EP2197610 - CUTTING INSERT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 19.07.2013 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.07.2015 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 19.08.2015 [2015/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Iscar Ltd. P.O. Box 11 24959 Tefen / IL | [2010/25] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ABRAMSON, Michael 28a Shoham Street 21074 Ma'alot / IL | 02 /
GONEN, Eitan 14 Irus Street 25147 Kfar Vradim / IL | [2010/25] | Representative(s) | Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2012/37] | Vossius & Partner Siebertstrasse 4 81675 München / DE | ||
Former [2010/25] | Vossius & Partner Siebertstrasse 4 81675 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 08789722.9 | 30.07.2008 | [2010/25] | WO2008IL01046 | Priority number, date | IL20070185840 | 09.09.2007 Original published format: IL 18584007 | [2010/25] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2009031133 | Date: | 12.03.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/11] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2197610 | Date: | 23.06.2010 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 12.03.2009 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2010/25] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2197610 | Date: | 12.09.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/37] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 12.03.2009 | Classification | IPC: | B23B27/14, B23B51/04 | [2010/25] | CPC: |
B23B27/141 (EP,US);
B23B51/00 (EP,US);
B23B2200/082 (EP,US);
B23B2200/087 (EP,US);
Y10T407/23 (EP,US);
Y10T407/235 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2010/25] | Title | German: | SCHNEIDEINSATZ | [2010/25] | English: | CUTTING INSERT | [2010/25] | French: | PLAQUETTE DE COUPE | [2010/25] | Entry into regional phase | 08.03.2010 | National basic fee paid | 08.03.2010 | Designation fee(s) paid | 08.03.2010 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 08.03.2010 | Examination requested [2010/25] | 16.12.2011 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.04.2012 | Fee for grant paid | 23.04.2012 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 16.12.2011 | Opposition(s) | 13.06.2013 | No opposition filed within time limit [2013/34] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.05.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.05.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 10.05.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 30.07.2008 | BE | 12.09.2012 | CY | 12.09.2012 | DK | 12.09.2012 | EE | 12.09.2012 | FI | 12.09.2012 | HR | 12.09.2012 | LT | 12.09.2012 | LV | 12.09.2012 | MC | 12.09.2012 | MT | 12.09.2012 | NL | 12.09.2012 | RO | 12.09.2012 | SI | 12.09.2012 | SK | 12.09.2012 | BG | 12.12.2012 | NO | 12.12.2012 | GR | 13.12.2012 | IS | 12.01.2013 | [2015/34] |
Former [2015/32] | BE | 12.09.2012 | |
CY | 12.09.2012 | ||
DK | 12.09.2012 | ||
EE | 12.09.2012 | ||
FI | 12.09.2012 | ||
HR | 12.09.2012 | ||
LT | 12.09.2012 | ||
LV | 12.09.2012 | ||
MC | 12.09.2012 | ||
MT | 12.09.2012 | ||
NL | 12.09.2012 | ||
RO | 12.09.2012 | ||
SI | 12.09.2012 | ||
SK | 12.09.2012 | ||
BG | 12.12.2012 | ||
NO | 12.12.2012 | ||
GR | 13.12.2012 | ||
IS | 12.01.2013 | ||
Former [2014/14] | BE | 12.09.2012 | |
CY | 12.09.2012 | ||
DK | 12.09.2012 | ||
EE | 12.09.2012 | ||
FI | 12.09.2012 | ||
HR | 12.09.2012 | ||
LT | 12.09.2012 | ||
LV | 12.09.2012 | ||
MC | 12.09.2012 | ||
NL | 12.09.2012 | ||
RO | 12.09.2012 | ||
SI | 12.09.2012 | ||
SK | 12.09.2012 | ||
BG | 12.12.2012 | ||
NO | 12.12.2012 | ||
GR | 13.12.2012 | ||
IS | 12.01.2013 | ||
Former [2013/34] | BE | 12.09.2012 | |
CY | 12.09.2012 | ||
DK | 12.09.2012 | ||
EE | 12.09.2012 | ||
FI | 12.09.2012 | ||
HR | 12.09.2012 | ||
LT | 12.09.2012 | ||
LV | 12.09.2012 | ||
NL | 12.09.2012 | ||
RO | 12.09.2012 | ||
SI | 12.09.2012 | ||
SK | 12.09.2012 | ||
BG | 12.12.2012 | ||
NO | 12.12.2012 | ||
GR | 13.12.2012 | ||
IS | 12.01.2013 | ||
Former [2013/23] | BE | 12.09.2012 | |
CY | 12.09.2012 | ||
EE | 12.09.2012 | ||
FI | 12.09.2012 | ||
HR | 12.09.2012 | ||
LT | 12.09.2012 | ||
LV | 12.09.2012 | ||
NL | 12.09.2012 | ||
RO | 12.09.2012 | ||
SI | 12.09.2012 | ||
SK | 12.09.2012 | ||
NO | 12.12.2012 | ||
GR | 13.12.2012 | ||
IS | 12.01.2013 | ||
Former [2013/22] | BE | 12.09.2012 | |
CY | 12.09.2012 | ||
EE | 12.09.2012 | ||
FI | 12.09.2012 | ||
HR | 12.09.2012 | ||
LT | 12.09.2012 | ||
LV | 12.09.2012 | ||
NL | 12.09.2012 | ||
SI | 12.09.2012 | ||
NO | 12.12.2012 | ||
GR | 13.12.2012 | ||
IS | 12.01.2013 | ||
Former [2013/20] | BE | 12.09.2012 | |
CY | 12.09.2012 | ||
FI | 12.09.2012 | ||
HR | 12.09.2012 | ||
LT | 12.09.2012 | ||
LV | 12.09.2012 | ||
SI | 12.09.2012 | ||
NO | 12.12.2012 | ||
GR | 13.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/11] | CY | 12.09.2012 | |
FI | 12.09.2012 | ||
HR | 12.09.2012 | ||
LT | 12.09.2012 | ||
LV | 12.09.2012 | ||
SI | 12.09.2012 | ||
NO | 12.12.2012 | ||
GR | 13.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/10] | CY | 12.09.2012 | |
FI | 12.09.2012 | ||
HR | 12.09.2012 | ||
LT | 12.09.2012 | ||
NO | 12.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/09] | FI | 12.09.2012 | |
LT | 12.09.2012 | ||
NO | 12.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/08] | LT | 12.09.2012 | |
NO | 12.12.2012 | Cited in | International search | [A]DE4201112 (KRUPP WIDIA GMBH [DE]) [A] 1 * the whole document *; | [A]AT8433U (CERATIZIT AUSTRIA GMBH [AT]) [A] 1* the whole document * |