, G01J3/28, G01N21/85, G01N21/86 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2018/23] |
Former [2010/21] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | SPEKTROMETER ZUR MESSUNG VON SICH BEWEGENDEM STICHPROBENMATERIAL UND VERFAHREN | [2010/21] | English: | SPECTROMETER FOR MEASURING MOVING SAMPLE MATERIAL AND THE METHOD | [2010/21] | French: | SPECTROMÈTRE POUR MESURER LA MATIÈRE D'UN ÉCHANTILLON EN MOUVEMENT ET PROCÉDÉ CORRESPONDANT | [2010/21] | Entry into regional phase | 26.03.2010 | National basic fee paid | 26.03.2010 | Search fee paid | 26.03.2010 | Designation fee(s) paid | 26.03.2010 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 26.03.2010 | Examination requested [2010/21] | 09.09.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 04.01.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 26.04.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.08.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 25.11.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.11.2017 | Date of oral proceedings | 15.12.2017 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 20.12.2017 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.04.2018 | Fee for grant paid | 27.04.2018 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 27.04.2018 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 04.01.2016 | Opposition(s) | 07.03.2019 | No opposition filed within time limit [2019/20] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.09.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 08.08.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 09.09.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 08.09.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 08.09.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 22.09.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 26.09.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 03.09.2008 | AT | 06.06.2018 | CY | 06.06.2018 | CZ | 06.06.2018 | DK | 06.06.2018 | EE | 06.06.2018 | ES | 06.06.2018 | HR | 06.06.2018 | IT | 06.06.2018 | LT | 06.06.2018 | LV | 06.06.2018 | MC | 06.06.2018 | PL | 06.06.2018 | PT | 06.06.2018 | RO | 06.06.2018 | SE | 06.06.2018 | SI | 06.06.2018 | SK | 06.06.2018 | TR | 06.06.2018 | IE | 03.09.2018 | LU | 03.09.2018 | MT | 03.09.2018 | BG | 06.09.2018 | GB | 06.09.2018 | NO | 06.09.2018 | GR | 07.09.2018 | BE | 30.09.2018 | CH | 30.09.2018 | FR | 30.09.2018 | LI | 30.09.2018 | NL | 01.10.2018 | IS | 06.10.2018 | [2020/27] |
Former [2020/16] | AT | 06.06.2018 | |
CY | 06.06.2018 | ||
CZ | 06.06.2018 | ||
DK | 06.06.2018 | ||
EE | 06.06.2018 | ||
ES | 06.06.2018 | ||
HR | 06.06.2018 | ||
