EP2185218 - DETACHABLE PORTABLE INFUSION DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 02.05.2014 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.07.2015 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU, LU | published on 19.08.2015 [2015/34] | Applicant(s) | For:DE
Roche Diagnostics GmbH Sandhofer Strasse 116 68305 Mannheim / DE | For:AT
BE
BG
CH
CY
CZ
DK
EE
ES
FI
FR
GB
GR
HR
HU
IE
IS
IT
LI
LT
LU
LV
MC
MT
NL
NO
PL
PT
RO
SE
SI
SK
TR
F. Hoffmann-La Roche AG Grenzacherstrasse 124 4070 Basel / CH | [N/P] |
Former [2014/10] | For:DE
Roche Diagnostics GmbH Sandhofer Strasse 116 68305 Mannheim / DE | ||
For:AT
BE
BG
CH
CY
CZ
DK
EE
ES
FI
FR
GB
GR
HR
HU
IE
IS
IT
LI
LT
LU
LV
MC
MT
NL
NO
PL
PT
RO
SE
SI
SK
TR
F.Hoffmann-La Roche AG Grenzacherstrasse 124 4070 Basel / CH | |||
Former [2010/20] | For all designated states Medingo Ltd. Yoqneam Industrial Park Building 7 P.O. Box 261 20692 Yoqneam Illit / IL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
YODFAT, Ofer 6 Migal Yam St. 71725 MODI'IN / IL | 02 /
Perlman, Danna 9 Giborei Getto Warsha St. Rama Eshkol 34994 Haifa / IL | [2013/26] |
Former [2010/46] | 01 /
YODFAT, Ofer 6 Migal Yam St. 71725 MODI'IN / IL | ||
02 /
Perlman, Danna 9 Giborei Getto Warsha St. Rama Eshkol 34994 Haifa / IL | |||
Former [2010/29] | 01 /
YODFAT, Ofer 72 Galil St. 71908 Maccabim-Reut / IL | ||
02 /
Perlman, Danna 9 Giborei Getto Warsha St. Rama Eshkol 34994 Haifa / IL | |||
Former [2010/20] | 01 /
YODFAT, Ofer 72 Galil St. 71908 Maccabim-Reut / IL | Representative(s) | Evens, Paul Jonathan, et al Maguire Boss 24 East Street St. Ives, Cambridgeshire PE27 5PD / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2010/20] | Evens, Paul Jonathan, et al Maguire Boss 24 East Street St. Ives Cambridgeshire PE27 5PD / GB | Application number, filing date | 08789732.8 | 31.07.2008 | [2010/20] | WO2008IL01056 | Priority number, date | US20070963045P | 01.08.2007 Original published format: US 963045 P | US20070999654P | 19.10.2007 Original published format: US 999654 P | [2010/20] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2009016635 | Date: | 05.02.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/06] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2185218 | Date: | 19.05.2010 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 05.02.2009 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2010/20] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2185218 | Date: | 26.06.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/26] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 19.03.2009 | Classification | IPC: | A61M5/142, A61M5/172 | [2010/20] | CPC: |
A61M5/14248 (EP,US);
A61M2005/14268 (EP,US);
