EP2186058 - ANATOMICALLY CONSTRAINED IMAGE REGISTRATION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 02.03.2018 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 24.03.2017 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 13.11.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.05.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): PT | published on 01.07.2020 [2020/27] | Applicant(s) | For:AT
BE
BG
CH
CY
CZ
DK
EE
ES
FI
FR
GB
GR
HR
HU
IE
IS
IT
LI
LT
LU
LV
MC
MT
NL
NO
PL
PT
RO
SE
SI
SK
TR
Koninklijke Philips N.V. High Tech Campus 5 5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | For:DE
Philips Intellectual Property & Standards GmbH Lübeckertordamm 5 20099 Hamburg / DE | [2017/17] |
Former [2013/39] | For:AT
BE
BG
CH
CY
CZ
DK
EE
ES
FI
FR
GB
GR
HR
HU
IE
IS
IT
LI
LT
LU
LV
MC
MT
NL
NO
Koninklijke Philips N.V. High Tech Campus 5 5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | ||
For:DE
Philips Intellectual Property & Standards GmbH Lübeckertordamm 5 20099 Hamburg / DE | |||
Former [2010/20] | For:AT
BE
BG
CH
CY
CZ
DK
EE
ES
FI
FR
GB
GR
HR
HU
IE
IS
IT
LI
LT
LU
LV
MC
MT
NL
NO
Koninklijke Philips Electronics N.V. Groenewoudseweg 1 5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | ||
For:DE
Philips Intellectual Property & Standards GmbH Lübeckertordamm 5 20099 Hamburg / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
PEKAR, Vladimir c/o High Tech Campus Building 44 NL-5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | 02 /
BYSTROV, Daniel c/o High Tech Campus Building 44 NL-5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | [2010/20] | Representative(s) | van Velzen, Maaike Mathilde Philips Intellectual Property & Standards High Tech Campus 5 5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | [2017/17] |
Former [2010/20] | Van Velzen, Maaike Mathilde Philips Intellectual Property & Standards P.O. Box 220 5600 AE Eindhoven / NL | Application number, filing date | 08789483.8 | 29.07.2008 | [2010/20] | WO2008IB53042 | Priority number, date | EP20070113764 | 03.08.2007 Original published format: EP 07113764 | [2010/20] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2009019630 | Date: | 12.02.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/07] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2186058 | Date: | 19.05.2010 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 12.02.2009 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2010/20] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2186058 | Date: | 26.04.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/17] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 13.08.2009 | Classification | IPC: | G06T7/00 | [2010/20] | CPC: |
G06T7/32 (EP,US);
G06T7/33 (EP,US);
G06T7/337 (EP,US);
G06V10/245 (EP,US);
A61B6/503 (EP,US);
A61B6/504 (EP,US);
G06T2207/10072 (EP,US);
G06T2207/20128 (EP,US);
G06T2207/30012 (EP,US);
G06V2201/03 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2017/17] |
Former [2010/20] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ANATOMISCH EINGESCHRÄNKTE BILDERFASSUNG | [2010/20] | English: | ANATOMICALLY CONSTRAINED IMAGE REGISTRATION | [2010/20] | French: | ALIGNEMENT D'IMAGES AVEC CONTRAINTES ANATOMIQUES | [2016/50] |
