EP2167573 - UV BARRIER FILM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 11.11.2016 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.09.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 16.10.2024 [2024/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Innovia Films Limited Station Road Wigton, Cumbria CA7 9BG / GB | [2016/01] |
Former [2010/13] | For all designated states Innovia Films Limited Station Road Wigton Cumbria CA7 9BG / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DENECKER, Celine c/o Innovia Films Limited Station Road Wigton Cumbria CA7 9BG / GB | [2016/01] |
Former [2010/13] | 01 /
DENECKER, Celine c/o Innovia Films Limited Station Road Wigton Cumbria CA7 9BG / GB | Representative(s) | Brand, Thomas Louis TL Brand & Co 50 Eastcastle Street London W1W 8EA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2016/01] | Brand, Thomas Louis TL Brand & Co 17 Hanover Square London W1S 1BN / GB | ||
Former [2010/13] | Brand, Thomas Louis W.P. Thompson & Co. 55 Drury Lane London WC2B 5SQ / GB | Application number, filing date | 08788574.5 | 18.07.2008 | [2010/13] | WO2008GB50596 | Priority number, date | GB20070014418 | 24.07.2007 Original published format: GB 0714418 | [2016/01] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2009013529 | Date: | 29.01.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/05] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2167573 | Date: | 31.03.2010 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 29.01.2009 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2010/13] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2167573 | Date: | 06.01.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/01] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 02.04.2009 | Classification | IPC: | C08K5/00 | [2010/13] | CPC: |
C08J5/18 (EP,KR,US);
C08K3/22 (KR,US);
C08K3/014 (EP,US);
C08K5/00 (KR);
C08K5/005 (EP,US);
C08L23/10 (KR);
| C-Set: |
C08K3/014, C08L23/10 (EP,US);
C08K5/005, C08L23/10 (US,EP) | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2016/01] |
Former [2010/13] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | UV-SPERRSCHICHTFOLIE | [2010/13] | English: | UV BARRIER FILM | [2010/13] | French: | FILM DE PROTECTION CONTRE LES UV | [2010/13] | Entry into regional phase | 16.12.2009 | National basic fee paid | 16.12.2009 | Designation fee(s) paid | 16.12.2009 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 16.12.2009 | Examination requested [2010/13] | 10.11.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 09.03.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.09.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.11.2015 | Fee for grant paid | 03.11.2015 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 03.11.2015 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 10.11.2010 | Opposition(s) | 07.10.2016 | No opposition filed within time limit [2016/50] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.07.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.07.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.07.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 10.07.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 14.07.