EP2169450 - DISPLAY PROTECTION PLATE FOR ELECTRONIC APPARATUS, AND ELECTRONIC APPARATUS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 13.01.2017 Database last updated on 21.08.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.07.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MT | published on 22.08.2018 [2018/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NISSHA PRINTING CO., LTD. 3, Mibu Hanai-cho Nakagyo-ku Kyoto-shi Kyoto 604-8551 / JP | [2010/13] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
OMOTE, Ryoumei c/o NISSHA PRINTING CO. LTD. 3 Mibu Hanai-cho Nakagyo-ku Kyoto-shi Kyoto 604-8551 / JP | 02 /
TAKAGI, Takayuki c/o NISSHA PRINTING CO. LTD. 3 Mibu Hanai-cho Nakagyo-ku Kyoto-shi Kyoto 604-8551 / JP | [2016/10] |
Former [2010/13] | 01 /
OMOTE, Ryoumei c/o NISSHA PRINTING CO. LTD. 3 Mibu Hanai-cho Nakagyo-ku Kyoto-shi Kyoto 604-8551 / JP | ||
02 /
TAKAGI, Takayuki c/o NISSHA PRINTING CO. LTD. 3 Mibu Hanai-cho Nakagyo-ku Kyoto-shi Kyoto 604-8551 / JP | Representative(s) | Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastraße 30 81925 München / DE | [2016/10] |
Former [2010/13] | HOFFMANN EITLE Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastrasse 4 81925 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 08790932.1 | 07.07.2008 | [2010/13] | WO2008JP62271 | Priority number, date | JP20070181959 | 11.07.2007 Original published format: JP 2007181959 | [2016/10] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2009008402 | Date: | 15.01.2009 | Language: | JA | [2009/03] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2169450 | Date: | 31.03.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/13] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2169450 | Date: | 09.03.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/10] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 15.01.2009 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.11.2010 | Classification | IPC: | G02F1/13, G02F1/1333, G02F1/1334, G02F1/1335, G09F9/00 | [2010/13] | CPC: |
G02F1/1334 (EP,US);
G02F1/1333 (KR);
G02F1/133308 (EP,US);
G02F1/1347 (EP,US);
G09F9/00 (KR);
G02F1/133331 (EP,US);
G02F1/133555 (EP,US);
G02F1/13476 (EP,US);
G02F2201/50 (EP,US);
G02F2203/62 (EP,US);
H04M1/0235 (EP,US);
H04M1/0283 (EP,US);
H04M1/18 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2016/10] |
