EP2214157 - LIQUID CRYSTAL DISPLAY DEVICE AND ITS CONTROL METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 26.07.2013 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.07.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 28.08.2013 [2013/35] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sharp Kabushiki Kaisha 22-22, Nagaike-cho Abeno-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 545-8522 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2010/31] | For all designated states Sharp Kabushiki Kaisha 22-22, Nagaike-cho Abeno-ku Osaka-shi Osaka 545-8522 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
FURUKAWA, Tomoo c/o Sharp Kabushiki Kaisha 22-22 Nagaike-cho Abeno-ku Osaka-shi Osaka 545-8522 / JP | 02 /
FUJIOCA, Kazuyoshi c/o Sharp Kabushiki Kaisha 22-22 Nagaike-cho Abeno-ku Osaka-shi Osaka 545-8522 / JP | [2010/31] | Representative(s) | Goddar, Heinz J. Boehmert & Boehmert Anwaltspartnerschaft mbB Pettenkoferstrasse 22 80336 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2010/31] | Goddar, Heinz J. Forrester & Boehmert Pettenkoferstrasse 20-22 80336 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 08791111.1 | 11.07.2008 | [2010/31] | WO2008JP62630 | Priority number, date | JP20070305124 | 26.11.2007 Original published format: JP 2007305124 | [2010/31] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2009069337 | Date: | 04.06.2009 | Language: | JA | [2009/23] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2214157 | Date: | 04.08.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/31] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 04.06.2009 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.02.2012 | Classification | IPC: | G09G3/36, G02F1/133, G09G3/20 | [2010/31] | CPC: |
G09G3/3648 (EP,US);
G02F1/13312 (EP,US);
G02F1/133555 (EP,US);
G09G2300/0443 (EP,US);
G09G2300/0456 (EP,US);
G09G2320/0252 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2010/31] | Title | German: | FLÜSSIGKRISTALLANZEIGEANORDNUNG UND STEUERVERFAHREN DAFÜR | [2010/31] | English: | LIQUID CRYSTAL DISPLAY DEVICE AND ITS CONTROL METHOD | [2010/31] | French: | DISPOSITIF D'AFFICHAGE À CRISTAUX LIQUIDES ET SON PROCÉDÉ DE COMMANDE | [2010/31] | Entry into regional phase | 27.04.2010 | Translation filed | 27.04.2010 | National basic fee paid | 27.04.2010 | Search fee paid | 27.04.2010 | Designation fee(s) paid | 27.04.2010 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 27.04.2010 | Examination requested [2010/31] | 13.08.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 23.10.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 05.03.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2013/35] | 09.04.2013 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2013/35] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 23.10.2012 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.07.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.07.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.07.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [I]US2005078081 (ODA KYOICHIRO [JP], et al) [I] 1-7 * paragraph [0153] * * paragraph [0157] - paragraph [0164] * * paragraph [0189] - paragraph [0194] * * figure 4 *; | [A]US6049288 (KAWASAKI YOSHIKI [JP]) [A] 1-7 * column 1, line 38 - line 47 * | [A] - "Special AMLCD Configurations", Willem den Boer, Active Matrix Liquid Crystal Displays: Fundamentals and Applications, U.S.A., Newnes, (2005), pages 179 - 196, ISBN 0750678135, XP002667405 [A] 4,5 * page 182 - page 184 * * figure 7.5 * | International search | [A]JP2007279618 (SHARP KK); | [A]WO2007097299 (NEC DISPLAY SOLUTIONS LTD [JP], et al); | [A]JP2004317623 (SHARP KK); | [A]JP2004272050 (SHARP KK) |