Former [2010/20] | SUPERPOSITION D'IMAGES PAR CONTRAINTE ANATOMIQUE | Entry into regional phase | 03.03.2010 | National basic fee paid | 03.03.2010 | Designation fee(s) paid | 03.03.2010 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 19.01.2010 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 03.03.2010 | Examination requested [2010/20] | 24.08.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 08.01.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.04.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 13.09.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.11.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.03.2017 | Fee for grant paid | 15.03.2017 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 15.03.2017 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 24.08.2012 | Opposition(s) | 29.01.2018 | No opposition filed within time limit [2018/14] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.08.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 01.08.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.07.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.07.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 31.07.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 31.07.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 01.08.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 29.07.2008 | AT | 26.04.2017 | CY | 26.04.2017 | CZ | 26.04.2017 | DK | 26.04.2017 | EE | 26.04.2017 | ES | 26.04.2017 | FI | 26.04.2017 | HR | 26.04.2017 | IT | 26.04.2017 | LT | 26.04.2017 | LV | 26.04.2017 | MC | 26.04.2017 | NL | 26.04.2017 | PL | 26.04.2017 | PT | 26.04.2017 | RO | 26.04.2017 | SE | 26.04.2017 | SI | 26.04.2017 | SK | 26.04.2017 | TR | 26.04.2017 | BG | 26.07.2017 | NO | 26.07.2017 | GR | 27.07.2017 | IE | 29.07.2017 | LU | 29.07.2017 | MT | 29.07.2017 | BE | 31.07.2017 | CH | 31.07.2017 | LI | 31.07.2017 | IS | 26.08.2017 | [2020/27] |
Former [2020/15] | HU | 29.07.2008 | |
AT | 26.04.2017 | ||
CY | 26.04.2017 | ||
CZ | 26.04.2017 | ||
DK | 26.04.2017 | ||
EE | 26.04.2017 | ||
ES | 26.04.2017 | ||
FI | 26.04.2017 | ||
HR | 26.04.2017 | ||
IT | 26.04.2017 | ||
LT | 26.04.2017 | ||
LV | 26.04.2017 | ||
MC | 26.04.2017 | ||
NL | 26.04.2017 | ||
PL | 26.04.2017 | ||
RO | 26.04.2017 | ||
SE | 26.04.2017 | ||
SI | 26.04.2017 | ||
SK | 26.04.2017 | ||
TR | 26.04.2017 | ||
BG | 26.07.2017 | ||
NO | 26.07.2017 | ||
GR | 27.07.2017 | ||
IE | 29.07.2017 | ||
LU | 29.07.2017 | ||
MT | 29.07.2017 | ||
BE | 31.07.2017 | ||
CH | 31.07.2017 | ||
LI | 31.07.2017 | ||
IS | 26.08.2017 | ||
Former [2019/46] | HU | 29.07.2008 | |
AT | 26.04.2017 | ||
CY | 26.04.2017 | ||
CZ | 26.04.2017 | ||
DK | 26.04.2017 | ||
EE | 26.04.2017 | ||
ES | 26.04.2017 | ||
FI | 26.04.2017 | ||
HR | 26.04.2017 | ||
IT | 26.04.2017 | ||
LT | 26.04.2017 | ||
LV | 26.04.2017 | ||
MC | 26.04.2017 | ||
NL | 26.04.2017 | ||
PL | 26.04.2017 | ||
RO | 26.04.2017 | ||
SE | 26.04.2017 | ||
SI | 26.04.2017 | ||
SK | 26.04.2017 | ||
BG | 26.07.2017 | ||
NO | 26.07.2017 | ||
GR | 27.07.2017 | ||
IE | 29.07.2017 | ||
LU | 29.07.2017 | ||
MT | 29.07.2017 | ||
BE | 31.07.2017 | ||
CH | 31.07.2017 | ||
LI | 31.07.2017 | ||
IS | 26.08.2017 | ||
Former [2019/31] | HU | 29.07.2008 | |
AT | 26.04.2017 | ||
CZ | 26.04.2017 | ||
DK | 26.04.2017 | ||
