Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US8563514 | Global Dossier | 22.10.2013 | B2 | US2010210544 | 19.08.2010 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2008IL01121 | 14.08.2008 | US93549007 | 15.08.2007 | US650108 | 16.01.2008 | US73313708 | 14.08.2008 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | IL203895 | Global Dossier | 31.10.2013 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2008IL01121 | 14.08.2008 | US93549007 | 15.08.2007 | IL20389510 | 11.02.2010 | US650108 | 16.01.2008 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2178908 | Global Dossier | 10.07.2013 | B1 | EP2178908 | 28.04.2010 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2008IL01121 | 14.08.2008 | US93549007 | 15.08.2007 | US650108 | 16.01.2008 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | ES2429794T | 15.11.2013 | T3 | Priority number | Date | WO2008IL01121 | 14.08.2008 | US93549007 | 15.08.2007 | US650108 | 16.01.2008 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2009022340 | Global Dossier | 19.02.2009 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US93549007 | 15.08.2007 | US650108 | 16.01.2008 |