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 29.06.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 18.07.2008 | AT | 06.01.2016 | CY | 06.01.2016 | CZ | 06.01.2016 | DK | 06.01.2016 | EE | 06.01.2016 | FI | 06.01.2016 | HR | 06.01.2016 | LT | 06.01.2016 | LV | 06.01.2016 | MC | 06.01.2016 | RO | 06.01.2016 | SE | 06.01.2016 | SI | 06.01.2016 | SK | 06.01.2016 | BG | 06.04.2016 | NO | 06.04.2016 | GR | 07.04.2016 | IS | 06.05.2016 | PT | 06.05.2016 | IE | 18.07.2016 | LU | 18.07.2016 | PL | 18.07.2016 | TR | 18.07.2016 | BE | 31.07.2016 | CH | 31.07.2016 | LI | 31.07.2016 | MT | 31.07.2016 | [2024/42] |
Former [2018/34] | HU | 18.07.2008 | |
AT | 06.01.2016 | ||
CY | 06.01.2016 | ||
CZ | 06.01.2016 | ||
DK | 06.01.2016 | ||
EE | 06.01.2016 | ||
FI | 06.01.2016 | ||
HR | 06.01.2016 | ||
LT | 06.01.2016 | ||
LV | 06.01.2016 | ||
MC | 06.01.2016 | ||
RO | 06.01.2016 | ||
SE | 06.01.2016 | ||
SI | 06.01.2016 | ||
SK | 06.01.2016 | ||
BG | 06.04.2016 | ||
NO | 06.04.2016 | ||
GR | 07.04.2016 | ||
IS | 06.05.2016 | ||
PT | 06.05.2016 | ||
IE | 18.07.2016 | ||
LU | 18.07.2016 | ||
PL | 18.07.2016 | ||
BE | 31.07.2016 | ||
CH | 31.07.2016 | ||
LI | 31.07.2016 | ||
MT | 31.07.2016 | ||
Former [2018/28] | HU | 18.07.2008 | |
AT | 06.01.2016 | ||
CY | 06.01.2016 | ||
CZ | 06.01.2016 | ||
DK | 06.01.2016 | ||
EE | 06.01.2016 | ||
FI | 06.01.2016 | ||
HR | 06.01.2016 | ||
LT | 06.01.2016 | ||
LV | 06.01.2016 | ||
MC | 06.01.2016 | ||
RO | 06.01.2016 | ||
SE | 06.01.2016 | ||
SI | 06.01.2016 | ||
SK | 06.01.2016 | ||
BG | 06.04.2016 | ||
NO | 06.04.2016 | ||
GR | 07.04.2016 | ||
IS | 06.05.2016 | ||
PT | 06.05.2016 | ||
IE | 18.07.2016 | ||
LU | 18.07.2016 | ||
PL | 18.07.2016 | ||
BE | 31.07.2016 | ||
CH | 31.07.2016 | ||
LI | 31.07.2016 | ||
Former [2018/12] | AT | 06.01.2016 | |
CZ | 06.01.2016 | ||
DK | 06.01.2016 | ||
EE | 06.01.2016 | ||
FI | 06.01.2016 | ||
HR | 06.01.2016 | ||
LT | 06.01.2016 | ||
LV | 06.01.2016 | ||
MC | 06.01.2016 | ||
RO | 06.01.2016 | ||
SE | 06.01.2016 | ||
SI | 06.01.2016 | ||
SK | 06.01.2016 | ||
BG | 06.04.2016 | ||
NO | 06.04.2016 | ||
GR | 07.04.2016 | ||
IS | 06.05.2016 | ||
PT | 06.05.2016 | ||
IE | 18.07.2016 | ||
LU | 18.07.2016 | ||
PL | 18.07.2016 | ||
BE | 31.07.2016 | ||
CH | 31.07.2016 | ||
LI | 31.07.2016 | ||
Former [2017/41] | AT | 06.01.2016 | |
CZ | 06.01.2016 | ||
DK | 06.01.2016 | ||
EE | 06.01.2016 | ||
FI | 06.01.2016 | ||
HR | 06.01.2016 | ||
LT | 06.01.2016 | ||
LV | 06.01.2016 | ||
MC | 06.01.2016 | ||
RO | 06.01.2016 | ||
SE | 06.01.2016 | ||
SI | 06.01.2016 | ||
SK | 06.01.2016 | ||
BG | 06.04.2016 | ||
NO | 06.04.2016 | ||
GR | 07.04.2016 | ||
IS | 06.05.2016 | ||
PT | 06.05.2016 | ||
IE | 18.07.2016 | ||
LU | 18.07.2016 | ||
BE | 31.07.2016 | ||
CH | 31.07.2016 | ||
LI | 31.07.2016 | ||
Former [2017/20] | AT | 06.01.2016 | |
CZ | 06.01.2016 | ||
DK | 06.01.2016 | ||
EE | 06.01.2016 | ||
FI | 06.01.2016 | ||
HR | 06.01.2016 | ||
LT | 06.01.2016 | ||
LV | 06.01.2016 | ||
MC | 06.01.2016 | ||
RO | 06.01.2016 | ||
SE | 06.01.2016 | ||
SI | 06.01.2016 | ||
SK | 06.01.2016 | ||
BG | 06.04.2016 | ||
NO | 06.04.2016 | ||
GR | 07.04.2016 | ||