A61M2205/14 (EP,US);
A61M2205/3569 (EP,US);
A61M2205/3592 (EP,US);
A61M5/1413 (EP,US);
A61M5/1723 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2010/20] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ABLÖSBARE TRAGBARE INFUSIONSVORRICHTUNG | [2010/20] | English: | DETACHABLE PORTABLE INFUSION DEVICE | [2010/20] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE PERFUSION PORTABLE DÉTACHABLE | [2010/20] | Entry into regional phase | 25.02.2010 | National basic fee paid | 25.02.2010 | Designation fee(s) paid | 25.02.2010 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 22.02.2010 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 25.02.2010 | Examination requested [2010/20] | 23.01.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 26.07.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.02.2013 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.05.2013 | Fee for grant paid | 15.05.2013 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 23.01.2012 | Opposition(s) | 27.03.2014 | No opposition filed within time limit [2014/23] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.07.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 16.07.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 10.07.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 31.07.2008 | AT | 26.06.2013 | BE | 26.06.2013 | CY | 26.06.2013 | CZ | 26.06.2013 | EE | 26.06.2013 | FI | 26.06.2013 | HR | 26.06.2013 | IT | 26.06.2013 | LT | 26.06.2013 | LV | 26.06.2013 | MC | 26.06.2013 | MT | 26.06.2013 | PL | 26.06.2013 | RO | 26.06.2013 | SE | 26.06.2013 | SI | 26.06.2013 | SK | 26.06.2013 | TR | 26.06.2013 | IE | 31.07.2013 | LU | 31.07.2013 | BG | 26.09.2013 | NO | 26.09.2013 | GR | 27.09.2013 | ES | 07.10.2013 | IS | 26.10.2013 | PT | 28.10.2013 | [2015/34] |
Former [2015/32] | AT | 26.06.2013 | |
BE | 26.06.2013 | ||
CY | 26.06.2013 | ||
CZ | 26.06.2013 | ||
EE | 26.06.2013 | ||
FI | 26.06.2013 | ||
HR | 26.06.2013 | ||
IT | 26.06.2013 | ||
LT | 26.06.2013 | ||
LV | 26.06.2013 | ||
MC | 26.06.2013 | ||
MT | 26.06.2013 | ||
PL | 26.06.2013 | ||
RO | 26.06.2013 | ||
SE | 26.06.2013 | ||
SI | 26.06.2013 | ||
SK | 26.06.2013 | ||
TR | 26.06.2013 | ||
IE | 31.07.2013 | ||
BG | 26.09.2013 | ||
NO | 26.09.2013 | ||
GR | 27.09.2013 | ||
ES | 07.10.2013 | ||
IS | 26.10.2013 | ||
PT | 28.10.2013 | ||
Former [2014/33] | AT | 26.06.2013 | |
BE | 26.06.2013 | ||
CY | 26.06.2013 | ||
CZ | 26.06.2013 | ||
EE | 26.06.2013 | ||
FI | 26.06.2013 | ||
HR | 26.06.2013 | ||
IT | 26.06.2013 | ||
LT | 26.06.2013 | ||
LV | 26.06.2013 | ||
MC | 26.06.2013 | ||
PL | 26.06.2013 | ||
RO | 26.06.2013 | ||
SE | 26.06.2013 | ||
SI | 26.06.2013 | ||
SK | 26.06.2013 | ||
IE | 31.07.2013 | ||