EE | 26.04.2017 | ||
ES | 26.04.2017 | ||
FI | 26.04.2017 | ||
HR | 26.04.2017 | ||
IT | 26.04.2017 | ||
LT | 26.04.2017 | ||
LV | 26.04.2017 | ||
MC | 26.04.2017 | ||
NL | 26.04.2017 | ||
PL | 26.04.2017 | ||
RO | 26.04.2017 | ||
SE | 26.04.2017 | ||
SI | 26.04.2017 | ||
SK | 26.04.2017 | ||
BG | 26.07.2017 | ||
NO | 26.07.2017 | ||
GR | 27.07.2017 | ||
IE | 29.07.2017 | ||
LU | 29.07.2017 | ||
MT | 29.07.2017 | ||
BE | 31.07.2017 | ||
CH | 31.07.2017 | ||
LI | 31.07.2017 | ||
IS | 26.08.2017 | ||
Former [2019/30] | AT | 26.04.2017 | |
CZ | 26.04.2017 | ||
DK | 26.04.2017 | ||
EE | 26.04.2017 | ||
ES | 26.04.2017 | ||
FI | 26.04.2017 | ||
HR | 26.04.2017 | ||
IT | 26.04.2017 | ||
LT | 26.04.2017 | ||
LV | 26.04.2017 | ||
MC | 26.04.2017 | ||
NL | 26.04.2017 | ||
PL | 26.04.2017 | ||
RO | 26.04.2017 | ||
SE | 26.04.2017 | ||
SI | 26.04.2017 | ||
SK | 26.04.2017 | ||
BG | 26.07.2017 | ||
NO | 26.07.2017 | ||
GR | 27.07.2017 | ||
IE | 29.07.2017 | ||
LU | 29.07.2017 | ||
MT | 29.07.2017 | ||
BE | 31.07.2017 | ||
CH | 31.07.2017 | ||
LI | 31.07.2017 | ||
IS | 26.08.2017 | ||
Former [2018/43] | AT | 26.04.2017 | |
CZ | 26.04.2017 | ||
DK | 26.04.2017 | ||
EE | 26.04.2017 | ||
ES | 26.04.2017 | ||
FI | 26.04.2017 | ||
HR | 26.04.2017 | ||
IT | 26.04.2017 | ||
LT | 26.04.2017 | ||
LV | 26.04.2017 | ||
NL | 26.04.2017 | ||
PL | 26.04.2017 | ||
RO | 26.04.2017 | ||
SE | 26.04.2017 | ||
SI | 26.04.2017 | ||
SK | 26.04.2017 | ||
BG | 26.07.2017 | ||
NO | 26.07.2017 | ||
GR | 27.07.2017 | ||
IE | 29.07.2017 | ||
LU | 29.07.2017 | ||
MT | 29.07.2017 | ||
BE | 31.07.2017 | ||
CH | 31.07.2017 | ||
LI | 31.07.2017 | ||
IS | 26.08.2017 | ||
Former [2018/39] | AT | 26.04.2017 | |
CZ | 26.04.2017 | ||
DK | 26.04.2017 | ||
EE | 26.04.2017 | ||
ES | 26.04.2017 | ||
FI | 26.04.2017 | ||
HR | 26.04.2017 | ||
IT | 26.04.2017 | ||
LT | 26.04.2017 | ||
LV | 26.04.2017 | ||
NL | 26.04.2017 | ||
PL | 26.04.2017 | ||
RO | 26.04.2017 | ||
SE | 26.04.2017 | ||
SI | 26.04.2017 | ||
SK | 26.04.2017 | ||
BG | 26.07.2017 | ||
NO | 26.07.2017 | ||
GR | 27.07.2017 | ||
IE | 29.07.2017 | ||
LU | 29.07.2017 | ||
BE | 31.07.2017 | ||
CH | 31.07.2017 | ||
LI | 31.07.2017 | ||
IS | 26.08.2017 | ||
Former [2018/34] | AT | 26.04.2017 | |
CZ | 26.04.2017 | ||
DK | 26.04.2017 | ||
EE | 26.04.2017 | ||
ES | 26.04.2017 | ||
FI | 26.04.2017 | ||
HR | 26.04.2017 | ||
IT | 26.04.2017 | ||
LT | 26.04.2017 | ||
LV | 26.04.2017 | ||
NL | 26.04.2017 | ||
PL | 26.04.2017 | ||
RO | 26.04.2017 | ||
SE | 26.04.2017 | ||
SI | 26.04.2017 | ||
SK | 26.04.2017 | ||
BG | 26.07.2017 | ||
NO | 26.07.2017 | ||
GR | 27.07.2017 | ||
IE | 29.07.2017 | ||
LU | 29.07.2017 | ||
CH | 31.07.2017 | ||
LI | 31.07.2017 | ||
IS | 26.08.2017 | ||
Former [2018/25] | AT | 26.04.2017 | |
CZ | 26.04.2017 | ||
DK | 26.04.2017 | ||
EE | 26.04.2017 | ||
ES | 26.04.2017 | ||
FI | 26.04.2017 | ||
HR | 26.04.2017 | ||
IT | 26.04.2017 | ||
LT | 26.04.2017 | ||
LV | 26.04.2017 | ||
NL | 26.04.2017 | ||
PL | 26.04.2017 | ||
RO | 26.04.2017 | ||
SE | 26.04.2017 | ||
SI | 26.04.2017 | ||
SK | 26.04.2017 | ||
BG | 26.07.2017 | ||
NO | 26.07.2017 | ||
GR | 27.07.2017 | ||
CH | 31.07.2017 | ||
LI | 31.07.2017 | ||
IS | 26.08.2017 | ||
Former [2018/21] | AT | 26.04.2017 | |
CZ | 26.04.2017 | ||
DK | 26.04.2017 | ||