IS | 06.05.2016 | ||
PT | 06.05.2016 | ||
BE | 31.07.2016 | ||
CH | 31.07.2016 | ||
LI | 31.07.2016 | ||
Former [2017/15] | AT | 06.01.2016 | |
CZ | 06.01.2016 | ||
DK | 06.01.2016 | ||
EE | 06.01.2016 | ||
FI | 06.01.2016 | ||
HR | 06.01.2016 | ||
LT | 06.01.2016 | ||
LV | 06.01.2016 | ||
MC | 06.01.2016 | ||
RO | 06.01.2016 | ||
SE | 06.01.2016 | ||
SI | 06.01.2016 | ||
SK | 06.01.2016 | ||
BG | 06.04.2016 | ||
NO | 06.04.2016 | ||
GR | 07.04.2016 | ||
IS | 06.05.2016 | ||
PT | 06.05.2016 | ||
BE | 31.07.2016 | ||
Former [2017/03] | AT | 06.01.2016 | |
CZ | 06.01.2016 | ||
DK | 06.01.2016 | ||
EE | 06.01.2016 | ||
FI | 06.01.2016 | ||
HR | 06.01.2016 | ||
LT | 06.01.2016 | ||
LV | 06.01.2016 | ||
RO | 06.01.2016 | ||
SE | 06.01.2016 | ||
SK | 06.01.2016 | ||
NO | 06.04.2016 | ||
GR | 07.04.2016 | ||
IS | 06.05.2016 | ||
PT | 06.05.2016 | ||
BE | 31.07.2016 | ||
Former [2016/50] | AT | 06.01.2016 | |
CZ | 06.01.2016 | ||
DK | 06.01.2016 | ||
EE | 06.01.2016 | ||
FI | 06.01.2016 | ||
HR | 06.01.2016 | ||
LT | 06.01.2016 | ||
LV | 06.01.2016 | ||
RO | 06.01.2016 | ||
SE | 06.01.2016 | ||
SK | 06.01.2016 | ||
NO | 06.04.2016 | ||
GR | 07.04.2016 | ||
IS | 06.05.2016 | ||
PT | 06.05.2016 | ||
Former [2016/49] | AT | 06.01.2016 | |
DK | 06.01.2016 | ||
EE | 06.01.2016 | ||
FI | 06.01.2016 | ||
HR | 06.01.2016 | ||
LT | 06.01.2016 | ||
LV | 06.01.2016 | ||
SE | 06.01.2016 | ||
NO | 06.04.2016 | ||
GR | 07.04.2016 | ||
IS | 06.05.2016 | ||
PT | 06.05.2016 | ||
Former [2016/46] | AT | 06.01.2016 | |
DK | 06.01.2016 | ||
FI | 06.01.2016 | ||
HR | 06.01.2016 | ||
LT | 06.01.2016 | ||
LV | 06.01.2016 | ||
SE | 06.01.2016 | ||
NO | 06.04.2016 | ||
GR | 07.04.2016 | ||
IS | 06.05.2016 | ||
PT | 06.05.2016 | ||
Former [2016/39] | AT | 06.01.2016 | |
FI | 06.01.2016 | ||
HR | 06.01.2016 | ||
LT | 06.01.2016 | ||
LV | 06.01.2016 | ||
SE | 06.01.2016 | ||
NO | 06.04.2016 | ||
GR | 07.04.2016 | ||
IS | 06.05.2016 | ||
PT | 06.05.2016 | ||
Former [2016/38] | AT | 06.01.2016 | |
FI | 06.01.2016 | ||
HR | 06.01.2016 | ||
LT | 06.01.2016 | ||
NO | 06.04.2016 | ||
GR | 07.04.2016 | ||
IS | 06.05.2016 | ||
PT | 06.05.2016 | ||
Former [2016/36] | AT | 06.01.2016 | |
FI | 06.01.2016 | ||
HR | 06.01.2016 | ||
LT | 06.01.2016 | ||
NO | 06.04.2016 | ||
GR | 07.04.2016 | ||
Former [2016/35] | FI | 06.01.2016 | |
HR | 06.01.2016 | ||
NO | 06.04.2016 | ||
GR | 07.04.2016 | Cited in | International search | [X]EP0290386 (CIBA GEIGY AG [CH]) [X] 1-3,11 * page 2, line 34 * * page 4, line 6 * * page 4, line 27 * * page 4, line 51 - line 53 * * page 5, line 41 - line 64 * * page 6, line 25 - line 32 * * example -; claims 1,3-6,8; table 2 *; | [I]EP0468923 (CIBA GEIGY AG [CH], et al) [I] 1-3,11 * page 2, line 1 - line 48 * * examples 4,7; claims 1,2,11; table 1 *; | [I]US5948836 (BONORA MICHELA [IT]) [I] 1-3,11 * example 1; claims 1-4,11,14; table 1 *; | [X]GB2349151 (CIBA SC HOLDING AG [CH]) [X] 1-3,11* page 1, paragraph 4 - page 6, paragraph 8; example -; claims 1-3,9,11,14-16; table 2 *; | [X]GB2354245 (CIBA SC HOLDING AG [CH]) [X] 1-3,11 * page 1, paragraph 4 - page 2, paragraph 2 * * page 8, paragraph 1 - paragraph 4 * * page 20 - page 21; example -; table 2 * |