EP2178110 - SEMICONDUCTOR DEVICE, METHOD FOR MANUFACTURING THE SAME AND IMAGE DISPLAY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 04.04.2014 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.04.2014 | Withdrawal of application | published on 07.05.2014 [2014/19] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Panasonic Corporation 1006, Oaza Kadoma Kadoma-shi Osaka 571-8501 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2010/16] | For all designated states Panasonic Corporation 1006, Oaza Kadoma Kadoma-shi Osaka 571-8501 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
NAKATANI, Seiichi c/o Panasonic Corporation Intellectual Property Rights Operations Company IP Development Center 7F Twin 21 OBP Panasonic Tower, 2-1-61 Shiromi Chuo-ku, Osaka 540-6307 / JP | 02 /
YAMASHITA, Yoshihisa c/o Panasonic Corporation Intellectual Property Rights Operations Company IP Development Center 7F Twin 21 OBP Panasonic Tower, 2-1-61 Shiromi Chuo-ku, Osaka 540-6307 / JP | 03 /
KITAE, Takashi c/o Panasonic Corporation Intellectual Property Rights Operations Company IP Development Center 7F Twin 21 OBP Panasonic Tower, 2-1-61 Shiromi Chuo-ku, Osaka 540-6307 / JP | 04 /
SAWADA, Susumu c/o Panasonic Corporation Intellectual Property Rights Operations Company IP Development Center 7F Twin 21 OBP Panasonic Tower, 2-1-61 Shiromi Chuo-ku, Osaka 540-6307 / JP | [2010/16] | Representative(s) | Eisenführ Speiser Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte PartGmbB Postfach 10 60 78 28060 Bremen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2010/16] | Eisenführ, Speiser & Partner Postfach 10 60 78 28060 Bremen / DE | Application number, filing date | 08790388.6 | 06.08.2008 | [2010/16] | WO2008JP02124 | Priority number, date | JP20070205203 | 07.08.2007 Original published format: JP 2007205203 | [2010/16] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2009019865 | Date: | 12.02.2009 | Language: | JA | [2009/07] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2178110 | Date: | 21.04.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/16] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 12.02.2009 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 31.07.2012 | Classification | IPC: | H01L21/336, H01L21/28, H01L29/786, H01L51/05, H01L51/30, H01L51/40, H01L51/50, H05B33/02, H05B33/10 | [2010/16] | CPC: |
H10K59/125 (EP,KR,US);
H10K77/10 (KR);
H10K10/484 (EP,KR,US);
H10K19/10 (EP,KR,US);
H10K59/1201 (EP,KR,US);
H10K59/123 (EP,KR,US);
H10K59/131 (EP,KR,US);
H10K71/135 (EP,KR,US);
Y02E10/549 (EP);
Y02P70/50 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2010/16] | Title | German: | HALBLEITERBAUELEMENT, VERFAHREN ZU SEINER HERSTELLUNG UND BILDANZEIGE | [2010/16] | English: | SEMICONDUCTOR DEVICE, METHOD FOR MANUFACTURING THE SAME AND IMAGE DISPLAY | [2010/16] | French: | DISPOSITIF À SEMI-CONDUCTEUR, SON PROCÉDÉ DE FABRICATION ET DISPOSITIF D'AFFICHAGE D'IMAGE | [2010/16] | Entry into regional phase | 04.02.2010 | Translation filed | 08.03.2010 | National basic fee paid | 08.03.2010 | Search fee paid | 08.03.2010 | Designation fee(s) paid | 08.03.2010 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 16.04.2009 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: JP | 08.03.2010 | Examination requested [2010/16] | 27.02.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 13.05.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.09.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.03.2014 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2014/19] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 13.05.2013 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.08.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.08.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.08.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 02.09.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]EP1562240 (SEIKO EPSON CORP [JP]) [Y] 5 * paragraph [0019]; figure 2 *; | [Y]JP2005302893 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD) [Y] 9,23 * paragraphs [0012] , [0037]; figure 8 *; | [XY]US2007134857 (SUH MIN-CHUL [KR], et al) [X] 1,2,4,6,10-13,18,19 * paragraph [0041] - paragraph [0049]; figures 5, 3 * * paragraph [0055] * [Y] 3,5,9,23; | [Y]US2007134832 (OH JOON-HAK [KR], et al) [Y] 3 * paragraph [0016] - paragraph [0035]; figure 2 ** paragraph [0041] *; | [XI]US2007166855 (LEE YONG-UK [KR], et al) [X] 1,2,4,6,7,14-22 * paragraph [0082] - paragraph [0092]; figures 5A, 5F * * paragraph [0072] - paragraph [0076] * * paragraph [0068] * * paragraph [0009] - paragraph [0010] * * paragraph [0006] * * paragraph [0059] * [I] 8 | International search | [A]JP2005503042 ; | [A]JP2005302893 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD) | by applicant | JP2007067263 | JP2007205203 |