EE | 26.04.2017 | ||
ES | 26.04.2017 | ||
FI | 26.04.2017 | ||
HR | 26.04.2017 | ||
IT | 26.04.2017 | ||
LT | 26.04.2017 | ||
LV | 26.04.2017 | ||
NL | 26.04.2017 | ||
PL | 26.04.2017 | ||
RO | 26.04.2017 | ||
SE | 26.04.2017 | ||
SK | 26.04.2017 | ||
BG | 26.07.2017 | ||
NO | 26.07.2017 | ||
GR | 27.07.2017 | ||
CH | 31.07.2017 | ||
LI | 31.07.2017 | ||
IS | 26.08.2017 | ||
Former [2018/11] | AT | 26.04.2017 | |
CZ | 26.04.2017 | ||
DK | 26.04.2017 | ||
EE | 26.04.2017 | ||
ES | 26.04.2017 | ||
FI | 26.04.2017 | ||
HR | 26.04.2017 | ||
IT | 26.04.2017 | ||
LT | 26.04.2017 | ||
LV | 26.04.2017 | ||
NL | 26.04.2017 | ||
PL | 26.04.2017 | ||
RO | 26.04.2017 | ||
SE | 26.04.2017 | ||
SK | 26.04.2017 | ||
BG | 26.07.2017 | ||
NO | 26.07.2017 | ||
GR | 27.07.2017 | ||
IS | 26.08.2017 | ||
Former [2018/10] | AT | 26.04.2017 | |
CZ | 26.04.2017 | ||
DK | 26.04.2017 | ||
EE | 26.04.2017 | ||
ES | 26.04.2017 | ||
FI | 26.04.2017 | ||
HR | 26.04.2017 | ||
LT | 26.04.2017 | ||
LV | 26.04.2017 | ||
NL | 26.04.2017 | ||
PL | 26.04.2017 | ||
RO | 26.04.2017 | ||
SE | 26.04.2017 | ||
SK | 26.04.2017 | ||
BG | 26.07.2017 | ||
NO | 26.07.2017 | ||
GR | 27.07.2017 | ||
IS | 26.08.2017 | ||
Former [2018/09] | AT | 26.04.2017 | |
DK | 26.04.2017 | ||
EE | 26.04.2017 | ||
ES | 26.04.2017 | ||
FI | 26.04.2017 | ||
HR | 26.04.2017 | ||
LT | 26.04.2017 | ||
LV | 26.04.2017 | ||
NL | 26.04.2017 | ||
PL | 26.04.2017 | ||
SE | 26.04.2017 | ||
BG | 26.07.2017 | ||
NO | 26.07.2017 | ||
GR | 27.07.2017 | ||
IS | 26.08.2017 | ||
Former [2017/50] | AT | 26.04.2017 | |
ES | 26.04.2017 | ||
FI | 26.04.2017 | ||
HR | 26.04.2017 | ||
LT | 26.04.2017 | ||
LV | 26.04.2017 | ||
NL | 26.04.2017 | ||
PL | 26.04.2017 | ||
SE | 26.04.2017 | ||
BG | 26.07.2017 | ||
NO | 26.07.2017 | ||
GR | 27.07.2017 | ||
IS | 26.08.2017 | ||
Former [2017/49] | AT | 26.04.2017 | |
ES | 26.04.2017 | ||
FI | 26.04.2017 | ||
HR | 26.04.2017 | ||
LT | 26.04.2017 | ||
NL | 26.04.2017 | ||
NO | 26.07.2017 | ||
GR | 27.07.2017 | ||
IS | 26.08.2017 | ||
Former [2017/48] | NL | 26.04.2017 | Cited in | International search | [A]WO2005059831 (PHILIPS INTELLECTUAL PROPERTY [DE], et al) [A] 1-10 * page 7, line 4 - line 29 * * page 8, line 5 - page 9, line 3 * * figures 2,6 *; | [A]WO2006134565 (KONINKL PHILIPS ELECTRONICS NV [NL], et al) [A] 1-10 * page 2, line 17 - line 26 * * page 2, line 30 - page 3, line 15 * * page 8, line 11 - page 9, line 22 * * page 10, line 10 - line 25 * * page 12, line 7 - line 21 * * figures 1,3 *; | [A]US2007014457 (JOLLY MARIE-PIERRE [US], et al) [A] 1-10 * page 1, column L, paragraph 3 - column R, paragraph 7 * * page 3, column R, paragraph 32 - page 4, column L, paragraph 38 * * figures 2A,2B,4 *; | [X] - KAUS ET AL, "Assessment of a Model-Based Deformable Image Registration Approach for Radiation Therapy Planning", INTERNATIONAL JOURNAL OF RADIATION: ONCOLOGY BIOLOGY PHYSICS, PERGAMON PRESS, US, (20070509), vol. 68, no. 2, ISSN 0360-3016, pages 572 - 580, XP022069508 [X] 1-10 * page 573, column L, line 10 - line 31 * * figure 1 * * page 573, column R, line 50 - page 574, column L, line 6 * * page 574, column R, line 7 - line 13 * * page 575, column L, line 7 - column R, line 50 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.ijrobp.2007.01.056 | [X] - ALEJANDRO F FRANGI ET AL, "Automatic Construction of Multiple-Object Three-Dimensional Statistical Shape Models: Application to Cardiac Modeling", IEEE TRANSACTIONS ON MEDICAL IMAGING, IEEE SERVICE CENTER, PISCATAWAY, NJ, US, (20020901), vol. 21, no. 9, ISSN 0278-0062, XP011076353 [X] 1-10 * figures 1,14 * * page 1153, column L, paragraph III. - page 1154, column L, paragraph III.C * * page 1158, column L, paragraph IV.E - column R * * page 1160, paragraph V.D - page 1161 * * paragraph VI - page 1163, column R, lines 29-40 * * page 1164, column R * * paragraph IV - page 1164, column R, lines 4-16,33-40 * | [X] - COROUGE I ET AL, "Use of a probabilistic shape model for non-linear registration of 3d scattered data", PROCEEDINGS 2001 INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON IMAGE PROCESSING. ICIP 2001. THESSALONIKI, GREECE, OCT. 7 - 10, 2001; [INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON IMAGE PROCESSING], NEW YORK, NY : IEEE, US, (20011007), vol. 1, ISBN 978-0-7803-6725-8, pages 149 - 152, XP010564818 [X] 1-10 * page 149, paragraph 1 - lines 3-13 * * page 149, line 1, paragraph 2 - page 150, line 34, paragraph 2.2 * * page 151, line 1, paragraph 3 - line L, paragraph 3.1 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/ICIP.2001.958975 | [A] - JINAH KIM ET AL, "2D/3D non-rigid registration of volumetric CT lung data using thin-plate spline", ENTERPRISE NETWORKING AND COMPUTING IN HEALTHCARE INDUSTRY, 2005. HEAL THCOM 2005. PROCEEDINGS OF 7TH INTERNATIONAL WORKSHOP ON BUSAN, SOUTH KOREA 23-25 JUNE 2005, PISCATAWAY, NJ, USA,IEEE, US, (20050623), ISBN 978-0-7803-8940-3, pages 197 - 201, XP010830160 [A] 1-10 * paragraph I.A - pages 197-198 * * page 199, paragraph II * * figure 1 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/HEALTH.2005.1500439 | [A] - WEINING YUE ET AL, "Locating Large-Scale Craniofacial Feature Points on X-ray Images for Automated Cephalometric Analysis", IMAGE PROCESSING, 2005. ICIP 2005. IEEE INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON GENOVA, ITALY 11-14 SEPT. 2005, PISCATAWAY, NJ, USA,IEEE, (20050911), vol. 2, ISBN 978-0-7803-9134-5, pages 1246 - 1249, XP010851285 [A] 1-10 * page 1, column R, line 1, paragraph II.A - page 3, column R, line L, paragraph II.C.2 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/ICIP.2005.1530288 | [AD] - LORENZ C ET AL, "Generation of Point-Based 3D Statistical Shape Models for Anatomical Objects", COMPUTER VISION AND IMAGE UNDERSTANDING, ACADEMIC PRESS, US, (20000201), vol. 77, no. 2, ISSN 1077-3142, pages 175 - 191, XP004439301 [AD] 1-10 * figures 1,6,8,10 * * page 177, line 1, paragraph 2 - page 178, line 8, paragraph 3 * * page 182, line 8, paragraph 4. - page 184, line L, paragraph 4.1 * * page 186, line 1, paragraph 5 - page 187, line L * * page 189, line 6 - line 17 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1006/cviu.1999.0814 | [AD] - BOOKSTEIN F L, "PRINCIPAL WARPS: THIN-PLATE SPLINES AND THE DECOMPOSITION OF DEFORMATIONS", IEEE TRANSACTIONS ON PATTERN ANALYSIS AND MACHINE INTELLIGENCE, IEEE SERVICE CENTER, LOS ALAMITOS, CA, US, (19890601), vol. 11, no. 6, ISSN 0162-8828, pages 567 - 585, XP000034113 [AD] 1-10 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/34.24792 |