EP2173018 - ELECTRIC POWER SOURCE DEVICE FOR VEHICLE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 30.12.2011 Database last updated on 21.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.12.2011 | Withdrawal of application | published on 01.02.2012 [2012/05] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Panasonic Corporation 1006, Oaza Kadoma Kadoma-shi Osaka 571-8501 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2010/14] | For all designated states Panasonic Corporation 1006, Oaza Kadoma Kadoma-shi Osaka 571-8501 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HANDA, Hiroyuki c/o Panasonic Corporation IPROC IP Development Center 7F OBP Panasonic Tower, 1-61 Shiromi 2-chome, Chuo-ku Osaka-shi Osaka 540-6207 / JP | 02 /
NISHIO, Tsuyoshi c/o Panasonic Corporation IPROC IP Development Center 7F OBP Panasonic Tower, 1-61 Shiromi 2-chome, Chuo-ku Osaka-shi Osaka 540-6207 / JP | 03 /
TAKAMURA, Kimitake c/o Panasonic Corporation IPROC IP Development Center 7F OBP Panasonic Tower, 1-61 Shiromi 2-chome, Chuo-ku Osaka-shi Osaka 540-6207 / JP | 04 /
NODA, Muneyoshi c/o Panasonic Corporation IPROC IP Development Center 7F OBP Panasonic Tower, 1-61 Shiromi 2-chome, Chuo-ku Osaka-shi Osaka 540-6207 / JP | 05 /
SUGIE, Kazuhiro c/o Panasonic Corporation IPROC IP Development Center 7F OBP Panasonic Tower, 1-61 Shiromi 2-chome, Chuo-ku Osaka-shi Osaka 540-6207 / JP | 06 /
NAKANISHI, Yuuki c/o Panasonic Corporation IPROC IP Development Center 7F OBP Panasonic Tower, 1-61 Shiromi 2-chome, Chuo-ku Osaka-shi Osaka 540-6207 / JP | [2010/14] | Representative(s) | Kügele, Bernhard, et al Novagraaf International SA Chemin de l'Echo 3 1213 Onex / CH | [N/P] |
Former [2010/14] | Kügele, Bernhard, et al Novagraaf International SA Avenue du Pailly 25 1220 Les Avanchets-Genève / CH | Application number, filing date | 08790248.2 | 22.07.2008 | [2010/14] | WO2008JP01946 | Priority number, date | JP20070192807 | 25.07.2007 Original published format: JP 2007192807 | [2010/14] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2009013891 | Date: | 29.01.2009 | Language: | JA | [2009/05] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2173018 | Date: | 07.04.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/14] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 29.01.2009 | Classification | IPC: | H02J7/34, B60L3/00, B60L7/20, B60L11/18, H01M10/44, H02J7/00 | [2010/14] | CPC: |
H02J7/1446 (EP,US);
B60L15/2045 (EP,US);
B60L58/15 (EP,US);
B60L7/16 (EP,US);
H01M10/44 (EP,US);
H01M10/48 (EP,US);
H02J7/1423 (EP,US);
B60L2210/10 (EP,US);
H02J7/345 (EP,US);
Y02E60/10 (EP);
Y02T10/64 (EP,US);
Y02T10/70 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2010/14] | Title | German: | STROMQUELLENVORRICHTUNG FÜR EIN FAHRZEUG | [2010/14] | English: | ELECTRIC POWER SOURCE DEVICE FOR VEHICLE | [2010/14] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE SOURCE D'ALIMENTATION ÉLECTRIQUE POUR UN VÉHICULE | [2010/14] | Entry into regional phase | 29.12.2009 | Translation filed | 29.12.2009 | National basic fee paid | 29.12.2009 | Search fee paid | 29.12.2009 | Designation fee(s) paid | 29.12.2009 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 29.12.2009 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 29.12.2009 | Examination requested [2010/14] | 28.12.2011 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2012/05] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.07.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.07.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [Y]JPH08308025 (ISUZU MOTORS LTD); | [Y]JP2006067644 (DENSO CORP); | [Y]JP2007159236 (TOYOTA MOTOR CORP); | [Y]JP2007174867 (TOYOTA MOTOR CORP) | by applicant | JP2002238108 | JP3465293B |