IT | 06.06.2018 | ||
LT | 06.06.2018 | ||
LV | 06.06.2018 | ||
MC | 06.06.2018 | ||
PL | 06.06.2018 | ||
RO | 06.06.2018 | ||
SE | 06.06.2018 | ||
SI | 06.06.2018 | ||
SK | 06.06.2018 | ||
TR | 06.06.2018 | ||
IE | 03.09.2018 | ||
LU | 03.09.2018 | ||
MT | 03.09.2018 | ||
BG | 06.09.2018 | ||
GB | 06.09.2018 | ||
NO | 06.09.2018 | ||
GR | 07.09.2018 | ||
BE | 30.09.2018 | ||
CH | 30.09.2018 | ||
FR | 30.09.2018 | ||
LI | 30.09.2018 | ||
NL | 01.10.2018 | ||
IS | 06.10.2018 | ||
Former [2020/08] | AT | 06.06.2018 | |
CY | 06.06.2018 | ||
CZ | 06.06.2018 | ||
DK | 06.06.2018 | ||
EE | 06.06.2018 | ||
ES | 06.06.2018 | ||
HR | 06.06.2018 | ||
IT | 06.06.2018 | ||
LT | 06.06.2018 | ||
LV | 06.06.2018 | ||
MC | 06.06.2018 | ||
PL | 06.06.2018 | ||
RO | 06.06.2018 | ||
SE | 06.06.2018 | ||
SI | 06.06.2018 | ||
SK | 06.06.2018 | ||
IE | 03.09.2018 | ||
LU | 03.09.2018 | ||
MT | 03.09.2018 | ||
BG | 06.09.2018 | ||
GB | 06.09.2018 | ||
NO | 06.09.2018 | ||
GR | 07.09.2018 | ||
BE | 30.09.2018 | ||
CH | 30.09.2018 | ||
FR | 30.09.2018 | ||
LI | 30.09.2018 | ||
NL | 01.10.2018 | ||
IS | 06.10.2018 | ||
Former [2019/47] | AT | 06.06.2018 | |
CY | 06.06.2018 | ||
CZ | 06.06.2018 | ||
DK | 06.06.2018 | ||
EE | 06.06.2018 | ||
ES | 06.06.2018 | ||
HR | 06.06.2018 | ||
IT | 06.06.2018 | ||
LT | 06.06.2018 | ||
LV | 06.06.2018 | ||
MC | 06.06.2018 | ||
PL | 06.06.2018 | ||
RO | 06.06.2018 | ||
SE | 06.06.2018 | ||
SI | 06.06.2018 | ||
SK | 06.06.2018 | ||
IE | 03.09.2018 | ||
LU | 03.09.2018 | ||
BG | 06.09.2018 | ||
GB | 06.09.2018 | ||
NO | 06.09.2018 | ||
GR | 07.09.2018 | ||
BE | 30.09.2018 | ||
CH | 30.09.2018 | ||
FR | 30.09.2018 | ||
LI | 30.09.2018 | ||
NL | 01.10.2018 | ||
IS | 06.10.2018 | ||
Former [2019/40] | AT | 06.06.2018 | |
CY | 06.06.2018 | ||
CZ | 06.06.2018 | ||
DK | 06.06.2018 | ||
EE | 06.06.2018 | ||
ES | 06.06.2018 | ||
HR | 06.06.2018 | ||
IT | 06.06.2018 | ||
LT | 06.06.2018 | ||
LV | 06.06.2018 | ||
MC | 06.06.2018 | ||
PL | 06.06.2018 | ||
RO | 06.06.2018 | ||
SE | 06.06.2018 | ||
SI | 06.06.2018 | ||
SK | 06.06.2018 | ||
IE | 03.09.2018 | ||
LU | 03.09.2018 | ||
BG | 06.09.2018 | ||
NO | 06.09.2018 | ||
GR | 07.09.2018 | ||
BE | 30.09.2018 | ||
CH | 30.09.2018 | ||
FR | 30.09.2018 | ||
LI | 30.09.2018 | ||
NL | 01.10.2018 | ||
IS | 06.10.2018 | ||
Former [2019/38] | AT | 06.06.2018 | |
CY | 06.06.2018 | ||
CZ | 06.06.2018 | ||
DK | 06.06.2018 | ||
EE | 06.06.2018 | ||
ES | 06.06.2018 | ||
HR | 06.06.2018 | ||
IT | 06.06.2018 | ||
LT | 06.06.2018 | ||
LV | 06.06.2018 | ||
MC | 06.06.2018 | ||
PL | 06.06.2018 | ||
RO | 06.06.2018 | ||
SE | 06.06.2018 | ||
SI | 06.06.2018 | ||
SK | 06.06.2018 | ||