BG | 26.09.2013 | ||
NO | 26.09.2013 | ||
GR | 27.09.2013 | ||
ES | 07.10.2013 | ||
IS | 26.10.2013 | ||
PT | 28.10.2013 | ||
Former [2014/24] | AT | 26.06.2013 | |
BE | 26.06.2013 | ||
CY | 26.06.2013 | ||
CZ | 26.06.2013 | ||
EE | 26.06.2013 | ||
FI | 26.06.2013 | ||
HR | 26.06.2013 | ||
IT | 26.06.2013 | ||
LT | 26.06.2013 | ||
LV | 26.06.2013 | ||
MC | 26.06.2013 | ||
PL | 26.06.2013 | ||
RO | 26.06.2013 | ||
SE | 26.06.2013 | ||
SI | 26.06.2013 | ||
SK | 26.06.2013 | ||
BG | 26.09.2013 | ||
NO | 26.09.2013 | ||
GR | 27.09.2013 | ||
ES | 07.10.2013 | ||
IS | 26.10.2013 | ||
PT | 28.10.2013 | ||
Former [2014/18] | AT | 26.06.2013 | |
BE | 26.06.2013 | ||
CY | 26.06.2013 | ||
CZ | 26.06.2013 | ||
EE | 26.06.2013 | ||
FI | 26.06.2013 | ||
HR | 26.06.2013 | ||
LT | 26.06.2013 | ||
LV | 26.06.2013 | ||
MC | 26.06.2013 | ||
PL | 26.06.2013 | ||
RO | 26.06.2013 | ||
SE | 26.06.2013 | ||
SI | 26.06.2013 | ||
SK | 26.06.2013 | ||
BG | 26.09.2013 | ||
NO | 26.09.2013 | ||
GR | 27.09.2013 | ||
ES | 07.10.2013 | ||
IS | 26.10.2013 | ||
PT | 28.10.2013 | ||
Former [2014/16] | AT | 26.06.2013 | |
BE | 26.06.2013 | ||
CZ | 26.06.2013 | ||
EE | 26.06.2013 | ||
FI | 26.06.2013 | ||
HR | 26.06.2013 | ||
LT | 26.06.2013 | ||
LV | 26.06.2013 | ||
MC | 26.06.2013 | ||
PL | 26.06.2013 | ||
RO | 26.06.2013 | ||
SE | 26.06.2013 | ||
SI | 26.06.2013 | ||
SK | 26.06.2013 | ||
CY | 28.08.2013 | ||
BG | 26.09.2013 | ||
NO | 26.09.2013 | ||
GR | 27.09.2013 | ||
ES | 07.10.2013 | ||
IS | 26.10.2013 | ||
PT | 28.10.2013 | ||
Former [2014/12] | AT | 26.06.2013 | |
BE | 26.06.2013 | ||
CZ | 26.06.2013 | ||
EE | 26.06.2013 | ||
FI | 26.06.2013 | ||
HR | 26.06.2013 | ||
LT | 26.06.2013 | ||
LV | 26.06.2013 | ||
PL | 26.06.2013 | ||
RO | 26.06.2013 | ||
SE | 26.06.2013 | ||
SI | 26.06.2013 | ||
SK | 26.06.2013 | ||
CY | 28.08.2013 | ||
BG | 26.09.2013 | ||
NO | 26.09.2013 | ||
GR | 27.09.2013 | ||
ES | 07.10.2013 | ||
IS | 26.10.2013 | ||
PT | 28.10.2013 | ||
Former [2014/11] | AT | 26.06.2013 | |
BE | 26.06.2013 | ||
CZ | 26.06.2013 | ||
EE | 26.06.2013 | ||
FI | 26.06.2013 | ||
HR | 26.06.2013 | ||
LT | 26.06.2013 | ||
LV | 26.06.2013 | ||
PL | 26.06.2013 | ||
RO | 26.06.2013 | ||
SE | 26.06.2013 | ||
SI | 26.06.2013 | ||
SK | 26.06.2013 | ||
CY | 28.08.2013 | ||
BG | 26.09.2013 | ||
NO | 26.09.2013 | ||
GR | 27.09.2013 | ||
IS | 26.10.2013 | ||
PT | 28.10.2013 | ||
Former [2014/10] | AT | 26.06.2013 | |
BE | 26.06.2013 | ||
CZ | 26.06.2013 | ||
EE | 26.06.2013 | ||
FI | 26.06.2013 | ||
HR | 26.06.2013 | ||
LT | 26.06.2013 | ||
LV | 26.06.2013 | ||
SE | 26.06.2013 | ||
SI | 26.06.2013 | ||
SK | 26.06.2013 | ||
CY | 28.08.2013 | ||
BG | 26.09.2013 | ||
NO | 26.09.2013 | ||
GR | 27.09.2013 | ||