Former [2010/13] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | ANZEIGESCHUTZPLATTE FÜR EINE ELEKTRONISCHE VORRICHTUNG UND ELEKTRONISCHE VORRICHTUNG | [2010/13] | English: | DISPLAY PROTECTION PLATE FOR ELECTRONIC APPARATUS, AND ELECTRONIC APPARATUS | [2010/13] | French: | PLAQUE DE PROTECTION DE DISPOSITIF D'AFFICHAGE POUR APPAREIL ÉLECTRONIQUE, ET APPAREIL ÉLECTRONIQUE | [2010/13] | Entry into regional phase | 08.01.2010 | Translation filed | 08.01.2010 | National basic fee paid | 08.01.2010 | Search fee paid | 08.01.2010 | Designation fee(s) paid | 08.01.2010 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 08.01.2010 | Examination requested [2010/13] | 18.01.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 10.09.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.12.2015 | Fee for grant paid | 22.12.2015 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 22.12.2015 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 10.09.2015 | Opposition(s) | 12.12.2016 | No opposition filed within time limit [2017/07] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.07.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.07.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.07.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 24.07.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 08.07.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 28.07.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 07.07.2008 | AT | 09.03.2016 | BE | 09.03.2016 | CY | 09.03.2016 | CZ | 09.03.2016 | DK | 09.03.2016 | EE | 09.03.2016 | ES | 09.03.2016 | FI | 09.03.2016 | HR | 09.03.2016 | IT | 09.03.2016 | LT | 09.03.2016 | LV | 09.03.2016 | MC | 09.03.2016 | NL | 09.03.2016 | PL | 09.03.2016 | RO | 09.03.2016 | SE | 09.03.2016 | SI | 09.03.2016 | SK | 09.03.2016 | TR | 09.03.2016 | BG | 09.06.2016 | NO | 09.06.2016 | GR | 10.06.2016 | GB | 07.07.2016 | IE | 07.07.2016 | LU | 07.07.2016 | IS | 09.07.2016 | PT | 11.07.2016 | CH | 31.07.2016 | LI | 31.07.2016 | MT | 31.07.2016 | FR | 01.08.2016 | [2018/33] |
Former [2018/29] | HU | 07.07.2008 | |
AT | 09.03.2016 | ||
BE | 09.03.2016 | ||
CY | 09.03.2016 | ||
CZ | 09.03.2016 | ||
DK | 09.03.2016 | ||
EE | 09.03.2016 | ||
ES | 09.03.2016 | ||
FI | 09.03.2016 | ||
HR | 09.03.2016 | ||
IT | 09.03.2016 | ||
LT | 09.03.2016 | ||
LV | 09.03.2016 | ||
MC | 09.03.2016 | ||
NL | 09.03.2016 | ||
PL | 09.03.2016 | ||
RO | 09.03.2016 | ||
SE | 09.03.2016 | ||
SI | 09.03.2016 | ||
SK | 09.03.2016 | ||
TR | 09.03.2016 | ||
BG | 09.06.2016 | ||
NO | 09.06.2016 | ||
GR | 10.06.2016 | ||
GB | 07.07.2016 | ||
IE | 07.07.2016 | ||
LU | 07.07.2016 | ||
IS | 09.07.2016 | ||
PT | 11.07.2016 | ||
CH | 31.07.2016 | ||
LI | 31.07.2016 | ||
FR | 01.08.2016 | ||
Former [2018/28] | HU | 07.07.2008 | |
AT | 09.03.2016 | ||
BE | 09.03.2016 | ||
CY | 09.03.2016 | ||
CZ | 09.03.2016 | ||
DK | 09.03.2016 | ||
EE | 09.03.2016 | ||
ES | 09.03.2016 | ||
FI | 09.03.2016 | ||
HR | 09.03.2016 | ||
IT | 09.03.2016 | ||