IE | 03.09.2018 | ||
LU | 03.09.2018 | ||
BG | 06.09.2018 | ||
NO | 06.09.2018 | ||
GR | 07.09.2018 | ||
BE | 30.09.2018 | ||
FR | 30.09.2018 | ||
NL | 01.10.2018 | ||
IS | 06.10.2018 | ||
Former [2019/33] | AT | 06.06.2018 | |
CY | 06.06.2018 | ||
CZ | 06.06.2018 | ||
DK | 06.06.2018 | ||
EE | 06.06.2018 | ||
ES | 06.06.2018 | ||
HR | 06.06.2018 | ||
IT | 06.06.2018 | ||
LT | 06.06.2018 | ||
LV | 06.06.2018 | ||
MC | 06.06.2018 | ||
PL | 06.06.2018 | ||
RO | 06.06.2018 | ||
SE | 06.06.2018 | ||
SI | 06.06.2018 | ||
SK | 06.06.2018 | ||
IE | 03.09.2018 | ||
LU | 03.09.2018 | ||
BG | 06.09.2018 | ||
NO | 06.09.2018 | ||
GR | 07.09.2018 | ||
NL | 01.10.2018 | ||
IS | 06.10.2018 | ||
Former [2019/30] | AT | 06.06.2018 | |
CY | 06.06.2018 | ||
CZ | 06.06.2018 | ||
DK | 06.06.2018 | ||
EE | 06.06.2018 | ||
ES | 06.06.2018 | ||
HR | 06.06.2018 | ||
IT | 06.06.2018 | ||
LT | 06.06.2018 | ||
LV | 06.06.2018 | ||
MC | 06.06.2018 | ||
PL | 06.06.2018 | ||
RO | 06.06.2018 | ||
SE | 06.06.2018 | ||
SI | 06.06.2018 | ||
SK | 06.06.2018 | ||
LU | 03.09.2018 | ||
BG | 06.09.2018 | ||
NO | 06.09.2018 | ||
GR | 07.09.2018 | ||
NL | 01.10.2018 | ||
IS | 06.10.2018 | ||
Former [2019/26] | AT | 06.06.2018 | |
CY | 06.06.2018 | ||
CZ | 06.06.2018 | ||
DK | 06.06.2018 | ||
EE | 06.06.2018 | ||
ES | 06.06.2018 | ||
HR | 06.06.2018 | ||
IT | 06.06.2018 | ||
LT | 06.06.2018 | ||
LV | 06.06.2018 | ||
MC | 06.06.2018 | ||
PL | 06.06.2018 | ||
RO | 06.06.2018 | ||
SE | 06.06.2018 | ||
SI | 06.06.2018 | ||
SK | 06.06.2018 | ||
BG | 06.09.2018 | ||
NO | 06.09.2018 | ||
GR | 07.09.2018 | ||
IS | 06.10.2018 | ||
Former [2019/24] | AT | 06.06.2018 | |
CY | 06.06.2018 | ||
CZ | 06.06.2018 | ||
EE | 06.06.2018 | ||
ES | 06.06.2018 | ||
HR | 06.06.2018 | ||
IT | 06.06.2018 | ||
LT | 06.06.2018 | ||
LV | 06.06.2018 | ||
MC | 06.06.2018 | ||
PL | 06.06.2018 | ||
RO | 06.06.2018 | ||
SE | 06.06.2018 | ||
SK | 06.06.2018 | ||
BG | 06.09.2018 | ||
NO | 06.09.2018 | ||
GR | 07.09.2018 | ||
IS | 06.10.2018 | ||
Former [2019/11] | AT | 06.06.2018 | |
CY | 06.06.2018 | ||
CZ | 06.06.2018 | ||
EE | 06.06.2018 | ||
ES | 06.06.2018 | ||
HR | 06.06.2018 | ||
IT | 06.06.2018 | ||
LT | 06.06.2018 | ||
LV | 06.06.2018 | ||
PL | 06.06.2018 | ||
RO | 06.06.2018 | ||
SE | 06.06.2018 | ||
SK | 06.06.2018 | ||
BG | 06.09.2018 | ||
NO | 06.09.2018 | ||
GR | 07.09.2018 | ||
IS | 06.10.2018 | ||
Former [2019/10] | AT | 06.06.2018 | |
CY | 06.06.2018 | ||
CZ | 06.06.2018 | ||
EE | 06.06.2018 | ||
ES | 06.06.2018 | ||
HR | 06.06.2018 | ||
LT | 06.06.2018 | ||
LV | 06.06.2018 | ||
PL | 06.06.2018 | ||
RO | 06.06.2018 | ||
SE | 06.06.2018 | ||
SK | 06.06.2018 | ||