IS | 26.10.2013 | ||
PT | 28.10.2013 | ||
Former [2014/09] | AT | 26.06.2013 | |
BE | 26.06.2013 | ||
EE | 26.06.2013 | ||
FI | 26.06.2013 | ||
HR | 26.06.2013 | ||
LT | 26.06.2013 | ||
LV | 26.06.2013 | ||
SE | 26.06.2013 | ||
SI | 26.06.2013 | ||
BG | 26.09.2013 | ||
NO | 26.09.2013 | ||
GR | 27.09.2013 | ||
PT | 28.10.2013 | ||
Former [2014/08] | BE | 26.06.2013 | |
FI | 26.06.2013 | ||
HR | 26.06.2013 | ||
LT | 26.06.2013 | ||
LV | 26.06.2013 | ||
SE | 26.06.2013 | ||
SI | 26.06.2013 | ||
BG | 26.09.2013 | ||
NO | 26.09.2013 | ||
GR | 27.09.2013 | ||
PT | 28.10.2013 | ||
Former [2014/02] | FI | 26.06.2013 | |
HR | 26.06.2013 | ||
LT | 26.06.2013 | ||
LV | 26.06.2013 | ||
SE | 26.06.2013 | ||
SI | 26.06.2013 | ||
BG | 26.09.2013 | ||
NO | 26.09.2013 | ||
GR | 27.09.2013 | ||
Former [2013/51] | FI | 26.06.2013 | |
HR | 26.06.2013 | ||
LT | 26.06.2013 | ||
SE | 26.06.2013 | ||
SI | 26.06.2013 | ||
BG | 26.09.2013 | ||
NO | 26.09.2013 | ||
GR | 27.09.2013 | ||
Former [2013/50] | FI | 26.06.2013 | |
LT | 26.06.2013 | ||
SE | 26.06.2013 | ||
SI | 26.06.2013 | ||
BG | 26.09.2013 | ||
NO | 26.09.2013 | ||
GR | 27.09.2013 | ||
Former [2013/49] | FI | 26.06.2013 | |
LT | 26.06.2013 | ||
SE | 26.06.2013 | ||
SI | 26.06.2013 | ||
NO | 26.09.2013 | ||
GR | 27.09.2013 | ||
Former [2013/47] | LT | 26.06.2013 | |
NO | 26.09.2013 | Cited in | International search | [X]WO2006097453 (NOVO NORDISK AS [DK], et al) [X] 1-22 * page 3, paragraph 3 - page 4, paragraph 3 * * page 8, paragraph 5 - page 12, paragraph 1; figures 1-6D *; | [X]WO2007071255 (UNOMEDICAL AS [DK], et al) [X] 1-22 * page 15, line 4 - page 17, line 9; figures 1-4 *; | [X]US2003088238 (POULSEN JENS ULRIK [DK], et al) [X] 1-22 * paragraphs [0018] , [0028] , [0031] , [0033] , [0037] , [0038] , [0048] , [0063] , [0069] - [0073] - [0077]; figures 1A-7C * * paragraphs [0100] , [0104] , [0113] - [0117] - [0126] *; | [X]US2002169439 (FLAHERTY J CHRISTOPHER [US]) [X] 1-22 * paragraphs [0062] , [0067] , [0085] , [0097] , [0098]; figures 1-12 *; | [A]WO2007056504 (M2 MEDICAL AS [DK], et al) [A] 1-22 * figures 13A-13C; claim 26 *; | [A]US2007106218 (YODFAT OFER [IL], et al) [A] 1-22 * paragraphs [0106] - [0227]; figures 1-30 * | by applicant | US3771694 | US4657486 | US4498843 | US5957895 | US6589229 | US6740059 | US6723072 | US6485461 | US20060397115 | WO2006IL01276 | US20080483707 | WO2007IL01578 | US20060876679 | US20070706606 | WO2008IL01001 | US20070961527 | US20070963148 | US20080401907 | WO2008IL00859 | US20080215219 | US20070937155 | WO2008IL00860 | US20080215255 | US20070937214 | WO2008IL00641 | US20070928815 | US20080989678 | US20060842869 | US20080989665 | WO2007IL01177 | US20060810854 | WO2007IL00684 |