LT | 09.03.2016 | ||
LV | 09.03.2016 | ||
MC | 09.03.2016 | ||
NL | 09.03.2016 | ||
PL | 09.03.2016 | ||
RO | 09.03.2016 | ||
SE | 09.03.2016 | ||
SI | 09.03.2016 | ||
SK | 09.03.2016 | ||
BG | 09.06.2016 | ||
NO | 09.06.2016 | ||
GR | 10.06.2016 | ||
GB | 07.07.2016 | ||
IE | 07.07.2016 | ||
LU | 07.07.2016 | ||
IS | 09.07.2016 | ||
PT | 11.07.2016 | ||
CH | 31.07.2016 | ||
LI | 31.07.2016 | ||
FR | 01.08.2016 | ||
Former [2017/36] | AT | 09.03.2016 | |
BE | 09.03.2016 | ||
CZ | 09.03.2016 | ||
DK | 09.03.2016 | ||
EE | 09.03.2016 | ||
ES | 09.03.2016 | ||
FI | 09.03.2016 | ||
HR | 09.03.2016 | ||
IT | 09.03.2016 | ||
LT | 09.03.2016 | ||
LV | 09.03.2016 | ||
MC | 09.03.2016 | ||
NL | 09.03.2016 | ||
PL | 09.03.2016 | ||
RO | 09.03.2016 | ||
SE | 09.03.2016 | ||
SI | 09.03.2016 | ||
SK | 09.03.2016 | ||
BG | 09.06.2016 | ||
NO | 09.06.2016 | ||
GR | 10.06.2016 | ||
GB | 07.07.2016 | ||
IE | 07.07.2016 | ||
LU | 07.07.2016 | ||
IS | 09.07.2016 | ||
PT | 11.07.2016 | ||
CH | 31.07.2016 | ||
LI | 31.07.2016 | ||
FR | 01.08.2016 | ||
Former [2017/24] | AT | 09.03.2016 | |
BE | 09.03.2016 | ||
CZ | 09.03.2016 | ||
DK | 09.03.2016 | ||
EE | 09.03.2016 | ||
ES | 09.03.2016 | ||
FI | 09.03.2016 | ||
HR | 09.03.2016 | ||
IT | 09.03.2016 | ||
LT | 09.03.2016 | ||
LV | 09.03.2016 | ||
MC | 09.03.2016 | ||
NL | 09.03.2016 | ||
PL | 09.03.2016 | ||
RO | 09.03.2016 | ||
SE | 09.03.2016 | ||
SI | 09.03.2016 | ||
SK | 09.03.2016 | ||
BG | 09.06.2016 | ||
NO | 09.06.2016 | ||
GR | 10.06.2016 | ||
GB | 07.07.2016 | ||
IS | 09.07.2016 | ||
PT | 11.07.2016 | ||
CH | 31.07.2016 | ||
LI | 31.07.2016 | ||
FR | 01.08.2016 | ||
Former [2017/20] | AT | 09.03.2016 | |
BE | 09.03.2016 | ||
CZ | 09.03.2016 | ||
DK | 09.03.2016 | ||
EE | 09.03.2016 | ||
ES | 09.03.2016 | ||
FI | 09.03.2016 | ||
HR | 09.03.2016 | ||
IT | 09.03.2016 | ||
LT | 09.03.2016 | ||
LV | 09.03.2016 | ||
MC | 09.03.2016 | ||
NL | 09.03.2016 | ||
PL | 09.03.2016 | ||
RO | 09.03.2016 | ||
SE | 09.03.2016 | ||
SK | 09.03.2016 | ||
BG | 09.06.2016 | ||
NO | 09.06.2016 | ||
GR | 10.06.2016 | ||
IS | 09.07.2016 | ||
PT | 11.07.2016 | ||
CH | 31.07.2016 | ||
LI | 31.07.2016 | ||
FR | 01.08.2016 | ||
Former [2017/07] | AT | 09.03.2016 | |
BE | 09.03.2016 | ||
CZ | 09.03.2016 | ||
DK | 09.03.2016 | ||
EE | 09.03.2016 | ||
ES | 09.03.2016 | ||
FI | 09.03.2016 | ||
HR | 09.03.2016 | ||
IT | 09.03.2016 | ||
LT | 09.03.2016 | ||
LV | 09.03.2016 | ||
NL | 09.03.2016 | ||
PL | 09.03.2016 | ||
RO | 09.03.2016 | ||
SE | 09.03.2016 | ||
SK | 09.03.2016 | ||
NO | 09.06.2016 | ||
GR | 10.06.2016 | ||
IS | 09.07.2016 | ||
PT | 11.07.2016 | ||
Former [2017/03] | AT | 09.03.2016 | |
BE | 09.03.2016 | ||