BG | 06.09.2018 | ||
NO | 06.09.2018 | ||
GR | 07.09.2018 | ||
IS | 06.10.2018 | ||
Former [2019/09] | CY | 06.06.2018 | |
EE | 06.06.2018 | ||
ES | 06.06.2018 | ||
HR | 06.06.2018 | ||
LT | 06.06.2018 | ||
LV | 06.06.2018 | ||
SE | 06.06.2018 | ||
BG | 06.09.2018 | ||
NO | 06.09.2018 | ||
GR | 07.09.2018 | ||
IS | 06.10.2018 | ||
Former [2019/08] | CY | 06.06.2018 | |
ES | 06.06.2018 | ||
HR | 06.06.2018 | ||
LT | 06.06.2018 | ||
LV | 06.06.2018 | ||
SE | 06.06.2018 | ||
BG | 06.09.2018 | ||
NO | 06.09.2018 | ||
GR | 07.09.2018 | ||
IS | 06.10.2018 | ||
Former [2018/52] | CY | 06.06.2018 | |
ES | 06.06.2018 | ||
HR | 06.06.2018 | ||
LT | 06.06.2018 | ||
LV | 06.06.2018 | ||
SE | 06.06.2018 | ||
BG | 06.09.2018 | ||
NO | 06.09.2018 | ||
GR | 07.09.2018 | ||
Former [2018/51] | CY | 06.06.2018 | |
ES | 06.06.2018 | ||
HR | 06.06.2018 | ||
LT | 06.06.2018 | ||
LV | 06.06.2018 | ||
SE | 06.06.2018 | ||
BG | 06.09.2018 | ||
NO | 06.09.2018 | ||
Former [2018/50] | CY | 06.06.2018 | |
ES | 06.06.2018 | ||
HR | 06.06.2018 | ||
LT | 06.06.2018 | ||
SE | 06.06.2018 | ||
BG | 06.09.2018 | ||
NO | 06.09.2018 | ||
Former [2018/49] | CY | 06.06.2018 | |
ES | 06.06.2018 | ||
LT | 06.06.2018 | ||
SE | 06.06.2018 | ||
BG | 06.09.2018 | ||
NO | 06.09.2018 | ||
Former [2018/47] | ES | 06.06.2018 | |
LT | 06.06.2018 | ||
NO | 06.09.2018 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US3110816 (KAISLER FRANCIS J, et al) [Y] 6,7,10,17 * figure 3 *; | [Y]US5059013 (JAIN KANTILAL [US]) [Y] 6* column 4, line 41 - line 44; figure 1B *; | [XYI]WO9940419 (DSQUARED DEV INC [US]) [X] 1,4,13,15 * figures 1,3 * * abstract * * page 6, line 7 - line 8 * * page 7, line 5 * * page 12, line 9 - line 25 * * page 13, line 6 - line 11 * [Y] 6,7,9,10,12,17,19 [I] 2,3,5,8,11,14,16,18; | [Y]DE19929882 (HOFMANN HUBERT [DE], et al) [Y] 12,19 * column 2, line 20 - line 30 *; | [Y]US6313917 (TANG HONG [US], et al) [Y] 9 * column 5, line 42 - line 45; figure 6 * | International search | [X]WO9940419 (DSQUARED DEV INC [US]) [X] 1-2, 4, 11-15, 18-19 * , p. 3, line 12 - p. 4, line 22; p. 8, lines 19-31; p. 10, lines 25-31; p. 12, lines 12-22; p. 13, lines 3-11; p. 14, lines 17-21 *; | [A]US6313917 (TANG HONG [US], et al) [A] 1-19* , whole document *; | [A]US2001055116 (MACZURA ANTHONY K [US], et al) [A] 1-19 * , whole document *; | [X]US2002191175 (COOMBS PAUL G [US], et al) [X] 1-2, 4, 6-7, 9-15, 17-19 * , paragraphs [0053]-[0054], [0060], [0095]-[0097], Fig. 9 *; | [A]WO2007007165 (DE BEERS CONS MINES LTD [ZA], et al) [A] 1-19 * , whole document * | by applicant | WO9940419 | US6313917 | US6420708 | US6505775 | WO2004013621 | EP1498708 |