EP2196728 - SURFACE ILLUMINATION DEVICE AND LIQUID CRYSTAL DISPLAY DEVICE USING THE SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 27.04.2012 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.04.2012 | Withdrawal of application | published on 30.05.2012 [2012/22] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Panasonic Corporation 1006, Oaza Kadoma Kadoma-shi Osaka 571-8501 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2010/24] | For all designated states Panasonic Corporation 1006, Oaza Kadoma Kadoma-shi Osaka 571-8501 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ITOH, Tatsuo c/o Panasonic Corp., IP Development Center 7F OBP Panasonic Tower, 1-61, Shiromi 2-chome Chuo-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 540-6207 / JP | 02 /
SHIKII, Shinichi c/o Panasonic Corp., IP Development Center 7F OBP Panasonic Tower, 1-61, Shiromi 2-chome Chuo-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 540-6207 / JP | 03 /
NAGATA, Takayuki c/o Panasonic Corp., IP Development Center 7F OBP Panasonic Tower, 1-61 Shiromi 2-chome Chuo-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 540-6207 / JP | 04 /
YAMAMOTO, Kazuhisa c/o Panasonic Corp., IP Development Center 7F OBP Panasonic Tower, 1-61 Shiromi 2-chome Chuo-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 540-6207 / JP | [2010/24] | Representative(s) | SSM Sandmair Patentanwälte Rechtsanwalt Partnerschaft mbB Joseph-Wild-Straße 20 81829 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2010/24] | Schwabe - Sandmair - Marx Patentanwälte Stuntzstraße 16 81677 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 08790541.0 | 01.09.2008 | [2010/24] | WO2008JP02387 | Priority number, date | JP20070228521 | 04.09.2007 Original published format: JP 2007228521 | [2010/24] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2009031289 | Date: | 12.03.2009 | Language: | JA | [2009/11] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2196728 | Date: | 16.06.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/24] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 12.03.2009 | Classification | IPC: | F21V8/00, G02B6/00, G02F1/13357, F21Y101/02 | [2010/24] | CPC: |
G02B6/04 (EP,US);
G02B6/0028 (EP,US);
G02B6/0038 (EP,US);
G02B6/0068 (EP,US);
G02F1/133615 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2010/24] | Title | German: | OBERFLÄCHENBELEUCHTUNGSVORRICHTUNG UND DIESE VERWENDENDE FLÜSSIGKRISTALLANZEIGEVORRICHTUNG | [2010/24] | English: | SURFACE ILLUMINATION DEVICE AND LIQUID CRYSTAL DISPLAY DEVICE USING THE SAME | [2010/24] | French: | DISPOSITIF D'ÉCLAIRAGE DE SURFACE ET DISPOSITIF D'AFFICHAGE À CRISTAUX LIQUIDES L'UTILISANT | [2010/24] | Entry into regional phase | 04.05.2009 | Translation filed | 04.05.2009 | National basic fee paid | 04.05.2009 | Search fee paid | 04.05.2009 | Designation fee(s) paid | 04.05.2009 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 04.05.2009 | Examination requested [2010/24] | 23.04.2012 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2012/22] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.09.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]JP2007042640 (AVAGO TECH ECBU IP SG PTE LTD) [A] 1-15 * , Full text; all drawings & US 2007/0030690 A1 & EP 1750167 A1 & CN 1908767 A *; | [A]WO2007074784 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD [JP], et al) [A] 1-15 * , Full text; all drawings (Family: none) *; | [PA]WO2008078543 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD [JP], et al) [PA] 1-15 * , Full text; all drawings (Family: none) *; | [EA]WO2008126348 (PANASONIC CORP [JP], et al) [EA] 1-15 * , Full text; all drawings (Family: none) * | by applicant | JP2007042640 | JP2005340160 |