CZ | 09.03.2016 | ||
EE | 09.03.2016 | ||
ES | 09.03.2016 | ||
FI | 09.03.2016 | ||
HR | 09.03.2016 | ||
IT | 09.03.2016 | ||
LT | 09.03.2016 | ||
LV | 09.03.2016 | ||
NL | 09.03.2016 | ||
PL | 09.03.2016 | ||
RO | 09.03.2016 | ||
SE | 09.03.2016 | ||
SK | 09.03.2016 | ||
NO | 09.06.2016 | ||
GR | 10.06.2016 | ||
IS | 09.07.2016 | ||
PT | 11.07.2016 | ||
Former [2016/51] | AT | 09.03.2016 | |
CZ | 09.03.2016 | ||
EE | 09.03.2016 | ||
ES | 09.03.2016 | ||
FI | 09.03.2016 | ||
HR | 09.03.2016 | ||
LT | 09.03.2016 | ||
LV | 09.03.2016 | ||
NL | 09.03.2016 | ||
PL | 09.03.2016 | ||
RO | 09.03.2016 | ||
SE | 09.03.2016 | ||
SK | 09.03.2016 | ||
NO | 09.06.2016 | ||
GR | 10.06.2016 | ||
IS | 09.07.2016 | ||
PT | 11.07.2016 | ||
Former [2016/50] | AT | 09.03.2016 | |
CZ | 09.03.2016 | ||
EE | 09.03.2016 | ||
ES | 09.03.2016 | ||
FI | 09.03.2016 | ||
HR | 09.03.2016 | ||
LT | 09.03.2016 | ||
LV | 09.03.2016 | ||
NL | 09.03.2016 | ||
PL | 09.03.2016 | ||
RO | 09.03.2016 | ||
SE | 09.03.2016 | ||
SK | 09.03.2016 | ||
NO | 09.06.2016 | ||
GR | 10.06.2016 | ||
IS | 09.07.2016 | ||
Former [2016/49] | EE | 09.03.2016 | |
ES | 09.03.2016 | ||
FI | 09.03.2016 | ||
HR | 09.03.2016 | ||
LT | 09.03.2016 | ||
LV | 09.03.2016 | ||
NL | 09.03.2016 | ||
PL | 09.03.2016 | ||
SE | 09.03.2016 | ||
NO | 09.06.2016 | ||
GR | 10.06.2016 | ||
IS | 09.07.2016 | ||
Former [2016/48] | ES | 09.03.2016 | |
FI | 09.03.2016 | ||
HR | 09.03.2016 | ||
LT | 09.03.2016 | ||
LV | 09.03.2016 | ||
NL | 09.03.2016 | ||
PL | 09.03.2016 | ||
SE | 09.03.2016 | ||
NO | 09.06.2016 | ||
GR | 10.06.2016 | ||
IS | 09.07.2016 | ||
Former [2016/40] | ES | 09.03.2016 | |
FI | 09.03.2016 | ||
HR | 09.03.2016 | ||
LT | 09.03.2016 | ||
LV | 09.03.2016 | ||
NL | 09.03.2016 | ||
PL | 09.03.2016 | ||
SE | 09.03.2016 | ||
NO | 09.06.2016 | ||
GR | 10.06.2016 | ||
Former [2016/39] | ES | 09.03.2016 | |
FI | 09.03.2016 | ||
HR | 09.03.2016 | ||
LT | 09.03.2016 | ||
LV | 09.03.2016 | ||
PL | 09.03.2016 | ||
SE | 09.03.2016 | ||
NO | 09.06.2016 | ||
GR | 10.06.2016 | ||
Former [2016/36] | ES | 09.03.2016 | |
FI | 09.03.2016 | ||
HR | 09.03.2016 | ||
LT | 09.03.2016 | ||
PL | 09.03.2016 | ||
NO | 09.06.2016 | ||
GR | 10.06.2016 | ||
Former [2016/35] | ES | 09.03.2016 | |
FI | 09.03.2016 | ||
HR | 09.03.2016 | ||
NO | 09.06.2016 | ||
GR | 10.06.2016 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JP2003140558 (TOYO BUSSAN KK, et al) [A] 1-8 * abstract * * figures 1-6 * | International search | [A]JP2003140149 (ASADA TADAHIRO); | [A]JP2002333610 (SHARP KK); | [A]JP2004258228 (RICOH KK); | [A]JP2004037943 (SEIKO EPSON CORP) | by applicant | JP2003140558 | JP2003140149 | JP2002333610 |